Palmer v. Schindler Elevator Corporation
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allyne R Ross |
Referred: | Roanne L Mann |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03619 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 4:29 AM EST |
Defendant
Schindler Elevator Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha Palmer
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 18 2017
ORDER ADOPTING 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: This action is remanded to the Supreme Court of New York, Kings County. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 7/18/2017. (Ranucci, Jessica) |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 07/18 10:15 AM
ORDER ADOPTING7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: This action is remanded to the Supreme Court of New York, Kings County. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 7/18/2017. (Ranucci, Jessica) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Thu 07/06 3:10 PM
OBJECTION to7 Report and Recommendations filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Schultz, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice(Other)
Thu 06/29 4:44 PM
NOTICE by Schindler Elevator Corporation AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Schultz, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
motion
Sua Sponte - Report and Recommendations
Thu 06/22 5:49 PM
SUA SPONTE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. This Court respectfully recommends that the action be remanded to the Supreme Court of New York, Kings County. Objections to R&R due by 7/6/2017. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/22/2017. (Proujansky, Josh) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/16 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Christine Breitenbach on behalf of Schindler Elevator Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Breitenbach, Laura) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 06/16 9:37 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 06/16 9:36 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/15 4:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Schultz, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/15 4:05 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schindler Elevator Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Schindler Enterprises, Inc. for Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Schultz, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 06/15 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Schindler Elevator Corporation from Kings Supreme Court, case number 509647/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9608443) (Schultz, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/16 9:36 AM
Case assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |