Evangelina Banks v. Check N Go of California, Inc
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | David T Bristow |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-01180 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 12:55 AM PST |
Defendant
Check N Go of California, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Evangelina Banks
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Dismiss
Fri 10/27 2:10 PM
MINUTE Order (1) GRANTING Defendant Southwestern & Pacific Specialty Finance, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Dkt. No.15 ); (2) DISMISSING the First Amended Complaint WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; and (3) VACATING the hearing on October 30, 2017 (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Upon consideration of the papers filed in support of and in opposition to the motion, the Court GRANTS the motion and DISMISSES Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) Additionally, the Court STRIKES the improper sur-replies (Dkt. Nos. 18, 20). The clerk is directed to close this case. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (iva) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Tue 10/17 1:29 PM
Objection opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss per F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) 15 filed by Defendant Check N Go of California, Inc.. (Waste, John) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 10/17 1:26 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Objection18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Found under Civil Events - Motions and Related Filings - Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): 1) The Objection and Request to Strike should have been filed as two separate entries. 2) A proposed order must be a separate attachment to a main document such as a motion, request, application, stipulation, etc., or to a Notice of Lodging (L.R. 5-4.4.1). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gga) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Objection
Mon 10/16 3:14 PM
OBJECTIONS to Reply (Motion related)17 filed by Plaintiff Evangelina Banks. (Hartman, Jared) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 10/16 1:38 PM
REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss per F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) 15 filed by Defendant Check N Go of California, Inc.. (Waste, John) |
|
Saturday, October 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Sat 10/07 7:11 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss per F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) 15 filed by Plaintiff Evangelina Banks. (Hartman, Jared) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Thu 09/28 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss per F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Check N Go of California, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/30/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Waste, John) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum Points & Authorities iso Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Mengwan Chen iso Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit Proof of Service | ||
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order Extending Answer Due Deadline
Mon 08/28 12:08 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal re: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)12 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The stipulation is APPROVED and: 1. Defendant shall have an additional thirty (30) days to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint10 , making such response due by Friday, September 29, 2017. 2. That Plaintiff shall not be required to bring a class certification motion within ninety (90) days of August 16, 2017. (iva) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 08/24 1:46 PM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Check N Go of California, Inc. answer now due 9/29/2017, filed by defendant Check N Go of California, Inc..(Waste, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 08/16 11:50 AM
AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Evangelina Banks.(Hartman, Jared) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of service | ||
10 | 10
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Wed 08/16 11:49 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Evangelina Banks(Hartman, Jared) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 07/17 11:55 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Check N Go of California, Inc. answer now due 8/16/2017, filed by Defendants Check N Go of California, Inc..(Attorney John Jackson Waste added to party Check N Go of California, Inc.(pty:dft))(Waste, John) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 06/21 10:02 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 06/15 4:54 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Check N Go of California, Inc. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 06/15 4:52 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 06/15 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 06/15 8:13 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff Evangelina Banks. (Hartman, Jared) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 06/15 8:13 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Evangelina Banks, identifying Evangelina Banks. (Hartman, Jared) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 06/15 8:12 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Evangelina Banks. (Hartman, Jared) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 06/15 8:10 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20023130 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Evangelina Banks. (Attorney Jared M Hartman added to party Evangelina Banks(pty:pla))(Hartman, Jared) |