Samuel v. Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | I Leo Glasser |
Referred: | Sanket J Bulsara |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03603 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:451 Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 4:22 AM EST |
Defendant
Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility
61-11 Queens Blvd
Rego Park, NY 11377 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vanity Samuel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 04/09 3:08 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and theirrespective counsel that, whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of this action, that the above-captioned action and all claims alleged therein be voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii), with each party to bear their own fees and costs. So Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 4/6/2018. (Almonte, Giselle) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 04/06 10:22 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility (Cohen, Matthew) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other) ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 03/30 2:37 PM
ORDER: In light of the letter dated March 29, 2018, the parties are directed to submit a stipulation of dismissal by 4/6/2018 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/30/2018. (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Thu 03/29 6:43 PM
Letter re Status of Case by Vanity Samuel (Rogers, Jennean) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Wed 03/28 5:14 PM
ORDER: At the prior status conference Plaintiff was directed to inform the Court whether she intends to continue the prosecution of this action, and was given until 3/27/2018 to do so. Plaintiff has failed to do so. It appears that Plaintiff does not wish to continue with this action. If that is the case, the parties are to file a stipulation of dismissal by 4/6/2018 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/28/2018. (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 03/13 8:15 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: An in-person status conference hearing was held on 3/13/2018. Counsel for parties were present. (See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding.). (FTR Log #2:19-2:26 PM.). (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 03/13 9:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to inform the Court whether she intends to continue the prosecution of this action, and should do so by 3/27/2018 . The close of fact discovery is set for 6/15/2018 . By 5/3/2018 the Parties are to provide a joint letter on: (1) their position on setting a settlement conference in this action; and (2) a proposed schedule for expert discovery. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/13/2018. (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 03/06 5:17 PM
RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the in person status conference scheduled for 3/13/2018 at 12:00 P.M. will now take place at 2:00 P.M. in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/6/2018. (Manson, Eddie) |
||
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 02/26 7:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility. (Cohen, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 11/29 6:08 PM
RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the status conference scheduled for 3/12/2018 at 2:00 PM is rescheduled to 3/13/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/29/2017. (Manson, Eddie) |
||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other) ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 10/16 9:08 AM
ORDER: The original status conference scheduled for 3/12/2018 at 2:00 PM before Judge Levy remains and will proceed before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/16/2017. (Manson, Eddie) |
||
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 10/11 4:53 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Wed 10/04 3:56 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Jennean Rogers, Matthew Cohen. Scheduling order entered. Settlement explored but not possible at this time. Discovery deadlines: 2/28/18 (fact), 4/20/18 (expert). Next conference 3/12/18 at 2:00.Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/4/2017 (Levy, Robert) |
||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/30 11:36 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/4/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/30/2017. (Marino, Janine) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 08/24 5:03 PM
ENDORSED ORDER, granting11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Adam Tauster terminated. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 8/24/2017. (Layne, Monique) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 08/23 4:44 PM
Letter MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility. (Tauster, David) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/21 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Cohen on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Matthew) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/28 11:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vanity Samuel. Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility served on 6/27/2017, answer due 7/18/2017. (Rogers, Jennean) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/17 3:56 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility. (Storch, Ellen) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/17 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Storch on behalf of Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility (aty to be noticed) (Storch, Ellen) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/17 3:48 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility (Tauster, David) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/17 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Adam Tauster on behalf of Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility (aty to be noticed) (Tauster, David) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/15 4:13 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 06/15 4:13 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/15 4:12 PM
Summons Issued as to Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/15 10:42 AM
COMPLAINT against Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9606032 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Vanity Samuel. (Rogers, Jennean) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/15 4:10 PM
Case assigned to Judge I. Leo Glasser and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |