Hauser v. Syndicated Office Systems, LLC
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Ross |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01666 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 2:56 AM CST |
Defendant
Syndicated Office Systems, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Hauser
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Tue 06/19 4:42 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs.. SO ORDERED by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/19/18. (KKS) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Fri 03/23 4:21 PM
STIPULATION for Dismissal by Plaintiff Tammy Hauser. (Voytas, Richard) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 03/12 2:49 PM
ORDER: The Court having been advised by counsel that this matter has been settled,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel shall file, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/12/2018. (CLO) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 03/12 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Tammy Hauser (Voytas, Richard) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Case Management Order
Mon 08/14 10:22 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) This case is assigned to Track: 2 Motion to Join Parties due by 9/15/2017. Discovery Completion due by 5/15/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2018. Jury Trial set for 10/22/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross. Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/14/2017. (CLO) |
|
13 | 13
order
A Docket Text Order
Mon 08/14 10:18 AM
Docket Text ORDER: ; ORDERED By agreement of the parties, the Rule 16 conference scheduled for August 18, 2017 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/14/2017. (CLO) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Joint Scheduling Plan
Fri 08/11 1:15 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Syndicated Office Systems, LLC. . (Hamlin, Michael) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Mon 07/17 1:24 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties Joint Motion for Continuance10 is GRANTED. The Rule 16 scheduling conference set for Wednesday, July 19, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. is continued to Friday, August 18, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. The Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan is due by August 11, 2017. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/17/2017. (CLO) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Continue
Mon 07/17 11:48 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue by Plaintiff Tammy Hauser. (Voytas, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Rule 16 Order
Tue 06/20 3:32 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Scheduling Conference: The Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is set for Wednesday, July 19, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/12/2017. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/19/2017 11:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge John A. Ross. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/20/17. (JAB) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
CJRA Order
Mon 06/19 3:53 PM
CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge John A. Ross for all further proceedings (KKS) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Mon 06/19 1:50 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Syndicated Office Systems, LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hamlin, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
Wed 06/14 6:28 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY
Wed 06/14 3:15 PM
Petition Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Tammy Hauser.(BAK) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Wed 06/14 2:23 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Syndicated Office Systems, LLC.. (Hamlin, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/14 2:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Syndicated Office Systems, LLC.(Hamlin, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Wed 06/14 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Syndicated Office Systems, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Hamlin, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal Petition
Wed 06/14 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 17SL-AC12576, with receipt number 0865-6002223, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Syndicated Office Systems, LLC.(Hamlin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-State Court File, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Original Filing Form | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Wed 06/14 3:27 PM
Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK) |