Eaton et al v. Vista Outdoors, Inc et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Roy B Dalton, Jr |
Referred: | Karla R Spaulding |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-01096 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 4:49 AM EST |
Defendant
Bell Sports, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vista Outdoors, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Stores, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joe Eaton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Eaton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Tue 07/18 2:40 PM
ORDER denying as moot 24 Motion to Remand to State Court. This action is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Brevard County, Florida. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/18/2017. (VMF) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Remand to State Court
Mon 07/17 6:43 PM
MOTION to remand to State Court and Memorandum of Law in Support by All Plaintiffs. (Yegelwel, Harris) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/14 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL - Amended from Brevard County, case number 05-2017 029079 filed in State Court on 05/24/2017. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL64470 filed by All Defendants.(Vaughan, Antar) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Summones & Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Demand letter, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
22 | 22
misc
Response to order to show cause
Fri 07/14 1:22 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re21 Order pdf filed by Bell Sports, Inc., Vista Outdoors, Inc, Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Vaughan, Antar) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
*Order pdf
Wed 07/12 6:20 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE on or before Friday, July 14, 2017, Defendants are DIRECTED to: (1) file an amended notice of removal and (2) show cause by written response why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with court orders. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/12/2017. (ZRR) |
|
utility
Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC
Thu 07/13 9:20 AM
Set deadlines/hearings: Show Cause Response due by 7/14/2017 (JP) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 07/11 1:50 PM
ORDER granting 19 Agreed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 7/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 7/11/2017. (ECJ) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 07/11 12:30 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to15 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by Joe Eaton, Kimberly Eaton. (Yegelwel, Harris) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Mon 07/10 4:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re14 Interested persons order by Joe Eaton, Kimberly Eaton. (Yegelwel, Harris) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Mon 07/10 3:59 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Joe Eaton, Kimberly Eaton. Related case(s): Yes (Yegelwel, Harris) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Thu 06/29 4:49 PM
ORDER -- on or before Thursday, July 6, 2017, Defendants are DIRECTED to file an amended Notice of Removal that remedies the deficiency identified in this Order. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/29/2017. (VMF) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss/lack of jurisdiction
Wed 06/28 4:10 PM
MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by All Defendants.(Vaughan, Antar) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Interested persons order
Tue 06/27 1:25 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/11/2017. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/27/2017. (VMF) (ctp) |
|
13 | 13
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Tue 06/27 1:24 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/11/2017. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/27/2017.(VMF)(ctp) |
|
Att: 1 , | ||
Att: 2 , | ||
Att: 3 | ||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
utility
*Remark
Fri 06/23 11:33 AM
Remark: Doc.7 has been reviewed. Signed by Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/23/2017. (SN) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 06/23 10:18 AM
ORDER granting 10 Agreed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. No. 9) is extended up to and including June 29, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/23/2017. (ECJ) |
|
utility
Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC
Fri 06/23 11:46 AM
reset deadline: Answer due 6/29/17 for Bell Sports, Inc., Vista Outdoors, Inc, Walmart Stores, Inc. (RMF) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 06/22 4:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Vista Outdoors, Inc. (Vaughan, Antar) |
|
9 | 9
21
pgs
misc
Redacted document
Thu 06/22 4:38 PM
REDACTION Complaint by Vista Outdoors, Inc. (Vaughan, Antar) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Redacted document
Thu 06/22 4:30 PM
REDACTION Summons and Complaint by Vista Outdoors, Inc. (Vaughan, Antar) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Redacted document
Thu 06/22 4:24 PM
REDACTION Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vista Outdoors, Inc. (Vaughan, Antar) |
|
6 | 6
6
pgs
misc
Redacted document
Thu 06/22 4:20 PM
REDACTION Notice of Removal by Vista Outdoors, Inc.(Vaughan, Antar) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Redacted Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Redacted Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
5 | 5
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/22 11:17 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. New case number: 6:17-cv-1096-ORL-37KRS. Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp no longer assigned to the case. (RDO) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order reassigning case to another judge w/in division
Wed 06/21 4:23 PM
ORDER reassigning this case to another District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 6/21/2017. (SC) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order to strike
Mon 06/19 9:30 AM
ORDER to strike re: 2 Complaint filed by Kimberly Eaton, Joe Eaton, 1 Notice of Removal filed by Bell Sports, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc., Vista Outdoors, Inc. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to remove the Notice of Removal (including its attachments (Doc. Nos. 1, 1-1, 1-2, 1-3) and Complaint (Doc. No. 2) from CM/ECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/16/2017. (ECJ) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/16 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT against Bell Sports, Inc., Vista Outdoors, Inc, Walmart Stores, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Kimberly Eaton, Joe Eaton. Filed in State Court on 05/24/2017.(JP) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 06/16 10:12 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brevard County, Circuit Court, case number 05-2017-CA-029079 filed in State Court on 05/24/17. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL64470 filed by All Defendants.(JP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 |