Arroyo v. The City of New York et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Carol Bagley Amon |
Referred: | James Orenstein |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03645 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 3:59 AM EST |
Defendant
Correctional Captain Oudkerk, Shield No. 1875
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C.O. John and Jane Doe #1 through 10
|
|
Defendant
The City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julio Arroyo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 01/19 4:41 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the undersigned that the above-referenced action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 1/18/2018. (Fernandez, Erica) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Fri 01/19 10:01 AM
ORDER re21 Stipulation of Dismissal -- In light of the parties' stipulation of dismissal, all scheduled conferences before me are cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/19/2018. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 01/18 2:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Correctional Captain Oudkerk, Shield No. 1875, The City of New York (DeLuca, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 01/09 10:28 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion is granted. The telephone conference previously scheduled for January 10, 2018 is rescheduled for January 19, 2018 at 12:30 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/9/2018. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 01/08 6:00 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Julio Arroyo. (Rameau, Amy) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
minutes
Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 12/05 2:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Settlement Conference held on 12/5/2017. SCHEDULING: The next telephone conference will be held on January 10, 2018, at 12:30 p.m. SUMMARY: The parties agreed to settle the case. If they file a stipulation of dismissal before the next conference scheduled above, I will cancel it; otherwise, I respectfully direct the plaintiff's counsel to initiate the telephone conference call. (Orenstein, James) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 10/26 3:06 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Correctional Captain Oudkerk, Shield No. 1875. (DeLuca, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 10/25 9:19 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File -- The motion is granted. The time to serve defendant Correctional Captain Oudkerk is extended to September 25, 2017, nunc pro tunc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/25/2017. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Tue 10/24 7:03 PM
Letter to extend time to serve defendant Oudkerk by Julio Arroyo (Rameau, Amy) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 6:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julio Arroyo. Correctional Captain Oudkerk, Shield No. 1875 served on 9/22/2017. (Rameau, Amy) |
|
15 | 15
respoth
Reply in Opposition
Tue 10/24 4:59 PM
REPLY in Opposition re10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File To serve defendant Oudkerk filed by The City of New York. (DeLuca, Christopher) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 10/23 11:31 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: October 23, 2017. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: November 22, 2017. Settlement Conference ( ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): December 5, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: December 20, 2017. Status Conference (with joint status report due two business days in advance): February 9, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. Fact discovery to be completed by: March 26, 2018. Plaintiff's expert reports to be completed by: March 12, 2018. Defendants' expert reports to be completed by: April 12, 2018. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: April 12, 2018. Pretrial Conference ( ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): May 1, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: May 15, 2018. Joint pretrial order due by: June 14, 2018. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/23/2017. (Orenstein, James) |
|
13 | 13
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 10/23 11:28 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/23/2017. SCHEDULING: (1) The next settlement conference will be held on December 5, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. (2) A status conference will be held on February 9, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. (3) A pretrial conference will be held on May 1, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. SUMMARY: (1) I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that reflects the deadlines set forth in the parties' joint discovery plan. (2) No later than October 24, 2017, the defendants' counsel shall submit a letter in opposition to the plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to serve defendant Oudkerk. (3) No later than December 1, 2017, each party must submit an ex parte statement of settlement position by email (NOT by ECF) to[LINK:orenstein_chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov] . Each statement must include the terms on which the party is willing to settle the case, whether those terms are negotiable, and an explanation of that position. These statements will be treated as confidential, and will not be docketed. Meaningful settlement discussions will occur at the next conference; clients or other persons with full settlement authority must be present or immediately available by telephone. (Orenstein, James) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 10/19 4:56 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order in the form of a Joint Discovery Plan by The City of New York (DeLuca, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 10/17 6:14 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by The City of New York. (DeLuca, Christopher) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 09/25 10:37 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File To serve defendant Oudkerk by Julio Arroyo. (Rameau, Amy) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Mon 09/18 8:27 AM
ORDER -- A review of the docket indicates that the plaintiff has not filed proof of timely service of the summons and complaint as required on defendant Correctional Captain Oudkerk. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4( l ), (m). No later than September 25, 2017, the plaintiff must either file proof of timely service on the docket or file a motion requesting an extension of the time to effect service for good cause. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Failure to comply will result in a recommendation that the case against Correctional Captain Oudkerk be dismissed for failure to prosecute. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), 41 (b). Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/18/2017. (Guy, Alicia) |
||
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/29 9:48 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, October 23, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than October 19, 2017, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/29/2017. (Guy, Alicia) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/21 2:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julio Arroyo. The City of New York served on 6/19/2017, answer due 10/17/2017. (Rameau, Amy) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 08/21 10:54 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The application is granted on consent as to the City only. The City must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 17, 2017. In light of the delay occasioned by the latter ruling, I impose certain additional obligations on both parties that will avoid delaying the proceedings even further: (a) no later than August 28, 2017, the City's counsel must provide to the plaintiff for execution a release pursuant to N.Y.C.P.L. Sec. 160.50 with respect to the incident at issue in the litigation, as well as a release authorizing the disclosure of relevant medical records if the plaintiff is seeking damages for any physical or mental injury; (b) no later than September 5, 2017, the plaintiff must execute any such release; and (c) no later than October 20, 2017, the City's counsel must provide to the plaintiff the names, shield numbers, and proper service addresses of all individual officers involved in, or present at the scene of, the incident at issue in this litigation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/21/2017. (Klewin, Erin) |
||
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 08/18 4:47 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The City of New York. (DeLuca, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/17 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Dominick DeLuca on behalf of The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (DeLuca, Christopher) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 06/19 2:33 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 06/19 2:29 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Waiver of Service
Mon 06/19 11:49 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to The City of New York on 06/19/2017 by Julio Arroyo. Waiver of Service due by 8/18/2017. (Rameau, Amy) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/19 2:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Correctional Captain Oudkerk, Shield No. 1875, C.O. John and Jane Doe #1 through 10, The City of New York. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/16 2:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Correctional Captain Oudkerk, Shield No. 1875, C.O. John and Jane Doe #1 through 10, The City of New York filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9611555 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Julio Arroyo. (Rameau, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/19 2:28 PM
Case assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |