Sandoval, M.D. v. Department of Health & Human Services
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dora Lizette Irizarry |
Referred: | Roanne L Mann |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03532 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:1346 Tort Claim |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2017 4:31 AM EST |
Defendant
Department of Health & Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Sandoval, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Sunday, September 30, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 10/01 4:55 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT, that Defendant's motion to dismiss the Complaint is granted; and that this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court, by J. Poveda, Deputy Clerk on 9/30/2018. (Layne, Monique) |
|
9 | 9
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Sun 09/30 3:40 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -- For the reasons set forth in the ATTACHED WRITTEN MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, defendant's motion to dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is granted and the complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 9/30/2018. (Irizarry, Dora) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Reply in Support
Thu 11/02 3:40 PM
REPLY in Support re6 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant HHS's Motion to Dismiss filed by Department of Health & Human Services. (Soloveichik, Layaliza) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Thu 10/26 3:26 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re6 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Juan Sandoval, M.D.. (Schefflein, Elan) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 09/29 1:30 PM
Notice of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Department of Health & Human Services. (Soloveichik, Layaliza) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant HHS's Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Meredith Torres, dated September 27, 2017 | ||
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Order
Mon 08/28 3:42 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to File. In the absence of an objection, the court grants in substantial part defendant's request for an extension of time, until September 29, 2017, to respond to the complaint. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/28/2017. (Kelson, Lise) |
||
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 08/25 4:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Department of Health & Human Services. (Soloveichik, Layaliza) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/05 12:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Sandoval, M.D.. Department of Health & Human Services served on 6/21/2017, answer due 7/12/2017. (Schefflein, Elan) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 06/15 9:14 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/15 9:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Department of Health & Human Services. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/15 9:13 AM
COMPLAINT against Department of Health & Human Services, filed by Juan Sandoval, M.D.. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 06/15 9:13 AM
FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653116004 (Davis, Kimberly) |