Genoptix, Inc. v Triple-S Salud, Inc.
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Silvia Carreno-Coll |
Referred: | Silvia Carreno-Coll |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01796 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 5:57 AM AST |
Defendant
Triple-S Salud, Inc.
1441 F.D. Roosevelt Ave
San Juan, PR 00920 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Genoptix, Inc.
1811 Aston Ave
Carlsbad, CA 92008 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment
Mon 08/20 11:17 AM
JUDGMENT dismissing claims with prejudice. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 8/20/2018.(VCC) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/17 3:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Genoptix, Inc.. (Rodriguez-Vidal, Carlos) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion Submitting
Mon 04/09 10:12 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion submitting. Deadline to conclude depositions due by 3/28/2018. Answers to written discovery, Interrogatories, Requests for production of documents, and Request for admissions due by 4/13/2018. Conclusion of all discovery due by 5/15/2018. Deadline to file motions for summary judgment or any other dispositive motion due by 6/14/2018. Deadline to file answers to motions for summary judgment or any other dispositive motion due by 7/13/2018. Deadline to file Pretrial Memorandum due by 9/6/2018. Pretrial/Settlement Conference is set for 9/13/2018 at 9:30 AM in SCC's Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 4/6/2018. (mcv) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation
Wed 02/14 4:41 PM
STIPULATION re14 Minute,,,,, Scheduling Conference,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Jointly Filed by Triple-S Salud, Inc. and by Genoptix, Inc.. (Rodriguez-Vidal, Carlos) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Wed 10/11 1:01 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. Pursuant to the Order entered by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/11/17 (Docket No. 16), this case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll to conduct all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. All further pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 17-1796 (SCC). Signed by Clerk on 10/11/17.(gsr) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 10/11 11:38 AM
ORDER: Jury Trial is set for 8/20/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 10/11/2017. (mcv) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order
Wed 10/11 10:38 AM
ORDER Approving15 Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge filed by Triple-S Salud, Inc., Genoptix, Inc. "I cannot imprint my ink signature in the consent form given my absence from Puerto Rico due to a medical emergency, but a consent order can be entered on my behalf. If my ink signature is needed (which I believe not to be the case) I will scan the document, sign and date it and forward it with copy of my signature. I will then forward the scanned document with my signature by fed ex together with other documents sent to the court." Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/11/17.(su) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Wed 10/11 10:36 AM
CONSENT to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll by All Parties. (su) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
minutes
Minute Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 09/15 4:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll: An Initial Scheduling Conference was held on 9/15/2017. Deadline to exchange Initial Disclosures due by 9/15/2017. Submission of written discovery, Interrogatories, Requests for production of documents, and Requests for admissions due by 10/15/207. Deadline to file joint motion informing outcome of settlement efforts due by 11/15/2017. Deadline to conclude depositions due by 2/15/2018. Answers to written discovery, Interrogatories, Requests for production of documents, and Requests for admissions due by 2/28/2018. Deadline to conclude discovery due by 3/31/2018. Deadline to file motions for summary judgment or any other dispositive motion due by 3/30/2018. Deadline to file answers to motions for summary judgment or any other dispositive motion due by 5/30/2018. Deadline to file Pretrial Memorandum due by 7/23/2018. Pretrial/Settlement Conference is set for 7/30/2018 at 9:30 AM in SCC's Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. Jury Trial is set for 8/13/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. (mcv) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Initial Scheduling Conference Memorandum
Tue 09/05 4:03 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM by Genoptix, Inc.. (Rodriguez-Vidal, Carlos) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/15 4:10 PM
ORDER: A Joint ISC Memorandum is due by 9/5/2017 covering all items in Judge Garcia's Order at Docket No. 10 . An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 9/15/2017 at 9:30 AM in SCC's Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. Motions to continue the ISC shall include three alternate dates in which all parties are available. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 8/15/2017. (mcv) |
|
11 | 11
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Tue 08/15 1:53 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. Pursuant to the10 Order Referring Case entered by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/15/17, the case is referred to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll to hold an Initial Scheduling Conference. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/17.(gsr) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Scheduling Order - Case Management Order
Tue 08/15 9:54 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Carreno-Coll for an ISC. The Court hereby sets the following deadlines: Jury Trial set for 8/13/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. Pretrial/Settlement Conference set for 7/30/2018 03:00 PM before Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. JOINT Pretrial Memorandum due by 7/23/2018. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/15/2017. (MQ) |
|
Sunday, August 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Sun 08/13 8:23 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta on behalf of Defendant Triple-S Salud, Inc..(Alcover-Acosta, Cesar) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 07/18 5:34 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 07/18/2017. (lir) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 07/14 8:26 AM
First MOTION for extension of time until August 14, 2017 to to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta on behalf of Triple-S Salud, Inc. Responses due by 7/28/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alcover-Acosta, Cesar) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 06/26 6:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Genoptix, Inc. upon Triple-S Salud, Inc. served on 6/21/2017, answer due 7/12/2017. (Rodriguez-Vidal, Carlos) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/15 9:23 AM
Summons Issued as to Triple-S Salud, Inc. (arg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Thu 06/15 8:54 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/14 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos A. Rodriguez-Vidal on behalf of Genoptix, Inc. (Rodriguez-Vidal, Carlos) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Waiver of Service
Wed 06/14 3:44 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Triple-S Salud, Inc. on 14 June 2017 by Genoptix, Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 7/14/2017. (Rodriguez-Vidal, Carlos) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/14 3:39 PM
COMPLAINT against Triple-S Salud, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5485259.), filed by Genoptix, Inc.. Service due by 9/12/2017,(Rodriguez-Vidal, Carlos) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |