Arroyo v. Satten et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ann M Donnelly |
Referred: | Peggy Kuo |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03569 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Wed 03/14 2:06 PM
Letter from Jorge Arroyo to Judge Donnelly in regards to case. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Tue 07/11 10:52 AM
Letter from Pro Se Plaintiff Jorge Arroyo informing that a Defendant's name is misspelled. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Tue 07/11 11:27 AM
The Court is in receipt of the plaintiff's 7/11/2017 request7 . The Court notes that it is unnecessary to correct the misspelling of the defendant's name on the Civil Cover Sheet, because the defendant's name is spelled correctly on all legally operative documents. Ordered by Judge Ann M Donnelly on 7/11/2017. (Trezza, Jillian) |
||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 06/28 5:13 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: the Plaintiffs pro se complaint is dismissed sua sponte for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(h)(3), and because it is frivolous and fails to state a claim on which relief may be granted; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), any appeal would not be taken in good faith; and that in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. Signed by Janet Hamilton Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer Clerk of Court on 6/28/2017. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/28 2:40 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The complaint is dismissed. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 6/28/2017. (Greene, Donna) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Prisoner Authorization
Wed 06/21 9:46 AM
Prisoner Authorization by Jorge Arroyo. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 06/14 11:56 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/14 11:54 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jorge Luis Arroyo. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/14 11:53 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jorge Luis Arroyo. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |