U.S. Small Business Administration v. Feinsod et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joanna Seybert |
Referred: | Anne Y Shields |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03586 |
Nature of Suit | 450 Other Statutes - Commerce |
Cause | 28:754 Receiver of Property in Different Districts |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 5:29 AM EST |
Defendant
Peter Boockvar
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steven Etra
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Feinsod
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Feinstein
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gary Granoff
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Murray Indick
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Laird
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Silvia Mullens
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elliott Singer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Howard Sommer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ivan J. Wolpert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
U.S. Small Business Administration
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
274 | 274
misc
Letter
Tue 04/23 2:45 PM
Letter to the Honorable Joanna Seybert in regard to the April 19, 2024 Electronic Order Referring Motions to Magistrate Judge Wicks for a report and recommendation by U.S. Small Business Administration (Bilodeau, Kelsey) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
order
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Scheduling Order
Mon 04/22 11:19 AM
ORDER. The in-person conference originally scheduled for May 31, 2024 before the undersigned has been RESCHEDULED to June 21, 2024 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 1020 in the Central Islip Courthouse before the undersigned. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 4/22/2024. (HM) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
order
Order Referring Motion
Fri 04/19 10:16 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS. The parties' cross-motions for summary judgment (ECF Nos.223 ,225 ,228 ) and Motions to Strike (ECF Nos.238 ,272 ) are respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Wicks for a report and recommendation. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 4/19/2024. (AME) |
||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/19 11:46 AM
ORDER. In light of the Hon. Joanna Seybert's referral of motions filed at ECF No.223 ,225 ,228 ,238 and272 , the parties are directed to appear for an in-person Status Conference on May 31, 2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1020 in the Central Islip Courthouse before the undersigned. The parties are to note that this conference is not an oral argument but simply to address the motions and the general status of this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 4/19/2024. (HM) |