Kao Kabushiki Kaisha et al v. Train Wreck Limited Liability Company et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dora Lizette Irizarry |
Referred: | Sanket J Bulsara |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03625 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 3:58 AM EST |
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
|
|
Defendant
Samer Abuali
|
|
Defendant
Train Wreck Limited Liability Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Kao USA Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kao Kabushiki Kaisha
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
47 | 47
notice
Notice of Report Patent or Trademark AO120
Tue 04/30 10:40 AM
Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Hong, Loan) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulation and Order | ||
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
46 | 46
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 04/26 5:28 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs Kao Kabushiki Kaisha t/a Kao Corporation and Kao USA, Inc. and Defendants Train Wreck Limited Liability Company and Samer Abuali, that the above-captioned matter is hereby dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) without prejudice and without costs and/or attorneys' fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 4/25/2019. Fwd. to chambers. (Layne, Monique) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 04/22 5:36 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 03/20 12:33 PM
ORDER: The motion for extension of time44 is granted. Parties must file a stipulation of dismissal by 4/22/2019 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/20/2019. (Murphy, Colleen) |
||
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 03/19 4:10 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Discontinuance wherein the parties respectfully request through and until April 22, 2019 to file the stipulation of discontinuance in this matter by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc.. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 03/07 11:40 AM
ORDER: The motion for extension of time43 is granted. The deadline for parties to file the stipulation of dismissal is hereby extended to 3/20/2019 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/7/2019. (Murphy, Colleen) |
||
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 03/06 4:51 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Discontinuance wherein the parties request through and until March 20, 2019 to file the Stipulation of Discontinuance by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc.. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 02/07 4:03 PM
ORDER: The motion for extension of time42 is granted. The deadline for parties to file the stipulation of dismissal is hereby extended to 3/6/2019 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 2/7/2019. (Murphy, Colleen) |
||
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 02/06 5:50 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Discontinuance by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc.. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Wed 01/16 2:55 PM
ORDER: In light of the notice of settlement41 , parties should file a stipulation of dismissal by 2/6/2019 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/16/2019. (Murphy, Colleen) |
||
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Letter
Tue 01/15 5:03 PM
Letter to the Court regarding Status Report on settlement discussions by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
Wednesday, December 05, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings
Wed 12/05 2:11 PM
ORDER: The motion to adjourn40 is granted. The settlement conference scheduled for 12/6/2018 is hereby adjourned sine die. Parties are directed to file a status report on settlement discussions by 1/15/2019 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/5/2018. (Murphy, Colleen) |
||
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 12/04 4:37 PM
Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for December 6, 2018 by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc.. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 08/31 1:13 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall submit a joint certification that discovery has been completed by 8/14/2019 . Other deadlines set based on parties' submitted joint discovery worksheet and are reflected in the attached order. An in-person settlement conference will be held on 12/06/2018 at 2:00 P.M. before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All parties must be present. Parties are to submit their respective settlement positions via ex parte to Chambers email no later than three days before 12/06/2018. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference. Defendant is given leave to file a answer on or before 9/07/2018 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/31/2018. (Manson, Eddie) |
|
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Fri 08/31 12:55 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: An in person initial conference hearing was held on 8/31/2018. Counsel for both parties were present. (See separate docket entry for orders issuing from this proceeding.) (FTR Log #11:40-11:59.) (Manson, Eddie) |
||
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice(Other)
Wed 08/29 4:37 PM
NOTICE by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc. re37 Scheduling Order, Joint Discovery Plan (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other) Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 07/10 2:32 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS --- No party has objected to the Report and Recommendation ("R&R") issued on May 29, 2018, by the Hon. Sanket J. Bulsara, U.S.M.J., and, upon due consideration and review, the R&R is hereby adopted in full. Accordingly, the motion of Defendants Train Wreck and Abuali to vacate the default is granted, and the motion of Plaintiffs Kao Kabushiki Kaisha and Kao USA Inc. for default judgment is denied as moot. This matter is referred to the magistrate judge for further pretrial proceedings. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/10/2018. (Irizarry, Dora) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Hearing
Tue 07/10 2:35 PM
ORDER finding as moot36 Motion for Hearing -- Plaintiff's motion is terminated as moot. The magistrate judge has scheduled a conference in this matter and has requested that the parties provide information for a discovery plan. Moreover, it was inappropriate for plaintiff to include a request to the undersigned in a letter to the magistrate judge with respect to the report and recommendations issued by the magistrate judge on May 29, 2018. If plaintiffs had no objections to the report and recommendation, they should have said that to me. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/10/2018. (Irizarry, Dora) |
||
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/02 11:09 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person initial conference will be held on 8/31/2018 at 11:30 A.M. in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two (2) days before 8/31/2018 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 7/2/2018. (Manson, Eddie) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Hearing
Fri 06/29 3:23 PM
MOTION for Hearing re35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re24 MOTION to Vacate vacate default filed by Train Wreck Limited Liability Company,16 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Kao USA Inc., Kao Kabushiki Kaisha - Letter motion requesting a Conference Call to discuss the case status, to set forth a discovery plan and schedule an Initial Conference by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc.. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 05/29 3:56 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re Motion to Vacate, Motion for Default Judgment24 ,16 . For the reasons stated in the attached, this Court respectfully recommends that Defendants' motion to vacate the default be granted; and that Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment be denied as moot. Any objections to this R&R must be filed with the Honorable Dora L. Irizarry by 6/12/2018 . Failure to file objections in a timely manner may waive a right to appeal the District Court order. See 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/29/2018. (Cardenas, Alex) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 04/06 11:21 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re24 MOTION to Vacate vacate default ,16 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Ramadan, Mohmoud) |
|
Att: 1 attachment to Defendants' letter in further support of cross motion, | ||
Att: 2 second attachment to Defendants' letter in further support of cross motion | ||
33 | 33
misc
Letter
Fri 04/06 4:26 PM
Letter regarding Plaintiffs supplemental submission regarding Defendants motion to vacate (Docket Entry 24) by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc. (Smith, Scott) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Transcript
Mon 04/02 4:09 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 26, 2018, before Judge Bulsara. Court Transcriber: Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Telephone number 203-929-9992. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 4/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2018. (Rocco, Christine) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 03/29 11:39 AM
ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to File31 is granted. The plaintiffs are directed to submit any supplemental submission by 4/6/2018 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/29/2018. (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 03/28 9:55 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File wherein request is made that the current deadline to make a supplemental submission to the Court regarding the pending motions, which is March 30, 2018, be extended through and until Friday, April 6, 2018 by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc.. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing Settlement Conference
Mon 03/26 6:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: An in-person Motion Hearing re24 MOTION to Vacate vacate default filed by Train Wreck Limited Liability Company and a Settlement Conference were held on 3/26/2018. Counsel for parties were present. The parties will continue to discuss settlement. (See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding.). (FTR Log #4:40-5:15 PM.). (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
order
~Util - Set Deadlines Order(Other)
Mon 03/26 6:18 PM
ORDER: As discussed on the record, the parties may make any supplemental submission, not to exceed two (2) pages, in connection with the motion to vacate the default judgment, and shall do so by 3/30/2018 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/26/2018. (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
order
Order Referring Motion
Mon 03/05 3:15 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION:24 MOTION to Vacate vacate default filed by Train Wreck Limited Liability Company -- This motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 3/5/2018. (Carosella, Christy) |
||
order
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
Mon 03/05 8:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person Motion Hearing re24 MOTION to Vacate vacate default filed by Train Wreck Limited Liability Company is set for 3/26/2018 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Bulsara. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/5/2018. (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
respoth
Reply in Support
Fri 01/19 4:45 PM
REPLY in Support re16 MOTION for Default Judgment [Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment and In Opposition to Defendants' Cross Motion to Vacate] filed by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc.. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 01/04 12:08 PM
ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply29 is granted. Plaintiffs are directed to submit their consolidated brief by 1/19/2018 . SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/4/2018. (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 01/03 4:23 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to24 MOTION to Vacate vacate default ,16 MOTION for Default Judgment with the consent of Defendants by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc.. (Ibrahim, Bassam) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 01/03 3:08 PM
ORDER: The requests for extension of time in connection with the motion for default and cross motion to vacate default, and to submit a consolidated brief28 are denied. The motion fails to indicate whether Defendants consent to or oppose the requests, and thereby fails to comply with the Court's individual practices, and is therefore denied. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/3/2018. (Zhang, Fan) |
||
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 01/02 12:26 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to24 MOTION to Vacate vacate default ,16 MOTION for Default Judgment by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc.. (Ibrahim, Bassam) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
6
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Wed 12/27 10:01 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support Defendants' motion to vacate default filed by All Defendants. (Ramadan, Mohmoud) |
|
26 | 26
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 12/27 10:00 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re24 MOTION to Vacate vacate default filed by All Defendants. (Ramadan, Mohmoud) |
|
25 | 25
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 12/27 9:59 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re24 MOTION to Vacate vacate default filed by All Defendants. (Ramadan, Mohmoud) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Vacate
Wed 12/27 9:57 PM
MOTION to Vacate vacate default by Train Wreck Limited Liability Company. (Ramadan, Mohmoud) |
|
23 | 23
6
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Wed 12/27 9:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants. (Ramadan, Mohmoud) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Wed 12/27 9:53 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re16 MOTION for Default Judgment Affirmation filed by All Defendants. (Ramadan, Mohmoud) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Wed 12/27 9:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re16 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Ramadan, Mohmoud) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 12/20 3:37 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendants are directed to respond to motion for default judgment16 by 12/27/2017 . SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/20/2017. (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/19 6:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mohmoud Ramadan on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Ramadan, Mohmoud) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Response to Motion Rule 56.1 Statement
Tue 12/19 6:11 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re16 MOTION for Default Judgment Letter on consent seeking extension of time to oppose motion for default , RULE 56.1 STATEMENT filed by Train Wreck Limited Liability Company. (Ramadan, Mohmoud) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thu 12/07 11:04 AM
ORDER RE16 Motion for Default Judgment -- The Clerk of Court having noted default, this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara to conduct an inquest, if necessary, as to damages and/or legal fees. The Clerk of Court shall note this referral on the docket. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/7/2017. (Carosella, Christy) |
||
utility
Motions Referred
Thu 12/07 11:05 AM
MOTION REFERRED:16 MOTION for Default Judgment -- Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. (Carosella, Christy) |
||
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
16
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Thu 11/30 6:03 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re16 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc.. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Thu 11/30 6:00 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re16 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc.. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Default Judgment
Thu 11/30 5:58 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc.. Responses due by 12/14/2017 (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Wed 11/15 4:07 PM
ORDER -- At Plaintiffs' request, on November 3, 2017, the Clerk of the Court issued a notation of default against defendants for their failure to appear. Plaintiffs have not filed a formal motion for the entry of default judgment with appropriate supporting documents. Accordingly, Plaintiffs are directed to file a motion for default judgment no later than November 30, 2017. Plaintiffs further are directed to serve a copy of this Electronic Order on defendants within five days of the date of this Order and immediately thereafter file proof of such service with the Court. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/15/2017. (Carosella, Christy) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 11/03 10:26 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Samer Abuali, Train Wreck Limited Liability Company has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Samer Abuali, Train Wreck Limited Liability Company is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Tue 10/31 12:59 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc. (Smith, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Affirmation in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Certificate of Default | ||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Order(Other)
Fri 09/29 1:29 PM
ORDER granting11 The Motion of Bassam Ibrahim for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/29/2017. (Manson, Eddie) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Order(Other)
Fri 09/29 1:31 PM
ORDER granting12 The Motion of Scott L. Smith for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/29/2017. (Manson, Eddie) |
||
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/26 12:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9855729. by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc.. (Smith, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Certificates of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/26 12:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9855550. by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc.. (Ibrahim, Bassam) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Certificates of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/26 11:22 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc.. Samer Abuali served on 6/19/2017, answer due 7/10/2017. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/26 11:20 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha, Kao USA Inc.. Train Wreck Limited Liability Company served on 6/19/2017, answer due 7/10/2017. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 09/13 4:42 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 06/16 9:57 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 06/16 9:56 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/16 9:56 AM
Summons Issued as to Samer Abuali, Train Wreck Limited Liability Company. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Samer summons | ||
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 06/15 5:45 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha t/a Kao Corporation, Kao USA Inc. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 06/15 5:43 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha t/a Kao Corporation, Kao USA Inc. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 06/15 5:41 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha t/a Kao Corporation, Kao USA Inc. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/15 5:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha t/a Kao Corporation, Kao USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent KAO KABUSHIKI KAISHA t/a KAO CORPORATION is a publicly-held corporation of Japan and has no parent company. No publicly-held corporation owns ten percent (10%) or more of KAO KABUSHIKI KAISHA t/a KAO CORPORATION. KAO USA INC. is a wholly owned subsidiary of KAO KABUSHIKI KAISHA t/a KAO CORPORATION. for Kao USA Inc.. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/15 5:30 PM
COMPLAINT against John Does 1 - 10, Samer Abuali, Train Wreck Limited Liability Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9609141 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Kao Kabushiki Kaisha t/a Kao Corporation, Kao USA Inc.. (Weyand, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/16 9:55 AM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |