Americare Inc. v. RSUI Indemnity Company
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond J Dearie |
Referred: | Roanne L Mann |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03615 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 4:42 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
RSUI Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Americare Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RSUI Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Americare Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 01/22 2:43 PM
STIPULATION Of Dismissal: This action is hereby discontinued and dismissed with prejudice. SO Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 1/22/2018. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Proposed Pretrial Order
Mon 01/22 10:08 AM
Proposed Pretrial Order by Americare Inc. (Margulies, Robert) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 01/19 3:26 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Americare Inc. (Margulies, Robert) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Settlement Agreement
Fri 01/19 3:21 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Americare Inc. (Margulies, Robert) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order(Other)
Thu 12/14 3:28 PM
ORDER re13 Settlement Conference. The parties have informed this Court that they have accepted its settlement proposal. They are directed to file a Stipulation of Discontinuance with the Clerk of the Court via ECF no later than January 22, 2018. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/14/2017. (Proujansky, Josh) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 12/13 4:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann: Settlement Conference held on 12/13/2017. Fact discovery is to be completed February 15, 2018. See attached Minute Entry for complete ruling. The parties are directed to respond to the Court's settlement proposal by December 14, 2018. (Kelson, Lise) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 11/07 10:35 AM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by RSUI Indemnity Company. (Galati, Alla) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 11/07 5:15 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER12 In violation of the Court's Individual Rules, which require that such motions be made at least two weeks in advance, the parties request that the settlement conference scheduled for Thursday afternoon be adjourned 30 days, until December 11, 2017. The Court reluctantly grants the request for an adjournment, but instead schedules the proceeding for December 13, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. The discovery schedule remains unchanged. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/7/2017. (Kelson, Lise) |
||
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Wed 08/23 3:59 PM
Answer to Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Americare Inc.. (Margulies, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Mon 07/31 3:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann: Initial Conference Hearing held on 7/31/2017. Fact discovery is to be completed by February 15, 2018. The next settlement conference is scheduled for November 9, 2017 @ 2:00 p.m. See attached Minute Entry for complete ruling. (Kelson, Lise) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/27 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin G. Mikulaninec on behalf of RSUI Indemnity Company (aty to be noticed) (Mikulaninec, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/26 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alla C. Galati on behalf of RSUI Indemnity Company (aty to be noticed) (Galati, Alla) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/25 10:20 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9705544. by RSUI Indemnity Company. (Hardin, George) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/25 10:11 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9705455. by RSUI Indemnity Company. (Hardin, George) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/25 10:22 AM
ORDER granting [6-3] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/25/2017. (Kelson, Lise) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/25 1:38 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/25/2017. (Kelson, Lise) |
||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/27 4:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference is set for 7/31/2017 @ 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 13C South before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. ***NOTE: bring the required number of copies of the completed initial conference questionnaire to the conference. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/27/2017. (Kelson, Lise) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 06/22 6:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Americare Inc. by RSUI Indemnity Company. (Hardin, George) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 06/16 9:28 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 06/16 9:28 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 06/15 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RSUI Indemnity Company from New York Supreme Court, Kings County, case number 508685/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9608046) (Hardin, George) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix Table, | ||
Att: 4 Removal Action Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit of Service | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/16 9:26 AM
Case assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |