In Re: Sanders
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kiyo A Matsumoto |
Referred: | Roanne L Mann |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03593 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2018 |
Defendant
Food Service/ FCI Berlin
|
|
Defendant
Food Service/ FCI McDowell Federal Correctional
|
|
Defendant
Food Service/ Religious Services Muslim (FTC)(OKC)
|
|
Defendant
Food Service/Medical/ Edwards and Sage Unit Team (E.T.C.)/ MDC Brooklyn
|
|
Defendant
Shu Staff Medical/Food Service/ FCI Otisville
|
|
In Re
Christopher Sanders
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Fri 06/29 3:50 PM
ORDER re14 . The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of the Memorandum and Order14 dismissing this case and the judgment to pro se plaintiff at Christopher Sanders # 62316-066, Federal Correctional Institution McKean, P.O. Box 8000, Bradford, PA 16701, and note service on the docket.Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 6/29/2018. |
||
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment
Thu 06/28 12:30 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Food Service/ FCI Berlin, Food Service/ FCI McDowell Federal Correctional, Food Service/ Religious Services Muslim (FTC)(OKC), Food Service/Medical/ Edwards and Sage Unit Team (E.T.C.)/ MDC Brooklyn, Shu Staff Medical/Food Service/ FCI Otisville against Christopher Sanders. That this action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute; and that this case is closed. (Ordered by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on 6/28/2018) c/m (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
7
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 06/27 11:16 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, To date, despite efforts by the Clerk of Court to obtain pltff's compliance, pltff has not complied with the filing requirements for incarcerated pltffs seeking to proceed in forma pauperis. (Docket Entry #9 terminated) For the foregoing reasons, the Drake factors weigh in favor of dismissal. The action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to pro se plaintiff, note service on the docket, and close this case. (Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 6/26/2018) c/m Fwd. for Judgment. (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order(Other)
Tue 03/06 11:56 AM
MEMORANDUM & ORDER dated 3/5/18 regarding plaintiff's unsigned Prisoner Authorization Form. Must be completed within 30 days of this Order to proceed with this action or shall be dismissed without prejudice.( Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/5/2018 ) Forms mailed w/a copy of order. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Prisoner Authorization
Thu 02/22 9:51 AM
Prisoner Authorization filed by Christopher Sanders. (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Deficient Filing
Tue 02/06 2:59 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING , litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days . Pltff is requested to complete the enclosed PLRA application. (w/enc.) (Copy of this Notice mailed out to the Pltff by the Pro Se Writ Clerk) (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Prisoner Authorization
Tue 02/06 2:51 PM
Prisoner Authorization filed by Christopher Sanders. (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 02/06 2:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christopher Sanders. (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
4
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 01/10 11:37 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, In light of pltff's pro se status and in an abundance of caution, the Clerk of Court is directed to re-send the IFP and Prisoner Authorization forms to pltff, along with instructions on how to complete those forms, and to note service on the docket. If he wishes to proceed with this action, pltff must return the signed and completed forms within 30 days of this Order. If pltff fails to comply with this Order within the time allowed, this action shall be dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 1/09/2018) c/m (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Mon 11/20 2:25 PM
Letter dated 11/6/2017 to the Clerk Of Court from Christopher Sanders informing the Court of his new designation. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Note to FCI McDowell Medical, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Tue 10/10 3:05 PM
Letter from Christopher Sanders regarding this above-captioned matter. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Wed 08/30 4:02 PM
Letter dated 8/28/2017 to Christopher Sanders from the Clerk's Office enclosed with the IFP application and PLRA Letter. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter
Thu 08/03 11:33 AM
Letter dtd. 6/20/17 from Christopher Sanders informing the court of an incident that took place stemming from "his request of his legal documents to the court, which led to acts of misconduct against him by C.O. Sawyer and C.O. Muncy. Further requesting disciplinary action be taken against both officers.". . (Layne, Monique) |
|
Att: 1 Letter-Resp. re Admin. Tort Claim filed 7/10/17, | ||
Att: 2 Receipt-Admin. Remedy | ||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Letter
Wed 07/19 3:04 PM
Letter dtd. 7/11/2017 from Christopher Sanders re the prison's grievance procedures and the time for filing of a notice of appeal. (Layne, Monique) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Deficient Filing
Fri 06/16 11:06 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING , litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days . (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 06/16 11:07 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |