UN4 Productions, Inc. v. Doe-67.243.172.121 et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela K Chen |
Referred: | James Orenstein |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03621 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 4:45 AM EST |
Defendant
Doe-98.15.38.32
|
|
Defendant
Doe-69.118.1.64
|
|
Defendant
Doe-24.46.222.0
|
|
Plaintiff
UN4 Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Doe-173.56.58.139
Terminated: 12/01/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe-98.113.28.221
Terminated: 08/14/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe-74.71.192.14
Terminated: 12/01/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe-68.175.46.97
Terminated: 09/06/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe-67.84.113.117
Terminated: 12/01/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe-67.244.95.77
Terminated: 08/01/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe-67.243.172.121
Terminated: 08/16/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe-67.243.161.149
Terminated: 12/01/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe-47.16.72.10
Terminated: 09/06/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe-24.46.214.161
Terminated: 09/14/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe-24.164.131.164
Terminated: 12/01/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe-104.162.251.153
Terminated: 12/01/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Report on Copyright AO121
Mon 12/11 9:38 AM
Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Rocco, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Order dismissing case (electronic) | ||
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 12/07 2:46 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The19 Voluntary Dismissal is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 12/7/2017. (Abdallah, Fida) |
||
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 12/05 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UN4 Productions, Inc. Without Prejudice as to All Remaining Defendants (DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Fri 12/01 9:38 AM
Order Dismissing Parties: The18 Voluntary Dismissal as to Doe-24.164.131.164, Doe-67.243.161.149, Doe-67.84.113.117, Doe-74.71.192.14, Doe-104.162.251.153, and Doe-173.56.58.139 is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 12/1/2017. (Abdallah, Fida) |
||
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 11/30 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UN4 Productions, Inc. Without Prejudice as to DOE-104.162.251.153; DOE-74.71.192.14; DOE-24.164.131.164; DOE-67.243.161.149; DOE-173.56.58.139; and DOE-67.84.113.117 (DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 10/11 11:28 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Status Conference held on 10/11/2017. The non-parties whom I had ordered to participate in today's conference - Maria Herrera, Efigenia Valerio, Semone Gray, and Yvonne Mullings - failed to appear as required and have not responded to the motion for discovery. I therefore grant as unopposed the motion with respect to those individuals and permit the plaintiff to serve subpoenas requiring each of them to testify at a deposition limited to one hour in duration. I also granted the plaintiff's oral request for a 30-day extension of time to effect service of process. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). (Orenstein, James) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Wed 10/11 11:29 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Discovery. See docket entry17 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/11/2017. (Orenstein, James) |
||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/13 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UN4 Productions, Inc. Without Prejudice as to Doe-24.46.214.161 (DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 09/06 6:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UN4 Productions, Inc. re Scheduling Order, (DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 09/06 9:38 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re14 Letter MOTION for Discovery -- Any person opposing this motion is respectfully directed to respond by October 6, 2017. An in-person status conference will be held on October 11, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South. The plaintiff is respectfully directed to serve this order on all respondents. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/6/2017. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Discovery
Tue 09/05 8:42 PM
Letter MOTION for Discovery / for Leave to Take Discovery of Uncooperative Subscribers, addressed to the Hon. Magistrate Judge James Orenstein, by UN4 Productions, Inc.. (DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/05 8:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UN4 Productions, Inc. Without Prejudice as to Doe-68.175.46.97 (DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/05 7:53 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UN4 Productions, Inc. Without Prejudice as to Doe-47.16.72.10 (DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 08/30 9:08 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File / Extension of Time Within Which to Serve Complaint, addressed to the Hon. Magistrate Judge James Orenstein, by UN4 Productions, Inc.. (DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 08/30 2:39 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to File -- The motion is granted; the plaintiff shall serve the complaint by November 13, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/30/2017. (Klewin, Erin) |
||
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/16 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UN4 Productions, Inc. With Prejudice as to Doe-67.243.172.121 (DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/14 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UN4 Productions, Inc. Without Prejudice as to Doe-98.113.28.221 (DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/31 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UN4 Productions, Inc. Without Prejudice as to Doe-67.244.95.77 (DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Tue 06/27 3:51 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part5 Motion for Discovery. For the reasons set forth above, I grant the plaintiff's motion to the extent it seeks to serve subpoenas seeking the names and postal addresses associated with the defendants' IP addresses, and deny the remainder of the motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/27/2017. (Klewin, Erin) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 06/20 11:18 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/20/2017. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Report on Copyright AO121
Fri 06/16 12:01 PM
Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Rocco, Christine) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Discovery
Fri 06/16 11:52 AM
Letter MOTION for Discovery / for Permission to File Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by UN4 Productions, Inc.. (DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 06/16 9:47 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 06/16 9:46 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Fri 06/16 9:45 AM
Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/15 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Doe-104.162.251.153, Doe-173.56.58.139, Doe-24.164.131.164, Doe-24.46.214.161, Doe-24.46.222.0, Doe-47.16.72.10, Doe-67.243.161.149, Doe-67.243.172.121, Doe-67.244.95.77, Doe-67.84.113.117, Doe-68.175.46.97, Doe-69.118.1.64, Doe-74.71.192.14, Doe-98.113.28.221, Doe-98.15.38.32 filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9608815 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by UN4 Productions, Inc.. (DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit IP Addresses, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Copyright Registration, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/16 9:43 AM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |