Frankel v. United Collection Bureau, Inc.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William F Kuntz, II |
Referred: | Peggy Kuo |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03599 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 4:51 AM EST |
Defendant
United Collection Bureau, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Julian Frankel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 10/03 4:22 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: the action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Jalitza Poveda Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer Clerk of Court on 10/3/2017. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 10/02 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal: the above-entitled action shall be dismissed withprejudice and a judgment of dismissal with prejudice may be entered in the above-entitled action pursuant hereto.SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 10/2/2017. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/25 8:23 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Julian Frankel (Maximov, Maxim) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Wed 08/16 12:28 PM
ORDER: In light of the Notice of Settlement filed at5 the parties are directed to file a Stipulation of Dismissal by September 29, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 8/16/2017. (Riquelme, Claudia) |
||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 08/15 10:32 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Julian Frankel (Maximov, Maxim) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/15 9:13 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 06/15 9:12 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/15 9:11 AM
Summons Issued as to United Collection Bureau, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/14 7:21 PM
COMPLAINT against United Collection Bureau, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9605324 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Julian Frankel. (Maximov, Maxim) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/15 9:09 AM
Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |