Mosca v. Resurgent Capital Services L.P. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sandra J Feuerstein |
Referred: | Arlene R Lindsay |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03590 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 4:01 AM EST |
Defendant
Resurgent Capital Services L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sherman Financial Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosa Mosca
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 10/25 9:13 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The parties having reported that this matter has settled, this case is closed with leave to reopen on ten (10) days' notice on or before November 27, 2017. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 10/25/2017. (Roman, Joshua) |
||
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 10/24 5:11 PM
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for 10/26/17 In Light of Settlement In Principal by Rosa Mosca. (Pashkin, Mitchell) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 09/29 11:28 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 9/26/2017 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Civil Cause for Status Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff: Mitchell Pashkin. Counsel for Defendant: David Grech. Case called. All parties present. A further status conference is scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 10/26/2017 at 11:15AM. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/25 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Grech on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Grech, David) |
|
8 | 8
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/25 2:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Resurgent Capital Services L.P., Sherman Financial Group, LLC Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Rosa Mosca. (Pashkin, Mitchell) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Collection Letter | ||
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 09/07 1:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 9/5/2017 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Civil Cause for Initial Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff: Mitchell Pashkin. Counsel for Defendant: Yevgeny Roymisher. Case called. All parties present. A further status conference is scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 9/26/2017 at 11:15AM. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 09/01 12:47 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 9/1/2017. (Morabito, Bryan) |
||
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 08/31 6:40 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently scheduled for September 5, 2017 at 11:15 a.m. be adjourned to the same day at 12:00 p.m. by Resurgent Capital Services L.P., Sherman Financial Group, LLC. (Roymisher, Yevgeny) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 06/16 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 9/5/2017 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. (Walsh, Kenneth) |
||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 06/15 2:46 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/15 2:44 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/15 8:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell L. Pashkin on behalf of Rosa Mosca (aty to be noticed) (Pashkin, Mitchell) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/15 2:46 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/14 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter G. Siachos on behalf of Resurgent Capital Services L.P., Sherman Financial Group, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Siachos, Peter) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 06/14 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Resurgent Capital Services L.P., Sherman Financial Group, LLC from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk,, case number 600480/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9604398) (Roymisher, Yevgeny) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons with Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |