Williams v. DirecTV, LLC
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nannette A Baker |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01663 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 3:09 AM CST |
Defendant
DirecTV, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Thu 08/10 3:02 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the claims in this action are DISMISSED with prejudice with the parties to bear their own costs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 8/10/17. (CLA) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/10 11:50 AM
STIPULATION for Dismissal by Defendant DirecTV, LLC. (Hoffman, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/27 1:50 PM
NOTICE Change of Firm Name and E-mail Address: by Defendant DirecTV, LLC (Hughes, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Wed 07/12 3:04 PM
ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment no later than August 10, 2017. Failure to timely comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference previously scheduled for June 20, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. is cancelled and removed from the docket. Dismissal Paper(s) due by 8/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 7/12/17. (CLA) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 07/11 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by DirecTV, LLC (Hughes, Steven) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 07/11 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by DirecTV, LLC (Hughes, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
A Docket Text Order
Wed 07/05 3:51 PM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. [Doc. 14.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than July 14, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on July 5, 2017. (EMM) |
|
15 | 15
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 07/05 11:48 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant DirecTV, LLC. (Hughes, Steven) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 07/05 11:48 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant DirecTV, LLC. (Hughes, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
A Docket Text Order
Wed 06/21 4:54 PM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. [Doc. 11.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file its Answer or other responsive pleading no later than July 5, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on June 21, 2017. (EMM) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 06/21 3:13 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant DirecTV, LLC. (Hughes, Steven) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 06/21 3:12 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant DirecTV, LLC. (Hughes, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Full Consent to a Magistrate
Tue 06/20 3:54 PM
FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant DirecTV, LLC, Plaintiff Patricia Williams.. (CLA) |
|
Att: 1 consent | ||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Rule 16 Order
Mon 06/19 2:41 PM
RULE 16 ORDER Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/11/2017. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/20/2017 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. Magistrate Consent due by 7/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 6/19/17.(CLA) |
|
Att: 1 CONSENT | ||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Fri 06/16 8:05 AM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant DirecTV, LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hughes, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
Wed 06/14 6:27 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Wed 06/14 3:05 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Plaintiff Patricia Williams Sent To: Plaintiff (MFG) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY
Wed 06/14 2:58 PM
Petition Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Patricia Williams.(MFG) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Entry of Appearance
Wed 06/14 11:56 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph Michael Hoffman for Defendant DirecTV, LLC. (Hoffman, Joseph) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Entry of Appearance
Wed 06/14 11:54 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Steven J. Hughes for Defendant DirecTV, LLC. (Hughes, Steven) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Wed 06/14 11:53 AM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant DirecTV, LLC.. (Hughes, Steven) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal Petition
Wed 06/14 11:50 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of City of St. Louis, case number 1722-AC04840, with receipt number 0865-6001737, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by DirecTV, LLC.(Hughes, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State File, | ||
Att: 2 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 5 Attachment Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Wed 06/14 3:13 PM
Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (MFG) |