Hernandez-Albert v. USA
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Carmen C Cerezo |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01802 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2020 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Tuesday, May 19, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 05/22 3:33 PM
Mail sent via regular mail to Luis Daniel Hernandez-Albert re7 Judgment,6 Opinion and Order was returned as undeliverable. Addressee is no longer at FCI Fort Dix. (vso) |
|
Tuesday, April 07, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment
Tue 04/07 3:50 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 4/7/2020.(vso) |
|
6 | 6
order
~Util - Terminate Motions Opinion and Order
Tue 04/07 3:10 PM
ORDER: Petitioner's1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) is DENIED. Judgment shall enter by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 4/7/20.(JWS) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 01/02 8:31 AM
ORDER granted retroactively3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to1 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 12/7/2017. (mld) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 09/15 11:45 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by USA Re:1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 13-609) filed by Luis Daniel Hernandez-Albert filed by USA. (Bauza, Mariana) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 08/31 7:22 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until October 2, 2017 to File Response/Reply as to1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 13-609) filed by Luis Daniel Hernandez-Albert filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 9/14/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/01 2:01 PM
ORDER: USA shall respond by 8/31/2017 to Petitioner's1 pro se Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 13-609). Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 8/1/2017. (mld) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Thu 06/15 2:08 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 13-609) filed by Luis Daniel Hernandez-Albert, pro se. Responses due by 6/29/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (ab) |