mcknight v. 7 Eleven, Inc. et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Kollar-Kotelly |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01177 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 4:44 AM EST |
Defendant
7 ELEVEN, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TARIQ HUSSAIN
|
|
Defendant
YS CORP
|
|
Plaintiff
MARK MCKNIGHT
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
NIGIST TADESE
Terminated: 09/19/2017
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 10/25 1:19 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/25/2017. (lcckk3) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 10/25 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MARK MCKNIGHT (Watters, Keith) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Thu 10/12 8:39 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's motion by no later than OCTOBER 25, 2017. Defendant shall file a reply by no later than NOVEMBER 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/12/2017. (lcckk3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 10/18 4:14 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to15 due by 10/25/2017. Defendant's Reply due by 11/1/2017. (dot) |
||
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 10/11 5:13 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by 7 ELEVEN, INC.(Friedman, Sanford) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Tariq Hussain, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 09/28 4:55 PM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically for the Amended Complaint as to TARIQ HUSSAIN, MARK MCKNIGHT, NIGIST TADESE, YS CORP.(td) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
13 | 13
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Thu 09/28 12:23 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE YS Corp re11 Amended Complaint filed by MARK MCKNIGHT. Related document:11 Amended Complaint filed by MARK MCKNIGHT.(Watters, Keith) |
|
12 | 12
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Thu 09/28 12:21 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Tariq Hussein re11 Amended Complaint filed by MARK MCKNIGHT. Related document:11 Amended Complaint filed by MARK MCKNIGHT.(Watters, Keith) Modified on 9/28/2017 (td) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 09/28 9:36 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against 7 ELEVEN, INC., TARIQ HUSSAIN, YS CORP with Jury Demand filed by MARK MCKNIGHT.(td) |
|
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 09/27 5:57 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/27/17. (dot) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 09/26 4:06 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by MARK MCKNIGHT(Watters, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Order | ||
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
.Order
Wed 09/20 2:43 PM
ORDER Rescheduling Initial Scheduling Conference for November 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/20/2017. (lcckk3) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 09/19 7:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Status Conference held on 9/19/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2017 at 2:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Richard Ehlrich.) (dot) |
||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Meet and Confer Statement
Wed 09/13 5:55 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Friedman, Sanford) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Fri 09/01 12:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Due to an emergency that has arisen for the Court, the Initial Scheduling Conference previously set for 9/8/2017 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is VACATED and rescheduled for 9/19/2017 at 4:00 PM. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/1/2017. (lcckk3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 09/05 12:35 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2017 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot) |
||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
.Order
Thu 07/27 5:04 PM
ORDER FOR INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/27/2017. (lcckk3) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/27 9:45 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by 7 ELEVEN, INC..(Friedman, Sanford) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 07/28 12:01 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/8/2017 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
.Order
Tue 06/20 9:58 AM
ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 06/20/2017. (DM) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 06/19 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by MARK MCKNIGHT (Watters, Keith) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Fri 06/16 7:33 PM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to 7 ELEVEN, INC., NIGIST TADESE. (md) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Consent | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/15 3:36 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4993278) filed by mark mcknight.(Watters, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Summons 7-11, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons Tadesse | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/16 7:24 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (md) |