UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amit P Mehta |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01176 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 4:38 AM EST |
Defendant
DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STATE OF IOWA
|
|
Plaintiff
STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
|
|
Plaintiff
STATE OF MONTANA
|
|
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
.Order
Thu 10/19 3:25 PM
ORDER entering FINAL JUDGMENT. See the attached Final Judgment for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/19/2017. (lcapm3) |
|
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Final Judgment
Thu 10/19 3:19 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's14 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/19/2017. (lcapm3) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Entry of Final Judgment
Thu 09/28 6:57 PM
MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Stern, Lowell) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance With Provisions of the Antitrust Procedures and Penalties Act | ||
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Order
Thu 07/06 10:08 AM
ORDER Appointing Monitoring Trustees. Mazars LLC is appointed as Monitoring Trustee for the Crop Protection Divestiture Assets and ING Financial Markets LLC is appointed as Monitoring Trustee for the Material Science Divestiture Assets. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/06/2017. (lcapm3) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Motion For Order
Wed 07/05 2:41 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Order to Appoint Monitoring Trustees by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Stern, Lowell) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion of the United States to Appoint Monitoring Trustees, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
3
pgs
misc
Notice of Tunney Act Requirements
Mon 06/26 7:10 PM
NOTICE OF TUNNEY ACT REQUIREMENTS by DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY. (Cary, George) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/26 6:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY. (Cary, George) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/26 6:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by George S. Cary on behalf of DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY (Cary, George) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Notice of Tunney Act Requirements
Fri 06/23 9:47 AM
NOTICE OF TUNNEY ACT REQUIREMENTS by E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY. (Aronson, Clifford) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/23 7:30 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY. (Aronson, Clifford) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/23 7:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford Hank Aronson on behalf of E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY (Aronson, Clifford) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
.Order
Mon 06/19 12:23 PM
ASSET PRESERVATION STIPULATION AND ORDER. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/19/2017. (lcapm3) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/16 10:55 PM
Case randomly reassigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) |
|
service
Summons Not Issued
Fri 06/16 5:45 PM
SUMMONS (2) Not Issued as to DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY, E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY. (SUMMONS WERE NOT SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED) (md) |
||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Competitive Impact Statement
Thu 06/15 3:35 PM
COMPETITIVE IMPACT STATEMENT by UNITED STATES.(Stern, Lowell) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
2 | 2
misc
Notice of Tunney Act Requirements
Thu 06/15 3:33 PM
NOTICE OF TUNNEY ACT REQUIREMENTS by UNITED STATES.(Stern, Lowell) |
|
Att: 1 Asset Preservation Stipulation and Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Final Judgment | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/15 3:28 PM
COMPLAINT against DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY, E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES.(Stern, Lowell) Modified on 6/15/2017 (zrdj) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/16 5:41 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (md) |