Orellana v. Temple Israel of Great Neck et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gary R Brown |
Referred: | Gary R Brown |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03581 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 5:20 AM EST |
Defendant
Leon Silverberg
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Temple Israel of Great Neck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raul Orellana
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Lederman Caterers of Great Neck, Ltd.
Terminated: 11/01/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
minutes
Fairness/Cheeks Conference Telephone Conference Docket Call Order on Motion for Settlement
Tue 07/17 11:44 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown:; Fairness/Cheeks Conference held on 7/17/2018. Counsel for all sides present. No opposition present. Oral ruling granting the32 Motion for Settlement (FTR Log #11:02-11:05.) (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 07/17 11:45 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Settlement Agreement, including the attorneys fee award, is determined to be fair, reasonable and adequate in compliance with Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015) and Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/17/2018. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 07/12 11:19 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: In the interest of expediency, and because the undersigned already has scheduled a conference in this matter for the same date, the July 27, 2018 final fairness hearing is ADVANCED to July 17, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. The parties are to appear by telephone. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/12/2018. c/ecf (Meehan, James) |
||
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/10 1:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re32 : A telephonic final fairness hearing concerning the parties' settlement, DE32 , is hereby scheduled for July 27, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to contact counsel for defendants and, once all parties are on the line, call the Court at (631)712-5700. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/10/2018. c/ecf (Meehan, James) |
||
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Letter
Wed 06/20 3:18 PM
Letter requesting approval of settlement agreement by Raul Orellana (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 06/07 10:06 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting31 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/7/2018. c/ecf (Meehan, James) |
||
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 06/06 5:38 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File settlement approval documents by Raul Orellana. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 05/08 10:25 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting30 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 5/8/2018. c/ecf (Meehan, James) |
||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 05/07 10:20 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Settlement Agreement by Leon Silverberg, Temple Israel of Great Neck. (Collyer, Adam) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 04/23 10:33 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting29 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/23/2018. c/ecf (Meehan, James) |
||
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 04/20 3:40 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File settlement approval documents by Raul Orellana. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/30 3:00 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Leonard D. Wexler no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. SO ORDERED by Judge Wexler on 3/29/2018. (Cubano, Jazmin) |
|
utility
Case No Longer Referred
Fri 03/30 2:57 PM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. (Cubano, Jazmin) |
||
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/27 2:15 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Raul Orellana. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Fri 03/23 10:44 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER26 Letter. The parties report that they have agreed to settle this manner. Accordingly, they are to file stipulation of discontinuance or, in the alternative a status report, by April 23, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/23/2018. c/ecf (Meehan, James) |
||
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Thu 03/22 12:02 PM
Letter informing the Court of settlement in principle by Raul Orellana (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Fri 11/03 12:00 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) re:24 STIPULATION of Dismissal. So Ordered. (Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 11/1/2017.) (Fagan, Linda) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 11/01 2:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal against Defendant, LEDERMAN CATERERS OF GREAT NECK, LTD., without prejudice by Raul Orellana (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Thu 10/26 2:28 PM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. Document 24 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties, filed on 10/26/2017, has been deleted at the request of the filer, and approved by the Chambers of Judge Gary R. Brown, as the document fell into the category of Discovery documents, and should not have been filed in the action. All corrections have been made. (Fagan, Linda) |
||
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 10/12 12:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lederman Caterers of Great Neck, Ltd. (Singer, Keith) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/12 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Singer on behalf of Lederman Caterers of Great Neck, Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Singer, Keith) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/11 6:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lederman Caterers of Great Neck, Ltd. re20 Answer to Complaint (Stiller, Sharon) |
|
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 10/11 6:18 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Lederman Caterers of Great Neck, Ltd.. (Stiller, Sharon) |
|
19 | 19
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/11 6:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lederman Caterers of Great Neck, Ltd. re18 Notice of Appearance (Stiller, Sharon) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/11 6:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon P. Stiller on behalf of Lederman Caterers of Great Neck, Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Stiller, Sharon) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 10/10 4:05 PM
DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadlines have been set. Status Conference set for 7/17/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Discovery due by 8/6/2018.See order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/10/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) |
|
adr
Mediation Instructions
Tue 10/10 3:29 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to Robyn Weinstein at Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Weinstein, Robyn) |
||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 10/10 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Jemal on behalf of Leon Silverberg, Temple Israel of Great Neck (aty to be noticed) (Fagan, Linda) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
minutes
Docket Call Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation
Tue 10/10 3:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown: Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/6/2017. Taimur Alamgir for plaintiff; Joshua Jemal for defendants Temple Israel of Great Neck and Silverberg. Discovery order entered. Case referred to FLSA mediation. Mediation shall be completed by 1/13/2017(Selection of Mediator due by 12/20/2017.) (FTR Log #10:45-11:03.) (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/05 12:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taimur Alamgir on behalf of Raul Orellana (aty to be noticed) (Alamgir, Taimur) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 09/27 3:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raul Orellana. Lederman Caterers of Great Neck, Ltd. served on 8/24/2017, answer due 9/14/2017. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 09/13 10:54 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/6/2017 10:45 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. See order for instructions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/13/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 09/11 10:45 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Leon Silverberg, Temple Israel of Great Neck. (Collyer, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 09/06 3:11 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/6/2017. c/ecf (Meehan, James) |
||
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 08/25 4:01 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Leon Silverberg, Temple Israel of Great Neck. (Collyer, Adam) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/08 4:36 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Leon Silverberg answer due 8/26/2017; Temple Israel of Great Neck answer due 8/26/2017.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/8/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Fri 08/04 4:07 PM
STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time to Answer by Raul Orellana (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/02 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E Collyer on behalf of Leon Silverberg, Temple Israel of Great Neck (aty to be noticed) (Collyer, Adam) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/02 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elior Daniel Shiloh on behalf of Leon Silverberg, Temple Israel of Great Neck (aty to be noticed) (Shiloh, Elior) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice(Other)
Wed 08/02 11:15 AM
NOTICE by Raul Orellana Consent to Sue (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/10 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Seelig on behalf of Raul Orellana (aty to be noticed) (Seelig, Anne) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/19 9:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Lederman Caterers of Great Neck, Ltd., Leon Silverberg, Temple Israel of Great Neck, on 06/19/2017. (Fagan, Linda) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 06/16 4:51 PM
Proposed Summons. by Raul Orellana (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 06/14 3:09 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 06/14 3:05 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/14/2017) (Landow, Concetta) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/14 12:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Lederman Caterers of Great Neck, Ltd., Leon Silverberg, Temple Israel of Great Neck filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9602966 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Raul Orellana. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/14 3:08 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Leonard D. Wexler and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) |
||
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Wed 06/14 3:14 PM
Proposed summonses are rejected; the caption on the summonses does not match the caption on the complaint. The Clerk's Office cannot issue the summonses with an incorrect caption; Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summonses using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Landow, Concetta) Modified on 6/14/2017 (Landow, Concetta) |
||
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Wed 06/14 4:04 PM
Replaced document2 with correct correction notice and also updated proposed summonses rejected docket entry with the correct information. (Landow, Concetta) |