Williams v. The Doe Fund, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond J Dearie |
Referred: | Steven Tiscione |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03582 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 4:06 AM EST |
Defendant
Charles Bryant
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Doe Fund, Inc.
341 E. 79th Street
New York, NY 10021 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jerome Wiggins
|
|
Plaintiff
Chedian Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Wed 01/31 4:46 PM
STIPULATION Of Dismissal: The above referenced matter is dismissed as to defendant Jerome Wiggins, with prejudice. Party Jerome Wiggins terminated.SO Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 1/31/2018. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 01/31 9:33 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Chedian Williams (Mesidor, Marjorie) |
|
order
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 02/01 12:03 PM
Civil Case Terminated as per23 Stipulation of Dismissal dated 1/31/2018. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
||
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 01/25 1:07 PM
ORDER re21 Status Report filed by Chedian Williams. Plaintiff shall file the appropriate Stipulation of Dismissal with respect to Defendant Wiggins by January 31, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 1/25/2018. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Status Report
Tue 01/23 2:11 PM
STATUS REPORT by Chedian Williams (Mesidor, Marjorie) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Fri 01/19 1:58 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. Defendant Wiggins' time to answer has expired and there has been no further corresponded with respect to this Defendant from Plaintiff. Accordingly, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file a status report indicating how he intends to proceed or file a request for a certificate of default by 1/26/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 1/19/2018. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Wed 01/17 4:54 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL Defendant's Charles Bryant and The Doe Fund, Inc. are discontinued in their entirety with prejudice. SO Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 1/17/2018. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 01/12 2:24 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Charles Bryant, The Doe Fund, Inc. (Bauer, Lori) |
|
Sunday, December 17, 2017 | ||
order
1 - Terminate Hearings
Sun 12/17 10:52 PM
December 18th Pre-Motion Conference is adjourned without date but will be promptly re-scheduled if the stipulation is not filed by January 15th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/17/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 12/15 10:27 AM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Charles Bryant, The Doe Fund, Inc.. (Connolly, Kevin) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 12/15 5:21 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference scheduled for December 18, 2017 is adjourned without date. The parties will file the stipulation of dismissal by January 15, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/15/2017. (Swartz, Rochelle) |
||
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 11/20 10:07 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The pre-motion conference scheduled for November 21st will instead be held at 4:00 p.m. on December 18, 2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 11/20/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 11/17 2:37 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference Currently Scheduled for November 21, 2017 by Charles Bryant, The Doe Fund, Inc.. (Connolly, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Scheduling Order
Thu 10/05 8:16 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Adjourn Conference. SCHEDULING ORDER: The pre-motion conference scheduled for October 6th will instead be held at 2:00 p.m. on November 21, 2017 in Hearing Room N504 before the undersigned. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/5/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 10/04 6:05 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Charles Bryant, The Doe Fund, Inc.. (Bauer, Lori) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings
Tue 09/19 8:59 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial conference scheduled for September 28th is adjourned without date. Counsel shall immediately request that the conference be restored to the calendar if the District Court rules against arbitration. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/19/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 09/18 5:20 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Chedian Williams. (Stevens, Brittany) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other) ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 08/18 2:51 PM
ORDER re13 Letter filed by Charles Bryant, The Doe Fund, Inc. Counsel are advised that a Pre Motion Conference is scheduled for 10/6/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10A South before the undersigned. Should counsel have any questions, they are advised to phone Ms. Mulqueen at 718-613-2435. So Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 8/18/2017. (Mulqueen, Ellen) |
||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respoth
Reply in Opposition
Fri 08/11 4:01 PM
REPLY in Opposition re13 Letter filed by Chedian Williams. (Mesidor, Marjorie) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Fri 08/04 4:44 PM
Letter Requesting Leave to File Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Arbitrate, or in Alternative, Stay Proceedings Until Conclusion of Arbitration by Charles Bryant, The Doe Fund, Inc. (Bauer, Lori) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/04 4:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charles Bryant, The Doe Fund, Inc. (Bauer, Lori) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 07/19 2:41 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on September 28, 2017 before the undersigned in Hearing Room N324 in the North Wing. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than September 26th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/19/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 07/06 10:56 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint by The Doe Fund, Inc. (Bauer, Lori) Modified on 7/6/2017 to reflect that this filing is a motion(Vasquez, Lea) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/06 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Patrick Connolly, Jr on behalf of The Doe Fund, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Connolly, Kevin) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/06 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Diane Bauer on behalf of The Doe Fund, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bauer, Lori) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 07/06 11:21 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time for The Doe Fund, Inc. to answer by 8/4/2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/6/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/30 10:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chedian Williams. The Doe Fund, Inc. served on 6/27/2017, answer due 7/18/2017. (Phillips, William) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/23 11:01 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chedian Williams. Charles Bryant served on 6/21/2017, answer due 7/12/2017; Jerome Wiggins served on 6/21/2017, answer due 7/12/2017. (Phillips, William) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/14 3:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Charles Bryant, The Doe Fund, Inc., Jerome Wiggins. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 06/14 3:45 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/14 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Alexandra Stevens on behalf of Chedian Williams (aty to be noticed) (Stevens, Brittany) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 06/14 12:52 PM
Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint by Chedian Williams (Mesidor, Marjorie) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/14 12:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Charles Bryant, The Doe Fund, Inc., Jerome Wiggins filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9603071 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Chedian Williams. (Mesidor, Marjorie) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/14 3:45 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |