Watkins v. University City Police Department
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Audrey G Fleissig |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01667 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 21, 2017 |
Defendant
University City Police Department
|
|
Plaintiff
Chauncey Leon Watkins Jr.
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter to D.O.C. on filing fee (case)
Mon 09/25 11:27 AM
Letter to D.O.C. re:initiation of prisoner's installment payments for filing fee (KXS) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter re:Frap
Thu 09/21 4:29 PM
Letter from Clerk sent to pro-se prisoner re:FRAP - all procedures for filing Notice of Appeal (copy of motion to proceed IFP on appeal attached and mailed) (BRP) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Thu 09/21 4:25 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: In accordance with the Memorandum and Order entered herewith, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on September 21, 2017. (BRP) |
|
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Thu 09/21 4:19 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No.3 ) is GRANTED. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(4), the initial partial filing fee is waived. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the institution having custody of plaintiff shall, whenever the amount in plaintiff's prison account exceeds $10.00, send monthly payments that equal 20 percent of the funds credited to the account the preceding month to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri Clerk's office, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i)-(ii). A separate order of dismissal will be entered herewith. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on September 21, 2017. (BRP) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 09/21 4:31 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4,5,6. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Thu Sep 21 16:31:33 CDT 2017 (Porter, Brittany) |
||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 09/21 9:47 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Chauncey Leon Watkins, Jr. (BRP) (BRP) |
|
Att: 1 (9/21/2017) Envelope, | ||
Att: 2 (9/21/2017) Correspondence | ||
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Fri 09/01 3:38 PM
ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall either pay the $400.00 filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if plaintiff files a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also submit a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six- month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Courts prisoner motion to proceed in forma pauperis form. If plaintiff fails to timely comply with this Order, the Court may dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice.. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/1/2017.(NEB) |
|
Att: 1 Form | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 09/01 3:38 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. Fri Sep 1 15:38:23 CDT 2017 (Blasko, Nicole) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
DCM Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)
Wed 06/14 2:31 PM
DCM COMPLAINT against defendant University City Police Department, filed by Chauncey Leon Watkins.(DLB) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope, | ||
Att: 3 Judge Assignment Label | ||
misc
Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Wed 06/14 2:32 PM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB) |
||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Wed 06/14 2:33 PM
Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (DLB) |
||
misc
Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Wed 06/14 3:01 PM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Jun 14 15:01:01 CDT 2017 (admin,) |