Killoran et al v. Westhampton Beach School District et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nina R Morrison |
Referred: | Steven I Locke |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03553 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2017 5:07 AM EST |
Defendant
Claire Bean
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joyce Donnesson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James N. Hulme
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
George R. Kast, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Suzanne M. Mensch
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Radday
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stacy Rubio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Halsey C. Stevens
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Westhampton Beach School District
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christian Killoran
132-13 Main Street
Westhampton Beach, NY 11978 |
|
Plaintiff
Terrie Killoran
individually, and on behalf of their infant son, Aiden Killoran 132-13 Main Street
Westhampton Beach, NY 11978 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 22, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Wed 02/22 9:59 AM
Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-866-NRM-SIL, 18-cv-3389-NRM-SIL, 19-cv-2418-NRM-SIL, 19-cv-3298-NRM-SIL, 19-cv-5078-NRM-SIL, 19-cv-6663-NRM-LGD, 20-cv-269-NRM-SIL, 20-cv-4121-JS-LGD, 20-cv-4763-JS-LGD, 21-cv-1281-NRM-SIL, 21-cv-3264-NRM-LGD, 21-cv-5924-NRM-LGD, 22-cv-1632-NRM-LGD, 22-cv-1951-JS-LGD, 22-cv-5770-JS-LGD, 22-cv-6467-JS-LGD, 23-cv-1114-JS-LGD, 23-cv-1115-JS-LGD The Case was directly assigned as a related Pro Se/Habeas Case. (DC) |
|
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Wed 02/22 9:58 AM
Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-866-NRM-SIL, 18-cv-3389-NRM-SIL, 19-cv-2418-NRM-SIL, 19-cv-3298-NRM-SIL, 19-cv-5078-NRM-SIL, 19-cv-6663-NRM-LGD, 20-cv-269-NRM-SIL, 20-cv-4121-JS-LGD, 20-cv-4763-JS-LGD, 21-cv-1281-NRM-SIL, 21-cv-3264-NRM-LGD, 21-cv-5924-NRM-LGD, 22-cv-1632-NRM-LGD, 22-cv-1951-JS-LGD, 22-cv-5770-JS-LGD, 22-cv-6467-JS-LGD, 23-cv-1114-JS-LGD The Case was directly assigned as a related Pro Se/Habeas Case. (DC) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2022 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Wed 11/02 2:54 PM
Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-866, 22-cv-6467, 18-cv-3389, 19-cv-2418, 19-cv-3298, 19-cv-5078, 19-cv-6663, 20-cv-269, 20-cv-4121, 20-4763 21-cv-1281, 21-cv-3264, 21-cv-5924, 22-cv-1632, 22-cv-1951, 22-cv-5770 The Case was directly assigned as a related Pro Se/Habeas Case. (DC) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2022 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 10/14 4:12 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Nina Morrison. Judge Gary R. Brown, Judge Arthur D. Spatt no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Associated Cases: 2:17-cv-00866-GRB-SIL, 2:17-cv-03553-ADS-SIL(AM) |
||
Thursday, April 07, 2022 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Thu 04/07 3:55 PM
Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-866-GRB-SIL, 22-cv-1951-JS-SIL, 18-cv-3389-JS-SIL, 19-cv-2418-JS-SIL, 19-cv-3298-JS-SIL, 19-cv-5078-JS-SIL, 19-cv-6663-JS-SIL, 20-cv-269-JS-SIL, 20-cv-4121-JS-SIL, 20-cv-4763-JS-SIL, 21-cv-1281-JS-SIL, 21-cv-3264-JS-SIL, 21-cv-5924-JS-SIL and 22-cv-1951-JS-SIL The Case was directly assigned as a related Pro Se/Habeas Case. (Cox, Dwayne) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Thu 04/07 2:31 PM
Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-866-GRB-SIL, 22-cv-1951-JS-SIL, 18-cv-3389-JS-SIL, 19-cv-2418-JS-SIL, 19-cv-3298-JS-SIL, 19-cv-5078-JS-SIL, 19-cv-6663-JS-SIL, 20-cv-269-JS-SIL, 20-cv-4121-JS-SIL, 20-cv-4763-JS-SIL, 21-cv-1281-JS-SIL, 21-cv-3264-JS-SIL, 21-cv-5924-JS-SIL and 22-cv-1632-JS-SIL The Case was directly assigned as a related Pro Se/Habeas Case. (Cox, Dwayne) |
|
Friday, October 29, 2021 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Fri 10/29 4:22 PM
Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-00866-GRB-SIL, 21-cv-05924-JS-SIL, 18-cv-03389-JS-SIL, 19-cv-02418-JS-SIL, 19-cv-03298-JS-SIL, 19-cv-05078-JS-SIL, 19-cv-06663-JS-SIL, 20-cv-00269-JS-SIL, 20-cv-04121-JS-SIL, 20-cv-04763-JS-SIL, 21-cv-01281-JS-SIL, 21-cv-03264-JS-SIL The Case was directly assigned as a related Pro Se/Habeas Case. (Cox, Dwayne) |
|
Friday, June 11, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Fri 06/11 9:03 AM
Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-866-GRB-SIL, 18-cv-3389-JS-SIL, 19-cv-2418-JS-SIL, 19-cv-3298-JS-SIL, 19-cv-5078-JS-SIL, 20-cv-4121-JS-SIL, 20-cv-4763-JS-SIL, 21-cv-1281-JS-SIL and 21-cv-3264-JS-SIL The Case was directly assigned as a related Pro Se/Habeas Case. (Cox, Dwayne) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Fri 10/16 12:04 PM
Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-866-GRB-SIL, 20-cv-4763-JS-SIL, 18-cv-3389-JS-SIL, 19-cv-2418-JS-SIL, 19-cv-3298-JS-SIL, 19-cv-5078-JS-SIL, 19-cv-6663-JS-SIL, 20-cv-269-JS-SIL and 20-cv-4121-JS-SIL The Case was directly assigned as a related Pro Se/Habeas Case. (Cox, Dwayne) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Fri 09/04 9:50 AM
Notice of Related Cases: 20-cv-4121-JS-SIL, 20-cv-269-JS-SIL, 19-cv-6663-JS-SIL, 19-cv-5078-JS-SIL, 19-cv-3298-JS-SIL, 19-cv-2418-JS-SIL, 18-cv-3389-JS-SIL and 17-cv-866-GRB-SIL The Case was directly assigned as a related Pro Se/Habeas Case. (Cox, Dwayne) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Thu 01/16 4:36 PM
Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-866-JS-SIL, 20-cv-269-JS-SIL, 18-cv-3389-JS-SIL, 19-cv-2418-JS-SIL, 19-cv-3298-JS-SIL, 19-cv-5078-JS-SIL and 19-cv-6663-JS-SIL (Cox, Dwayne) Modified to correct related case number on 1/16/2020 (Cox, Dwayne) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Tue 06/12 8:57 AM
Notice of Related Cases: 15-cv-4743-ADS-SIL, 17-cv-866-JS-SIL and 18-cv-3389-JS-SIL (Cox, Dwayne) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order(Other)
Fri 02/16 3:53 PM
ORDERED, that the above captioned cases are hereby consolidated; and it is further ORDERED, that the Clerk is hereby directed to consolidate the two captioned cases under Case Number l7-CV-0866, and to move the documents previously filed under Case Number 17-CV-3553 to Case Number 17-CV-0866, and to close the separate file under Case Number 17-CV-3553; and it is furtherORDERED, that as so consolidated the actions shall continue hereinafter and be referred to as "Aiden Killoran (Christian Killoran. as parent) v. Westhampton Beach School District. et al, and shall proceed under Case Number l7-CV-0866, with all filings in the consolidated cases to be made under Case Number l7-CV-0866. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 2/16/2018. (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
order
~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 02/16 4:01 PM
Cases associated. Civil Case Terminated. (Bollbach, Jean) |
||
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Consolidate Cases
Thu 02/15 2:57 PM
Proposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Christian Killoran, Terrie Killoran. (Killeen, Thomas) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Letter
Thu 02/15 10:47 AM
Letter regarding administrative record of OSR by Claire Bean, Joyce Donnesson, James N. Hulme, George R. Kast, Jr, Suzanne M. Mensch, Michael Radday, Stacy Rubio, Halsey C. Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District (Leahey, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 OSR Instructions | ||
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Hearing
Wed 02/14 9:42 AM
Electronic ORDER granting17 Motion for Hearing. Motion was previously granted by the Court on 1/12/2018. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 2/14/2018. (Fell, Christopher) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Hearing
Wed 02/14 9:46 AM
Electronic ORDER finding as moot9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Hearing. In light of the Plaintiffs' amended complaint24 , the Court is denying the Defendant's motion to dismiss the original complaint. See, e.g., MB v. Islip Sch. Dist., No. 14-cv-4670, 2015 WL 3756875, at *4 (E.D.N.Y. June 16, 2015) (stating that when an amended complaint is filed in response to a motion to dismiss, a court has a variety of ways in which it may deal with the pending motion to dismiss, from denying the motion to dismiss as moot to considering the merits of the motion in light of the amended complaint). The Defendants are granted leave to file a new motion to dismiss the amended complaint. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 2/14/2018. (Fell, Christopher) |
