Rollins v. United States of America
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Patricia L Cohen |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01662 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:1346 Tort Claim |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 30, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 2:50 AM CST |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William L Rollins
100 Long and Winding Road
St. Peters, MO 63376 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, December 30, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Mon 12/30 11:04 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' stipulation of dismissal [ECF No.37 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims and causes of action against Defendant are DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 12/30/19. (JAB) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 12/20 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America (Llewellyn, Nicholas) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Entry of Appearance
Fri 12/20 11:53 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant United States of America. (Llewellyn, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Tue 12/03 2:17 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' motion to extend [ECF No.34 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than January 6, 2020, the parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal, motion for leave to a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment fully resolving this lawsuit. (Dismissal Paper(s) due by 1/6/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 12/3/2019. (AFC) |
|
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Extension
Fri 11/22 10:58 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of: Time for Completion of Settlement by Plaintiff William L Rollins. (Boock, Jamie) |
|
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Tue 10/08 9:34 AM
ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the October 8, 2019 pretrial conference and October 15, 2019 trial date are VACATED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that counsel shall file a stipulation for dismissal, motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss the case, or proposed consent judgment no later than November 22, 2019. Failure to timely comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Dismissal Paper(s) due by 11/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on October 8, 2019. (MCB) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 10/07 9:28 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by United States of America (Luther, Steven) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
trial
Trial Brief
Mon 09/30 10:33 PM
TRIAL BRIEF by Defendant United States of America. (Luther, Steven) |
|
30 | 30
trial
Exhibit List
Mon 09/30 10:32 PM
Exhibit List by Defendant United States of America. (Luther, Steven) |
|
29 | 29
trial
Witness List
Mon 09/30 10:31 PM
WITNESS LIST by Defendant United States of America. (Luther, Steven) |
|
28 | 28
trial
Trial Brief
Mon 09/30 7:12 PM
TRIAL BRIEF by Plaintiff William L Rollins.(Boock, Jamie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
27 | 27
trial
Witness List
Mon 09/30 5:53 PM
WITNESS LIST by Plaintiff William L Rollins. (Boock, Jamie) |
|
26 | 26
trial
Exhibit List
Mon 09/30 5:50 PM
Exhibit List by Plaintiff William L Rollins. (Boock, Jamie) |
|
25 | 25
trial
Stipulation of Uncontested Facts
Mon 09/30 5:48 PM
Stipulation of Uncontested Facts by Plaintiff William L Rollins. (Boock, Jamie) |
|
Thursday, September 26, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Thu 09/26 4:59 PM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' joint motion to extend pretrial compliance deadlines [ECF No. 23] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file their pretrial materials no later than September 30, 2019, and their objections, if any, to pretrial materials no later than noon on October 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on September 26, 2019. (MCB) |
|
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension
Tue 09/24 12:39 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of: Time for Pretrial Compliance by Defendant United States of America. (Luther, Steven) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Thu 09/05 1:32 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the order setting the final pretrial conference for October 3, 2019 [ECF No.21 ] is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference with counsel is re- scheduled to Tuesday, October 8, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned in Courtroom 9N. During that conference, the court will address all pretrial matters, including, but not limited to, any motions in limine. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than Friday, October 4, 2019, the parties shall submit to the Court and opposing counsel all motions in limine to exclude evidence, in accordance with Section II of the Courts Case Management Order [ECF No.8 ]. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall file any responses to motions in limine to exclude evidence, and submit a courtesy copy directly to the Court's chambers, by 12:00 p.m. on Monday, October 7, 2019. (Motion in Limine due by 10/4/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9N before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 9/5/2019. (AFC) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Fri 08/23 10:53 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Final Pretrial Conference with counsel is scheduled for 1:30 p.m. on Thursday, October 3, 2019, before the undersigned in Courtroom 9N. During that conference, the court will address all pretrial matters, including, but not limited to, any motions in limine and proposed jury instructions. Counsel should anticipate being trained on the courtroom's electronic equipment immediately following this conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file any responses to motions in limine to exclude evidence, and submit a courtesy copy directly to the Court's chambers, by 12:00 p.m. on October 2, 2019. (Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9N before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 8/23/2019. (AFC) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
misc
NextGen Remark
Tue 05/21 12:38 AM
NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf.] If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf.] If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or[LINK:moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov] . (CSAW) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 03/25 2:58 PM
ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion19 is GRANTED so that the bench trial of this case is RESCHEDULED to begin at 9:00 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15, 2019. The deadlines set forth in the CMO's Order Relating to Trial, see ECF No.8 at 2-4, as amended12 , remain in full force and effect with respect to the new trial date. ( Bench Trial set for 10/15/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9N before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. Motion in Limine due by 10/5/2019. Pretrial Compliance due by 9/25/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 3/25/2019. (CBL) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Lift Stay
Mon 03/25 10:37 AM
MOTION to Lift Stay by Defendant United States of America. (Luther, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Tue 01/22 4:06 PM
ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to stay17 is GRANTED in part so that this case is STAYED until Congress restores appropriations to the Department of Justice. Immediately upon restoration of the appropriations, Defendant's counsel shall notify Plaintiff and the Court that the stay may be lifted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the March 18, 2019 trial date is VACATED, with its rescheduling to occur after the stay is lifted. The deadlines set forth in the Order Relating to Trial, see ECF No. 8 at 3-4, remain in full force and effect with respect to the trial date rescheduled after the stay is lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 1/22/2019. (CBL) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Stay
Tue 01/22 8:51 AM
MOTION to Stay due to Lapse in Appropriations by Defendant United States of America. (Luther, Steven) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Mon 09/24 3:02 PM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to amend the case management order (ECF No. 15) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendants shall disclose all expert witnesses and shall provide the reports required by Rule 26(a)(2), Fed.R.Civ.P., no later than October 8, 2018, and shall make expert witnesses available for depositions, and have depositions completed, no later than October 29, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all motions filed pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharm., Inc., 509 U.S. 579 (1993), shall be filed no later than November 29, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall complete all discovery in this case no later than November 5, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any motions to dismiss, for summary judgment, or motions for judgment on the pleadings must be filed no later than November 19, 2018. Opposition briefs shall be filed no later than December 10, 2018, and any reply brief may be filed no later than December 17, 2018. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that this action is set for a bench trial on March 18, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. This is a three- or four-day trial. The remainder of the Courts Case Management Order (ECF No. 8) remains in full force and effect. ( Bench Trial set for 3/18/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9N before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. Discovery Completion due by 11/5/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2018. Motion in Limine due by 3/8/2019. Pretrial Compliance due by 2/26/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on September 24, 2018. (MCB) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 09/18 3:11 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Continue Trial by Defendant United States of America. (Luther, Steven) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
adr
ADR Compliance Report
Mon 07/30 10:52 AM
ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT by Neutral: Plunkert, Thomas J.. Date of Conference: July 26, 2018. The parties participated in good faith. The parties did not achieve a settlement.(Plunkert, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
adr
Notice of Appointment of Neutral
Wed 04/04 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Plunkert, Thomas J. Neutral selected by the parties. (notice emailed to neutral this date)(CBL) |
|
12 | 12
3
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Wed 04/04 9:29 AM
ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' joint motion to extend completion deadline for ADR referral [ECF No.10 ] is GRANTED so the ADR completion deadline is extended from May 10, 2018, to July 31, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the CMO is AMENDED (1) to add a provision that any mental or physical examination of the parties must be completed by the June 7, 2018 discovery deadline (with arrangements for any such examination made by agreement of the parties); and (2) to substitute the following paragraph 5 (for the present paragraph 5) on page 3 of the CMO: 5. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law: Submit to the Court and to opposing counsel proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, including citations to relevant authority. All other terms and provisions of the CMO remain in full force and effect, including the deadline for filing substantive motions and related briefs, and the trial date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 4/4/2018. (CBL) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
adr
Designation of Neutral and ADR Conference Report
Wed 03/28 1:38 PM
Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff William L Rollins Neutral: Plunkert, Thomas J. Date of Conference: 7/17/2018 time: 9:30 a.m. Location: 555 Washington Ave, Ste 600, St. Louis, MO 63101(Boock, Jamie) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Mediation
Wed 03/28 1:35 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by Plaintiff William L Rollins. (Boock, Jamie) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
5
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to ADR
Fri 11/03 2:47 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation or Early Neutral Evaluation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Jamie Boock. ADR Completion Deadline due by 5/10/2018. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 5/24/2018. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 3/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 11/3/17. (EAB) |
|
8 | 8
order
Case Management Order
Fri 11/03 2:44 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track: 2. Motion to Join Parties due by 1/2/2018. Discovery Completion due by 6/7/2018. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 6/18/2018. This case shall be referred to alternative dispute resolution on March 15, 2018, and that reference shall terminate on May 10, 2018. Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2018. Pretrial Compliance due by 10/9/2018. Motion in Limine due by 10/19/2018. Bench Trial set for 10/29/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 9N before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 11/3/17. (EAB) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
minutes
Rule 16 Conference
Tue 10/31 10:53 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen: Rule 16 Conference held on 10/31/2017. Parties present for Rule 16 conference held in courtroom off the record. Schedule discussed. Case Management Order to issue. (FTR Gold: No) (CBL) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Joint Scheduling Plan
Mon 10/23 2:48 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff William L Rollins. . (Boock, Jamie) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Full Consent to a Magistrate
Mon 09/25 8:51 AM
FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff William L Rollins, Defendant United States of America. (CBL) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Rule 16 Order
Wed 09/06 4:11 PM
RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 10/24/2017. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/31/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9N before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on September 6, 2017. (MCB) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/05 1:37 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America.(Luther, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
Wed 06/14 6:26 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/14 10:28 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant United States of America with receipt number 0865-6001494, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by William L Rollins.(Boock, Jamie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/14/2017) (MFG). (MFG) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 5 (6/14/2017) Summons, | ||
Att: 6 (6/14/2017) Summons | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Wed 06/14 3:38 PM
Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Jamie L. Boock. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG) |