Jerome v. City of New York et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela K Chen |
Referred: | Steven M Gold |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03583 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 4:13 AM EST |
Defendant
City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe Police Officers A-F
|
|
Defendant
New York City Police Department
|
|
Plaintiff
Dukens Jerome
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Sunday, August 05, 2018 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Sun 08/05 1:57 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The17 Stipulation of Dismissal is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 8/5/2018. (Hess, Alexandra) |
||
Saturday, August 04, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Sat 08/04 2:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by City of New York (Rosenkilde, Kiran) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other) 1 - Terminate Hearings
Mon 07/09 1:26 PM
ORDER: In light of16 Letter Notifying Court of Settlement, the final pretrial conference previously scheduled for July 26, 2018 is adjourned without date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 7/9/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Fri 07/06 9:56 AM
Letter Notifying Court of Settlement by Dukens Jerome (Mangan, Michael) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Fri 07/06 11:52 AM
ORDER re16 Letter Notifying Court re Settlement: The parties are directed to file a status report by August 6, 2018, if they do not file a stipulation of dismissal by that date. Plaintiff shall also notify the Court whether they intend to pursue any claims against the unrepresented defendants, New York City Police Department and John Doe Police Officers A-F. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/6/2018. (Abdallah, Fida) |
||
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Wed 06/27 3:26 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Compel. Defendants filed a motion to compel discovery on June 22, 2018. Docket Entry 15. Any opposition to defendants' motion was due June 26, 2018. Local Civil Rule 37.3(c); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a)(1). None was received. Accordingly, the motion is granted as unopposed. Plaintiff shall respond to defendants' outstanding discovery demands by July 5, 2018. IN LIGHT OF THE DEFENDANTS' REPRESENTATION THAT THE DEMANDS WERE SERVED MORE THAN EIGHT MONTHS AGO, FAILURE TO COMPLY SHALL RESULT IN THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS, INCLUDING A RECOMMENDATION OF DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/27/2018. (Gold, Steven) |
||
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Compel
Fri 06/22 5:11 PM
First MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by City of New York. (Rosenkilde, Kiran) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Discovery Demands, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Deficiency Letter | ||
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 04/25 11:37 AM
Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 4/24/2018 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Mangan for plaintiff, Rosenkilde for defendants. Discovery will be completed by July 20, 2018. THE COURT WILL HOLD A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AT 10:00 AM ON JULY 26, 2018. The parties shall be prepared (1) to state their respective positions on settlement, with PRINCIPALS WITH FULL SETTLEMENT DECISION-MAKING AUTHORITY (UP TO THE AMOUNT LAST DEMANDED FOR DEFENDANTS, DOWN TO THE AMOUNT LAST OFFERED FOR PLAINTIFFS) PRESENT OR AVAILABLE BY TELEPHONE THROUGHOUT THE CONFERENCE, (2) to articulate the basis for any anticipated summary judgment motions and to be familiar with any premotion conference procedures required by the district judge presiding over the case, and (3) to state whether they will agree to assignment of this case to a magistrate judge for all purposes, including jury trial and entry of final judgment. Counsel are encouraged to file a written application requesting a settlement conference on an earlier date if they believe it might be productive to do so. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 04/10 11:15 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephone conference will be held at 4:00 p.m. on April 24, 2018 before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to arrange the call with all parties as well as immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 4/10/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Mon 04/09 7:56 PM
Letter Re Case Status by Dukens Jerome (Mangan, Michael) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Thu 03/29 10:46 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel shall file a status report letter or stipulation of dismissal by April 9, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 3/29/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter Proposed Scheduling Order
Mon 03/19 8:07 PM
Letter Joint Status Update regarding Settlement Negotiations by plaintiff and by City of New York, Proposed Scheduling Order by City of New York (Rosenkilde, Kiran) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 02/28 3:20 PM
Second MOTION to Adjourn Conference on Consent by Dukens Jerome. (Mangan, Michael) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings
Wed 02/28 3:28 PM
ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part11 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The settlement conference previously scheduled for tomorrow is adjourned without date. Counsel shall file a status report letter or stipulation of dismissal by March 19, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/28/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 01/26 12:12 PM
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Dukens Jerome. (Mangan, Michael) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 01/26 1:50 PM
ORDER: Granting10 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The settlement conference previously scheduled for January 30, 2018 is adjourned to March 1, 2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/26/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 01/22 11:24 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the TIME of the settlement conference on January 30, 2018 has changed from 10:00 AM to 10:30 AM in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/22/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 10/12 9:56 AM
Minute Entry: Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/11/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Mangan for plaintiff, Rosenkilde for defendants. The parties will complete paper discovery by January 15, 2018. THE COURT WILL HOLD A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AT 10:00 AM ON JANUARY 30, 2018. PLAINTIFF SHALL BE PRESENT AND DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE PERSONS WITH FULL SETTLEMENT DECISION-MAKING AUTHORITY AVAILABLE BY TELEPHONE. Counsel shall be prepared to schedule all anticipated depositions and motion practice if the case cannot be settled at that time. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 10/05 5:25 PM
First ANSWER to1 Complaint, by City of New York. (Rosenkilde, Kiran) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 09/07 12:05 PM
ORDER: Granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of New York answer is due 10/5/2017. Granting7 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial conference previously scheduled for September 13, 2017 is adjourned to October 11, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/7/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer Adjourn Conference
Tue 08/29 3:46 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, , First MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled September 13, 2017 by City of New York. (Rosenkilde, Kiran) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 07/06 3:13 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 11:00 a.m. on September 13, 2017 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 7/6/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
|
Att: 1 Chambers Individual Rules | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 07/06 1:56 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by City of New York. (Rosenkilde, Kiran) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 07/06 3:07 PM
ORDER:5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is hereby GRANTED. City of New York answer due 9/5/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 7/6/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/22 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kiran Hans Rosenkilde on behalf of City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Rosenkilde, Kiran) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 06/14 4:20 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/14 4:20 PM
Summons Issued as to City of New York. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/14 4:19 PM
COMPLAINT against City of New York, John Doe Police Officers A-F, New York City Police Department Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Dukens Jerome. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 06/14 4:20 PM
FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653116125 (Bowens, Priscilla) |