Finance of America Reverse, LLC v. Santiago Berrios et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Aida M Delgado-Colon |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01806 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 12, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 5:23 AM AST |
Defendant
Otilia Santiago Berrios
|
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Finance of America Reverse, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 01/13 4:18 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Clerk on 1/12/2023.(su) |
|
misc
Notice of Docket Text Modification
Tue 01/17 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re:33 Clerk's Judgment. ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong PDF. Will be re-filed.*** (idg) |
||
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 01/17 5:00 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing compliant without prejudice. Signed by Clerk on 1/12/2023.(su) Modified filing date on 1/17/2023 (idg) |
|
32 | 32
order
Order
Thu 01/12 3:11 PM
ORDER re31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Finance of America Reverse, LLC. NOTED and GRANTED. Pursuant to plaintiff's request the case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/12/2023.(wm) |
|
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Attorney Only
Thu 01/12 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Finance of America Reverse, LLC (Santiago-Sanchez, Krystal) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 01/11 1:24 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff's last status report, filed close to three years ago, is the most recent filing in this case. Therefore, the Court ORDERS plaintiff to provide a status report of its case within 30 days of the issuance of this order and indicate whether it intends to prosecute its case or file a notice of voluntary dismissal. Non-compliance with this order may and will result in sanctions and/or the dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/11/2023.(wm) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Status Report
Thu 03/05 6:00 PM
STATUS REPORT by Finance of America Reverse, LLC. (Vazquez-Lozada, Jose) |
|
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Informative Motion
Wed 12/04 2:40 PM
ORDER re27 INFORMATIVE motion, Noted. Plaintiff shall file a status report regarding the loss mitigation process within 90 days. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/27/2019. (rom) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Informative Motion
Wed 11/20 5:59 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vazquez-Lozada, Jose) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order
Fri 08/09 5:29 PM
ORDER re25 MOTION requesting Order To Close Case Administratevely In Compliance With Federal Regulations filed by Finance of America Reverse, LLC. NOTED. Plaintiff shall file a status report regarding the loss mitigation process within 90 days from the date of issuance of this Order. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment, ECF No.21 , is hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Meanwhile, case will be stayed. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/8/2019.(wm) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Requesting Order
Thu 07/25 1:31 PM
MOTION requesting Order To Close Case Administratevely In Compliance With Federal Regulations filed by Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vazquez-Lozada, Jose) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thu 07/11 2:31 PM
ORDER re21 Motion for Default Judgment. HELD IN ABEYANCE. Plaintiff has 14 days from the date of the issuance of this Order to provide evidence of compliance of: (1) approval from the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) to require immediate payment in full pursuant to paragraph 6(b) of the Fixed Rate First Mortgage Note (ECF No. 21-3 at 4); (2) compliance with the 30-day notice to the borrower and to the Secretary of HUD as required under paragraph 9(d) of the First Mortgage (ECF No. 21-4 at 7); (3) an affidavit or declaration under penalty of perjury as to the defendant's competency and military service, as required under Local Civ. R. 55(b). Non-compliance may result in sanctions and/or the dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/10/2019. (gmm) |
|
23 | 23
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 07/11 2:21 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Otilia Santiago Berrios, United States of America. (gmm) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Thu 07/11 2:20 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Entry of Default. The Clerk of the Court shall enter default against all defendants. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/10/2019. (gmm) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Default -Judgment
Fri 02/22 5:40 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants filed by Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada on behalf of Finance of America Reverse, LLC Responses due by 3/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Vazquez-Lozada, Jose) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit AOI, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Mortgage Note, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Mortgage Deed, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Title Search, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order | ||
20 | 20
motion
Default - Entry
Fri 02/22 5:35 PM
MOTION for Default Entry as to All Defendants filed by Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada on behalf of Finance of America Reverse, LLC Responses due by 3/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vazquez-Lozada, Jose) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/22 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada on behalf of Finance of America Reverse, LLC (Vazquez-Lozada, Jose) |
|
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Thu 01/24 4:02 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, this case has been randomly reassigned to the docket of Aida M. Delgado-Colon, who has consented to said transfer. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2019. (nat) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion requesting Order
Wed 09/12 4:08 PM
ORDER finding as moot9 Motion requesting Order Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/12/2018. (EES) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/19 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeannine M. Carlo-Melendez on behalf of Finance of America Reverse, LLC (Carlo-Melendez, Jeannine) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 03/15 9:33 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for extension of time to March 18, 2018. Signed by Judge William G Young on 3/12/2018. (EES) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 02/16 5:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Finance of America Reverse, LLC upon United States of America served on 2/7/2018, answer due 4/9/2018. (Saez-Marrero, Andres) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/16 5:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Finance of America Reverse, LLC upon Otilia Santiago Berrios served on 2/11/2018, answer due 3/5/2018. (Saez-Marrero, Andres) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 02/01 6:03 PM
MOTION for extension of time until March 18, 2018 to Complete Service filed by Andres Saez-Marrero on behalf of Finance of America Reverse, LLC Responses due by 2/15/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Saez-Marrero, Andres) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Fri 12/22 1:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Otilia Santiago Berrios, United States of America (rom) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Issuance of Summons
Fri 12/22 12:12 PM
ORDER finding as moot6 Motion for Issuance of Summons "Docket No. 6 is denied as moot in light of the Court's allowance of docket no. 7 by order (docket no. 8 ). Signed by Judge William G Young on 12/22/2017. (EES) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Requesting Order
Thu 12/21 5:52 PM
Second MOTION requesting Order of Informative Motion And Request For Issuance Of Summons filed by Andres Saez-Marrero on behalf of Finance of America Reverse, LLC Responses due by 1/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Saez-Marrero, Andres) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion requesting Order Order on Motion for Issuance of Summons
Wed 12/20 5:18 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion requesting Order; granting7 Motion for Issuance of Summons Signed by Judge William G Young on 12/20/2017. (EES) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Requesting Order Issuance of Summons
Wed 11/01 5:40 PM
MOTION requesting Order of Informative Motion , MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Finance of America Reverse, LLC filed by Andres Saez-Marrero on behalf of Finance of America Reverse, LLC Responses due by 11/15/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Saez-Marrero, Andres) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Informative Motion
Tue 07/25 2:44 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Andres Saez-Marrero on behalf of Finance of America Reverse, LLC Responses due by 8/8/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Saez-Marrero, Andres) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit SUMMONS | ||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/17 12:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Finance of America Reverse, LLC upon Otilia Santiago Berrios served on 7/13/2017, answer due 8/3/2017. (Saez-Marrero, Andres) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 07/10 9:17 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Finance of America Reverse, LLC upon United States of America served on 7/6/2017, answer due 9/5/2017. (Saez-Marrero, Andres) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/16 9:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Otilia Santiago Berrios, United States of America (arg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 06/16 9:03 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G Young (arg) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/15 3:06 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5487076.), filed by Finance of America Reverse, LLC. Service due by 9/13/2017,(Saez-Marrero, Andres) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Note, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Mortgage, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Summons |