Arocho-Martinez v. USA
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Gustavo A Gelpi |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01801 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Judgment
Tue 06/20 11:12 AM
JUDGMENT is hereby entered dismissing Petitioner's motion to vacate sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sec 2255. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/20/2017.(MET) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order
Tue 06/20 11:08 AM
ORDER: It is further ordered that no certificate of appealability should be issued in the event that petitioner files a notice of appeal, because there is no substantial showing of a denial of a constitutional right under 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2). Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/20/2017.(MET) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion to Vacate
Mon 06/19 5:44 PM
ORDER: Denying2 Motion to Vacate. Petitioner' motion to vacate sentence was filed in excess of 28 U.S.C. sec 2255's one-year statute of limitations. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/19/2017. (MET) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Thu 06/15 1:47 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 14-207) filed by Orlando Arocho-Martinez, Pro Se. Responses due by 6/29/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(arg) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Thu 06/15 1:45 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. In view of the retirement of Judge Jose A. Fuste, this case has been reassigned to the docket of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. Signed by Clerk on 6/15/17.(gsr) |