Abraham et al v. The Town of Huntington et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gary R Brown |
Referred: | Steven I Locke |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03616 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Oct 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 3:57 AM EST |
Defendant
Susan A. Berland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eugene Cook
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Crown Castle NG East LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark A. Cuthbertson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Frank P. Petrone
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Town Board of the Town of Huntington
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Town of Huntington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jodi Abraham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Abraham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jo-Ann Giambruno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Perry Giambruno
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
82 | 82
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 03/26 11:32 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re80 Stipulation of Dismissal - The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. SO Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/26/2021. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
81 | 81
order
Stipulation and Order
Fri 03/26 11:22 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re79 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Jodi Abraham, Peter Abraham - SO Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/26/2021. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Thursday, March 25, 2021 | ||
80 | 80
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 03/25 5:49 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jo-Ann Giambruno, Perry Giambruno (Riva, Samuele) |
|
79 | 79
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 03/25 5:49 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jodi Abraham, Peter Abraham (Riva, Samuele) |