Kreitner v. Berryhill
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | David D Noce |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00035 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago |
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Wed 12/13 10:11 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Plaintiff having filed a voluntary Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc.20 ), without objection from defendant, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/13/2017. (CLO) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 12/12 4:01 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Thomas K. Kreitner.(Bill, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Wed 12/06 11:58 AM
Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief ( Social Security Brief due by 12/17/2017.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/06/17. (KKS) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 12/05 3:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Plaintiff's Brief ;Proposed extension date December 17, 2017 by Plaintiff Thomas K. Kreitner. (Bill, Karen) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Wed 11/08 10:15 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Plaintiff's Brief ;Proposed extension date December 7, 2017 by Plaintiff Thomas K. Kreitner. (Bill, Karen) ; ORDERED GRANTED( Social Security Brief due by 12/7/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 11/8/17. (JAB) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 11/07 4:03 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Plaintiff's Brief ;Proposed extension date December 7, 2017 by Plaintiff Thomas K. Kreitner. (Bill, Karen) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 10/11 10:26 AM
Docket Text ORDER- GRANTING14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Plaintiff Thomas K. Kreitner. ( Social Security Brief due by 11/7/2017.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 10/11/17. (KKS) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 10/06 9:40 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Plaintiff's Brief ;Proposed extension date November 7, 2017 by Plaintiff Thomas K. Kreitner. (Bill, Karen) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Transcript of certified administrative hearing
Thu 09/07 11:02 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Certified Administrative Hearing held on April 21, 2016 re1 Complaint (Social Security),12 Answer to Complaint.(Rund, Jane) |
|
Att: 1 transcript 1, | ||
Att: 2 transcript 2, | ||
Att: 3 transcript 3, | ||
Att: 4 transcript 4, | ||
Att: 5 transcript 5, | ||
Att: 6 transcript 6, | ||
Att: 7 transcript 7, | ||
Att: 8 transcript 8, | ||
Att: 9 transcript 9 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 09/07 10:57 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Rund, Jane) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 07/26 3:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Thomas K. Kreitner. (CLO) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 07/21 12:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Thomas K. Kreitner. (KKS) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Full Consent to a Magistrate
Thu 07/13 2:41 PM
FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Thomas K. Kreitner.. (CLO) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 07/13 12:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Thomas K. Kreitner. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 7/11/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. (KKS) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Entry of Appearance
Thu 07/13 11:41 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
Thu 06/15 6:35 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 06/15 3:04 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 6/15/2017. (CLO) |
|
4 | 4
order
Case Management Order
Thu 06/15 2:56 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) This case is assigned to Track: 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 6/15/2017. (CLO) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Financial Affidavit - CJA 23
Thu 06/15 11:00 AM
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Thomas K. Kreitner. (BAK) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 06/15 10:47 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas K. Kreitner.(Bill, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Social Security)
Thu 06/15 10:46 AM
Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Thomas K. Kreitner.(Bill, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Thu 06/15 11:27 AM
Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK) |
||
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 06/15 3:49 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (CLO) |