Shalto v. BS Cofee Shop Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nicholas G Garaufis |
Referred: | Robert M Levy |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03641 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability) |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 4:04 AM EST |
Cross Claimant
36th Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
BS Cofee Shop Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Huang Hai Kitchen Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
36th Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BS Cofee Shop Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Huang Hai Kitchen Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lesaldo Shalto
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 12/28 2:51 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL without Prejudice. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/26/2017. (Williams, Erica) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 12/21 3:41 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lesaldo Shalto (Weiss, Donald) |
|
19 | 19
7
pgs
order
Order of Settlement ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 12/21 2:22 PM
Consent Stipulation. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/20/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Settlement Agreement
Wed 12/20 9:58 AM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Lesaldo Shalto (Weiss, Donald) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Status Report
Mon 11/13 6:25 PM
STATUS REPORT by BS Cofee Shop Inc., Huang Hai Kitchen Inc. (Brand, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Wed 10/11 7:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Donald Weiss, Michael Brand, Steven Chase. Scheduling order approved. The parties will take 30 days to negotiate settlement and report in a status report on 11/13/17. Discovery deadline 2/5/18. Next conference, if case does not settle, 2/7/18 at 10:00 (tel)(close of discovery).Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/11/2017 (Levy, Robert) |
||
order
Status Report Order
Wed 10/11 7:02 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 11/13/2017.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/11/2017. (Levy, Robert) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/04 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Aaron Brand on behalf of BS Cofee Shop Inc., Huang Hai Kitchen Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Brand, Michael) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Crossclaim
Wed 10/04 12:42 PM
ANSWER to13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by BS Cofee Shop Inc., Huang Hai Kitchen Inc.. (Wong, Vincent) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Fri 09/15 11:40 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against BS Cofee Shop Inc., Huang Hai Kitchen Inc. by 36th Associates LLC. (Chase, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/05 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D. Chase on behalf of 36th Associates LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Chase, Steven) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 09/05 1:27 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by 36th Associates LLC. (Chase, Steven) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order to Answer ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Fri 09/01 11:40 AM
ORDER TO ANSWER re1 Complaint, 36th Associates LLC answer due 9/17/2017. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. PLEASE NOTE: A Notice of Appearance has not been filed by Attorney Steven D. Chase o/b/o 36th Associates LLC. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/30 12:03 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/11/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/30/2017. (Marino, Janine) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/17 1:16 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by BS Cofee Shop Inc., Huang Hai Kitchen Inc.. (Wong, Vincent) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/31 1:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lesaldo Shalto. 36th Associates LLC served on 7/27/2017, answer due 8/17/2017. (Weiss, Donald) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/31 1:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lesaldo Shalto. Huang Hai Kitchen Inc. served on 7/27/2017, answer due 8/17/2017. (Weiss, Donald) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/31 1:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lesaldo Shalto. BS Cofee Shop Inc. served on 7/27/2017, answer due 8/17/2017. (Weiss, Donald) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 06/19 11:56 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 06/19 11:56 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/19 11:55 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/16 1:18 PM
COMPLAINT against 36th Associates LLC, BS Cofee Shop Inc., Huang Hai Kitchen Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9611337 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Lesaldo Shalto. (Weiss, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/19 11:53 AM
Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |