FARLEY v. MACY'S INC.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allyne R Ross |
Referred: | Vera M Scanlon |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03660 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 4:08 AM EST |
Defendant
Macy's Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denise Farley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 04/11 9:36 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross, undated ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 04/09 2:16 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Macy's Inc. (Leader, Robyn) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 03/01 11:44 AM
The Parties state that they are trying to settle this case. RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: all discovery must be completed by 5/16/2018. Fact discovery closes on 4/01/18. On or before 5/18/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 5/30/2018, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 6/28/2018, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/1/2018. (Pearce, Jessica) |
||
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Wed 02/28 4:06 PM
Letter to extend discovery end dates by Macy's Inc. (Leader, Robyn) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 01/29 10:07 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: all discovery must be completed by 4/16/2018. Fact discovery closes on 3/01/18. On or before 4/19/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 4/30/2018, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 5/28/2018, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/29/2018. (Pearce, Jessica) |
||
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 01/26 5:30 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Denise Farley. |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 11/09 11:51 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 11/8/2017 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), all discovery must be completed by 3/16/2018. Fact discovery closes on 1/30/18. On or before 3/19/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 3/30/2018, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 4/27/2018, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. Plaintiff to provide additional authorizations by 11/15/2017. Plaintiff to provide a PT authorization as well. Plaintiff to provide the bills that were supposed to be attached to the initial responses but were not. Plaintiff to provide these documents by 11/15/2017. Given Plaintiff's delay in providing authorizations and Plaintiff's previous related conditions, it is reasonable to have Plaintiff return for the deposition to continue. The Parties may voluntarily agree to reschedule the deposition of Plaintiff and the Operation Manager. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/8/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 11/09 11:43 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Status Conference held on 11/8/2017 in Courtroom 13A South. Jacob Fogel appearing for Plaintiff. Mr. Fogel is to file a notice of appearance. Robyn Leader appearing for Defendant. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #3:33-4:02.) (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Wed 11/01 3:04 PM
Letter Joint Status Letter to Judge Scanlon by Macy's Inc. (Leader, Robyn) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 07/07 3:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 7/7/2017 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), all discovery must be completed by 2/2/2018. On or before 2/2/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 3/2/2018, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 4/2/2018, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. An in person Status Conference is set for 11/8/2017 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 504 North before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 11/1/2017, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/7/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Fri 07/07 3:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Initial Conference Hearing held on 7/7/2017 in Room 504 North. Robert Renna appearing for Plaintiff. Robyn Leader appearing for Defendant. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (Tape #2:56-3:16.) (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Wed 06/21 4:21 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Macy's Inc. (Leader, Robyn) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/20 8:55 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 7/7/2017 at 3:00 PM. Counsel is directed to confirm with Defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 6/30/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/20/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 06/19 2:24 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 06/19 2:24 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/19 2:24 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/16 4:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MACY'S INC. identifying Corporate Parent none for MACY'S INC.. (Leader, Robyn) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit service | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 06/16 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MACY'S INC. from Supreme Kings, case number 504429/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9612583) (Leader, Robyn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Affidavit service |