Luke's Lobster LLC et al v. RCN Telecom Services, LLC et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kiyo A Matsumoto |
Referred: | James Orenstein |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03607 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 4:15 AM EST |
Defendant
RCN Telecom Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Boathouse, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Holden Seafood Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luke's Lobster LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Report on Copyright AO121
Wed 08/30 11:43 AM
Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Rocco, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | ||
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/28 3:13 PM
NOTICE Of Voluntary Dismissal granted with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i).So Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 8/28/2017. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/28 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Holden Seafood Corp., Luke's Lobster LLC /Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice [please disregard previously filed incorrect Notice of Dismissal, Docment No. 8] (Gursky, Steven) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/28 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Holden Seafood Corp., Luke's Lobster LLC (Gursky, Steven) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 06/30 9:56 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luke's Lobster LLC, Holden Seafood Corp.. RCN Telecom Services, LLC waiver sent on 6/29/2017, answer due 8/28/2017; The Boathouse, LLC waiver sent on 6/29/2017, answer due 8/28/2017. (Gursky, Steven) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Report on Copyright AO121
Thu 06/15 2:57 PM
Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Rocco, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 complaint | ||
5 | 5
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/15 12:34 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 06/15 12:31 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/15 12:30 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Boathouse summons | ||
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure of Interested Parties
Thu 06/15 12:02 PM
DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Luke's Lobster LLC, Holden Seafood Corp.. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/15 12:01 PM
COMPLAINT against RCN Telecom Services, LLC, The Boathouse, LLC Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Luke's Lobster LLC, Holden Seafood Corp.. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons | ||
misc
Notice to Pay Civil Filing Fee
Thu 06/15 12:03 PM
The case of Luke's Lobster LLC et al v. RCN Telecom Services, LLC et al , has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. The case number is 17cv3607 . PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within seven (7) days . Select the event (Civil Case Filing Fee) and pay online. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
||
misc
Civil Case Filing Fee
Thu 06/15 12:09 PM
CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 0207-9606948 (Gursky, Steven) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/15 12:29 PM
Case assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |