Milla v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jean C Hamilton |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01669 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 3:34 AM CST |
Defendant
Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Milla
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Thu 07/26 12:45 PM
Docket Text ORDER OF DISMISSAL - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 7/26/18. (KJS) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation
Wed 07/25 10:04 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Plaintiff John Milla. (Blake, Brad) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
adr
ADR Compliance Report
Mon 04/02 8:35 AM
ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT by Neutral: David, Michael P.. Date of Conference: 3/21/2018. The parties participated in good faith. The parties did not achieve a settlement.(Matthew, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
A Docket Text Order
Tue 03/27 1:22 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:13 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents and Plaintiff's Interrogatories by Plaintiff John Milla.(Blake, Brad) filed by John Milla; DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART; DISCLOSED DOCUMENTS NEED TO BE PRODUCED IN 12 DAYS. SO ORDERED JCH. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 3/27/18. (CLA) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
A Docket Text Order
Thu 03/22 3:39 PM
Docket Text ORDER: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING THE MOTION TO COMPEL; SET FOR TUESDAY, MARCH 27, 2018 AT 1:00 P.M. PLAINTIFF TO INITIATE THE CALL. SO ORDERED JCH. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 3/22/18. (CLA) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
5
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 03/14 10:42 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re13 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents and Plaintiff's Interrogatories filed by Plaintiff John Milla.(Blake, Brad) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Email | ||
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 03/06 8:13 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents and Plaintiff's Interrogatories filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Myers, Kevin) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Mon 02/26 11:53 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Compel filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois; GRANTED - SO ORDERED ( Response to Court RE DOC13 due by 3/6/2018.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 2/26/18. (KJS) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 02/23 9:49 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents and Plaintiff's Interrogatories by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Myers, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
adr
Notice of Appointment of Neutral
Wed 02/14 7:56 AM
NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: David, Michael P. Neutral selected by parties. Neutral emailed.(CLA) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
adr
Designation of Neutral and ADR Conference Report
Tue 02/13 4:06 PM
Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff John Milla Neutral: David, Michael P. Date of Conference: March 21, 2018 time: 9:00 a.m. Location: 711 N. 11th Street, St. Louis, MO 63101(Blake, Brad) |
|
21 | 21
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Tue 02/13 1:25 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. ( Response to Court due by 2/23/2018.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 2/13/18. (KJS) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Entry of Appearance
Fri 02/09 2:11 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Kevin E. Myers for Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Myers, Kevin) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 02/09 2:10 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Myers, Kevin) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Mon 02/05 10:19 AM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadlines set forth are to be met timely with the appropriate forms filed with the Clerk of the District Court as indicated in the Order Referring Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution. If a deadline cannot be met, the designated lead counsel shall file a motion requesting an extension of the deadline prior to the expiration of that deadline. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if compliance with a deadline set forth in the Order Referring Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution has not occurred, such noncompliance may result in the imposition of sanctions to the appropriate party or parties. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 2/5/18. (KJS) |
|
17 | 17
5
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to ADR
Mon 02/05 10:17 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Brad L. Blake ADR Completion Deadline due by 4/3/2018. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 4/17/2018. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 2/23/2018. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 2/5/18. (KJS) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Tue 01/23 11:47 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Re:13 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents and Plaintiff's Interrogatories filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. ( Response to Court due by 2/7/2018.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 1/23/18. (KJS) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 01/23 11:06 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Re:13 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents and Plaintiff's Interrogatories Filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (**Modified on 1/23/2018 to change event from a "Consent" to a "Motion."**) (KJS) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
14
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 01/05 1:57 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re13 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents and Plaintiff's Interrogatories filed by Plaintiff John Milla. (Blake, Brad) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Compel
Fri 01/05 1:56 PM
MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents and Plaintiff's Interrogatories by Plaintiff John Milla.(Blake, Brad) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Objections of Defendant, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Objections of Defendant, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment Correspondence, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment Responses of Defendant, | ||
Att: 5 Attachment Answers of Defendant, | ||
Att: 6 Attachment Correspondence | ||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Case Management Order
Tue 09/12 11:16 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: standard Motion to Join Parties due by 9/22/2017. Discovery Completion due by 7/20/2018. ADR Future Reference 2/1/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 7/20/2018. Jury Trial set for 11/5/2018 09:00 AM before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 9/12/17. (CLA) |
|
11 | 11
minutes
Rule 16 Conference
Tue 09/12 10:59 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton: Rule 16 Conference held on 9/12/2017. Conference held by phone. CMO to issue. (Notice only, no.pdf attached.). (FTR Gold: No) (CLA) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Joint Scheduling Plan
Thu 08/24 3:02 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff John Milla. . (Blake, Brad) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Rule 16 Order
Tue 08/08 2:21 PM
RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2-Standard Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/1/2017. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/12/2017 10:45 AM before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/8/17. (KJS) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
CJRA Order
Wed 06/28 2:03 PM
CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Jean C. Hamilton for all further proceedings. (KCB) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Fri 06/16 11:09 AM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Sent To: State Court - Executed (Wiseman, Gary) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
Thu 06/15 6:33 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/15 10:47 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.(BAK) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY
Thu 06/15 10:46 AM
Petition Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by John Milla.(BAK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Thu 06/15 10:52 AM
Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Wed 06/14 4:09 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. Parent companies: Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc.,. (Wiseman, Gary) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Wed 06/14 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Sent To: Plaintiff (Wiseman, Gary) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal Petition
Wed 06/14 4:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 17SL-CC01635, with receipt number 0865-6002694, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.(Wiseman, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pleadings, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Answer, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Return of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Original Filing Form |