Yisrayl v. Ste. Genevieve County Sheriff's Department et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Audrey G Fleissig |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01672 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2017 |
Defendant
Ste. Genevieve County Sheriff's Department
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Carrow
|
|
Plaintiff
Yliyah Ben Yisrayl
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Clerk's Order (administrative closing)
Tue 07/18 9:43 AM
CLERK'S ORDER (GJL) - The above styled and numbered case was filed on June 14, 2017 and assigned to the Eastern Division. Due to a clerical error, the case was assigned incorrectly. The case should have been assigned to the Southeastern Division. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is transferred to the Southeastern Division and assigned to the Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig, United States District Judge, under cause number 1:17-cv-00112 AGF.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that cause number 4:17-cv-01672 AGF be administratively closed. In all future documents filed with the Court, please use the following case number 1:17-cv-00112 AGF. (DLB) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 07/18 1:37 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 10. Tue Jul 18 13:37:11 CDT 2017 (Battle, Kinica) |
||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Mon 07/17 4:53 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's "motion to separate complaints" [Doc. #8 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's July 14, 2017 filing, titled "Sworn Affidavit of Truth, formerly Docket No. 5 in this action, shall be filed as a new motion to vacate, brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255. See 4:17-CV-1978 HEA (E.D. Mo.). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's complaint, received by mail on July 13, 2017, with Case No. 4:17-CV1672 AGF written on the front, shall be filed in the instant action as an amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's complaint, received by mail on July 13, 2017, relating to plaintiffs attempts to receive a kosher diet from St. Genevieve County Jail, shall be filed as a new action in this Court. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on July 17, 2017. (BRP) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 07/17 4:54 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Mon Jul 17 16:54:02 CDT 2017 (Porter, Brittany) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Pro Se Motion
Fri 07/14 12:14 PM
PRO SE MOTION to Seperate Complaints by Plaintiff Yliyah Ben Yisrayl. (KCB) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Wed 06/28 4:02 PM
Letter to Clerk of Court from Plaintiff (Civil Rights Complaint mailed to Plaintiff) (BRP) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/23 1:50 PM
PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Yliyah Ben Yisrayl. (KCB) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Affidavit
Fri 06/23 1:49 PM
SWORN AFFIDAVIT of TRUTH by Plaintiff Yliyah Ben Yisrayl. (KCB) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Wed 06/21 10:39 AM
Correspondence from Plaintiff Yliyah Ben Yisrayl regarding Complaint. (CAR) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case - 42:1983)
Wed 06/21 10:37 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Yliyah Ben Yisrayl. (CAR) |
|
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Tue 06/20 9:46 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail to plaintiff a copy of the Courts prisoner civil rights complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail to plaintiff a copy of the motion to proceed in forma pauperis form for prisoners. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint on the Courts form within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.]. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/20/2017.(NEB) |
|
Att: 1 Form Complaint Form, | ||
Att: 2 Form IFP Form | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 06/20 9:46 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. Tue Jun 20 09:46:41 CDT 2017 (Blasko, Nicole) |
||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
misc
Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Thu 06/15 11:24 AM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB) |
||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Thu 06/15 11:25 AM
Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (DLB) |
||
misc
Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Thu 06/15 12:00 PM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Jun 15 12:00:53 CDT 2017 (admin,) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
DCM Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)
Thu 06/15 11:24 AM
Document treated as,"DCM COMPLAINT" against defendant Unknown Carrow, Ste. Genevieve County Sheriff's Department, filed by Yliyah Ben Yisrayl.(DLB) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope, | ||
Att: 2 Judge Assignment Label |