Brown v. Global Credit & Collection Corporation
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonard D Wexler |
Referred: | Gary R Brown |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03564 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2017 4:37 AM EST |
Defendant
Global Credit & Collection Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adrienne Brown
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Tue 11/29 2:12 PM
Notice of Related Cases: 15-cv-6348-SJF-AYS, 15-cv-6349-SJF-AYS, 22-cv-7214-JMA-AYS and 20-cv-3342-JMA-AYS The Case was directly assigned as a related Pro Se/Habeas Case. (DC) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 12/06 12:39 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS re:13 STIPULATION of Dismissal. So Ordered. Case closed. (Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 12/5/2017.) (Fagan, Linda) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 12/04 12:02 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Adrienne Brown (Kimmel, Craig) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 11/15 1:48 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/15/2017. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda) |
||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 11/14 12:53 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery And to Complete Mediation by Adrienne Brown. (Kimmel, Craig) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 09/15 12:11 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/15/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Discovery due by 6/14/2018. See order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/15/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) |
|
adr
Mediation Instructions
Fri 09/15 9:56 AM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to Robyn Weinstein at Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Weinstein, Robyn) |
||
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
minutes
Docket Call Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation
Thu 09/14 3:40 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown: Initial Conference Hearing held on 9/14/2017.Counsel for all sides present. Discovery order entered. Case referred to mediation.Mediation shall be completed by 11/14/2017(Selection of Mediator due by 9/28/2017.) (FTR Log #3:05-3:16.) (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 09/11 4:11 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/11/2017. C/ECF (Johnston, Linda) |
||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 09/08 4:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9816060. by Adrienne Brown. (Stevens, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Attorney Admissions, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B- Certificate of Good Standing | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 09/08 10:40 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/8/2017. C/ECF (Johnston, Linda) |
||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 09/07 10:07 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9809778. by Adrienne Brown. (Hoeffel, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Attorney Admissions, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B- Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/15 12:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/14/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. See order for instructions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/15/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 GRB Individual Rules | ||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/11 3:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Credit & Collection Corporation (Peltan, David) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/11 3:52 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Global Credit & Collection Corporation. (Peltan, David) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/13 4:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adrienne Brown. Global Credit & Collection Corporation served on 7/13/2017, answer due 8/3/2017. (Kimmel, Craig) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/14 3:46 PM
Summons Issued as to Global Credit & Collection Corporation. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 06/14 3:37 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 06/14 3:10 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/14 3:37 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Leonard D. Wexler and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Global Credit & Collection Corporation filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9600139 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Adrienne Brown. (Kimmel, Craig) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |