GANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | James E Boasberg |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01175 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 4:07 AM EST |
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRAD HEATH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GARRETT GRAFF
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES MADISON PROJECT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LACHLAN MARKAY
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Feb 23 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 56 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/23/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01167-JEB, 1:17-cv-01175-JEB, 1:17-cv-01189-JEB, 1:17-cv-01212-JEB(lcjeb1) |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
11
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Fri 02/23 3:54 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 56 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/23/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01167-JEB, 1:17-cv-01175-JEB, 1:17-cv-01189-JEB, 1:17-cv-01212-JEB(lcjeb1) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Fri 02/23 3:52 PM
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, provided that the Government shall produce to Plaintiffs the redacted version of one document; and (2) Judgment is ENTERED for Defendants against all Plaintiffs in case number 17-1175 and Freedom Watch, Inc. in case number 17-1212 Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/23/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01167-JEB, 1:17-cv-01175-JEB, 1:17-cv-01189-JEB, 1:17-cv-01212-JEB(lcjeb1) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Thu 10/19 8:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 24 Status Report, the Court ORDERS that they shall, by November 8, 2017, submit a further joint report, which may include a proposed briefing schedule. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/19/2017. (lcjeb2) |
||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 09/19 8:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a status report or a proposed briefing schedule on or before October 25, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/19/2017. (lcjeb2) |
||
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of QC
Wed 08/09 7:43 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR re12 Notice of Appearance; emailed to Mark@MarkZaid.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. In future, do not spread docket text to member case 17cv1175 file ONLY in lead case 17cv1167 (znmw, ) |
||
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/08 12:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Steven Zaid on behalf of GANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC, GARRETT GRAFF, BRAD HEATH, LACHLAN MARKAY, GANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC, GARRETT GRAFF, BRAD HEATH, JAMES MADISON PROJECT, LACHLAN MARKAY Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01167-JEB, 1:17-cv-01175-JEB(Zaid, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 07/26 9:38 AM
Case directly reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg by consent. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) |
|
utility
Create Case Association
Wed 07/26 11:48 AM
Cases Consolidated Gannett Satellite Information Network LLC v. Department of Justice, No. 17-1175 Judicial Watch, Inc., v. Department of Justice, No. 17-1189 and Freedom Watch, Inc., v. Department of Justice, No. 17-1212 ALL FILINGS IN THESE CONSOLIDATED CASES SHALL ONLY BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 17-1167 pursuant to Minute Order filed 7/26/17. The parties are advised NOT to elect to SPREAD text when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails.(td) |
||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Consolidate Cases
Tue 07/25 4:35 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Federighi, Carol) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 07/19 2:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by GANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC, BRAD HEATH, JAMES MADISON PROJECT, LACHLAN MARKAY, GARR GRAFF.(jf) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 07/19 11:40 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting8 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/19/2017. (lckbj1) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 07/14 4:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by GANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC, BRAD HEATH(Moss, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/10 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Federighi, Carol) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney
Thu 06/29 2:51 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/20/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/20/2017.(Moss, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit USADC receipt | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Thu 06/29 2:50 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/20/2017(Moss, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit DOJ receipt | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Thu 06/29 2:49 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/20/2017.(Moss, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit USAG receipt | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Thu 06/15 2:26 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (md) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Consent | ||
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Thu 06/15 2:09 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC. (md) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/15 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4992876) filed by GANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC, BRAD HEATH.(Moss, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, | ||
Att: 3 Summons DOJ, | ||
Att: 4 Summons USADC, | ||
Att: 5 Summons USAG | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/15 2:11 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (md) |