||
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 02/13 1:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Christian Killoran and Terrie Killoran on behalf of their son, Aiden Killoran against Claire Bean, Joyce Donnesson, James N. Hulme, George R. Kast, Jr, Suzanne M. Mensch, Michael Radday, Stacy Rubio, Halsey C. Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District, filed by Terrie Killoran, Christian Killoran. (Killeen, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit IHO Lederman Decision, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit IHO Monk Decision, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Post Hearing Brief, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Notice of Review, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Request for Review, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit SRO Appeal Memoranda, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit SRO Krolak Decision, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Day 1 Transcript Testimony, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Day 2 Transcript Testimony | ||
23 | 23
respoth
Reply in Support
Tue 02/13 11:37 AM
REPLY in Support re21 Letter MOTION for Hearing re Court's Involvement in Settlement filed by Christian Killoran. (Killeen, Thomas) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 02/12 4:03 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 Letter MOTION for Hearing re Court's Involvement in Settlement filed by Claire Bean, Joyce Donnesson, James N. Hulme, George R. Kast, Jr, Suzanne M. Mensch, Michael Radday, Stacy Rubio, Halsey C. Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District. (Leahey, Anne) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Hearing
Mon 02/12 9:54 AM
Letter MOTION for Hearing re Court's Involvement in Settlement by Christian Killoran. (Killeen, Thomas) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 01/12 12:07 PM
Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to this Court's individual rules, this Court does not require pre-motion conferences when a pro se party wishes to file a motion for summary judgment. Rule IV-D-ii. However, the Court will hold a conference to discuss the following: whether cases 17-3553 and 17-866 should be consolidated; why the Plaintiff has failed to respond to the Defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) under docket number 17-866; and whether the Plaintiff will be permitted to file his motion for summary judgment. The parties are directed to appear on 1/17/2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1020 of the Long Island Courthouse. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 1/12/2018. (Fell, Christopher) Modified docket text on 1/12/2018 (Florio, Lisa) |
||
order
Order(Other)
Fri 01/12 2:24 PM
Electronic ORDER. The Defendants are directed to notify the Plaintiffs via email or telephone of the Court's previous order. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 1/12/2018. (Fell, Christopher) |
||
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Tue 10/31 9:31 AM
LETTER undated from Christian Killoran to Judge Spatt re In opposition to defendant's16 letter application for a dismissal of the subject action. (Coleman, Laurie) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Hearing
Mon 10/30 12:19 PM
Letter MOTION for Hearing /Request for preliminary conference by Christian Killoran. (Coleman, Laurie) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Mon 10/23 3:36 PM
Letter with SRO Decision by Claire Bean, Joyce Donnesson, James N. Hulme, George R. Kast, Jr, Suzanne M. Mensch, Michael Radday, Stacy Rubio, Halsey C. Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District (Leahey, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 10-18-17 SRO Decision | ||
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 08/16 8:38 AM
Electronic ORDER granting14 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File nunc pro tunc. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 8/16/2017. (Fell, Christopher) |
||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Mon 08/07 3:39 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Leahey, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service | ||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Thu 08/03 2:43 PM
Letter requesting extension of briefing schedule by Claire Bean, Joyce Donnesson, James N. Hulme, George R. Kast, Jr, Suzanne M. Mensch, Michael Radday, Stacy Rubio, Halsey C. Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District (Leahey, Anne) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Mon 07/31 10:35 AM
Combined MEMORANDA of law and affidavit in Opposition to9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Christian Killoran. (Florio, Lisa) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Hearing
Mon 07/31 10:08 AM
Letter MOTION for Hearing , requests the opportunity for "oral argument" by Christian Killoran. (Florio, Lisa) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order(Other)
Mon 07/24 4:25 PM
ORDER re10 re extension of briefing schedule. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 7/24/2017. (cm to pro se plaintiffs) (Florio, Lisa) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Fri 07/21 4:26 PM
Letter re extension of briefing schedule by Claire Bean, Joyce Donnesson, James N. Hulme, George R. Kast, Jr, Suzanne M. Mensch, Michael Radday, Stacy Rubio, Halsey C. Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District (Leahey, Anne) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 07/06 3:10 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Claire Bean, Joyce Donnesson, James N. Hulme, George R. Kast, Jr, Suzanne M. Mensch, Michael Radday, Stacy Rubio, Halsey C. Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District. (Leahey, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Memorandum of Law in Support, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 06/21 3:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terrie Killoran, Christian Killoran. Anne Leahey Defendants counsel served 6/15/2017; Claire Bean served on 6/15/2017, answer due 7/6/2017; Joyce Donnesson served on 6/15/2017, answer due 7/6/2017; James N. Hulme served on 6/15/2017, answer due 7/6/2017; George R. Kast, Jr served on 6/15/2017, answer due 7/6/2017; Suzanne M. Mensch served on 6/15/2017, answer due 7/6/2017; Michael Radday served on 6/15/2017, answer due 7/6/2017; Stacy Rubio served on 6/15/2017, answer due 7/6/2017; Halsey C. Stevens served on 6/15/2017, answer due 7/6/2017. (Coleman, Laurie) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 06/21 3:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terrie Killoran, Christian Killoran. Westhampton Beach School District served on 6/14/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Coleman, Laurie) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/16 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Arntsen on behalf of Claire Bean, Joyce Donnesson, James N. Hulme, George R. Kast, Jr, Suzanne M. Mensch, Michael Radday, Stacy Rubio, Halsey C. Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District (aty to be noticed) (Arntsen, David) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/16 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne C. Leahey on behalf of Claire Bean, Joyce Donnesson, James N. Hulme, George R. Kast, Jr, Suzanne M. Mensch, Michael Radday, Stacy Rubio, Halsey C. Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District (aty to be noticed) (Leahey, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Wed 06/14 10:18 AM
Notice of Related Case; 17-cv-866-ADS-SIL (Cox, Dwayne) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 06/14 10:05 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/14 10:02 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Cox, Dwayne) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/14 9:59 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Terrie Killoran, Christian Killoran. (Cox, Dwayne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 06/14 10:04 AM
FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 22925 (Cox, Dwayne) |