Coates v. Grace et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nicholas G Garaufis |
Referred: | Cheryl L Pollak |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03667 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 4:15 AM EST |
Defendant
Vincent Cannucci
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ronald J. Clark
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Douglas Colford
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kenra Coston
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Albert Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Senior Officer Fitzpatrick
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Keia Grace
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raymond Torpey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Coates
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
order
Order of Remand to State Court
Thu 03/22 11:13 AM
Order of Remand to State Court. Plaintiff submitted an application to voluntarily dismiss the federal-law-based claims in the Complaint. The court granted Plaintiff's application and directed the Clerk of Court to return the case to state court. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/22/2018. (Pressman, Michael) |
||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference
Wed 12/06 5:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis: Pre-Motion Conference held on 12/6/2017. Plaintiff submitted an application to voluntarily dismiss the federal-law-based claims in the Complaint. The court granted Plaintiff's application and directed the Clerk of Court to return the case to state court. (Court Reporter Anthony Mancuso) (Pressman, Michael) |
||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Suggestion of Death
Wed 11/01 3:46 PM
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Lt. Benjamin Fitzgerald s/h/a Senior Officer Fitzpatrick by Vincent Cannucci, Ronald J. Clark, Douglas Colford, Kenra Coston, Albert Cruz, Keia Grace, Raymond Torpey (Guardiola, Angel) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Tue 10/03 7:00 PM
ORDER re Defendants'8 Application for Pre-Motion Conference: The Application is GRANTED. The parties are directed to confer and contact the court's Deputy at 718-613-2545 to schedule the pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/3/2017. (Pressman, Michael) |
||
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Mon 10/02 5:26 PM
Second MOTION for pre motion conference re: Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Vincent Cannucci, Ronald J. Clark, Douglas Colford, Kenra Coston, Albert Cruz, Senior Officer Fitzpatrick, Keia Grace, Raymond Torpey. (Guardiola, Angel) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 08/02 2:19 PM
STIPULATION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FOR WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIMS, Plaintiff shall withdraw the claims asserted pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §§ 1981, 1985, and 1986, the New York State Constitution, and any and all claims to the extent that they are asserted against Defendants in their official capacities, with prejudice;Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in this action on or before September 11, 2017; The filing of an amended complaint in this action shall not prejudice Defendants' right to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Individual Rules of Judge Nicholas G. Garaufls; Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint on or before October 11, 2017. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/28/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Fri 07/28 11:23 AM
STIPULATION re: Withdrawal of Claims, Filing of Amended Complaint and Answers/Responses to Amended Complaint by Vincent Cannucci, Ronald J. Clark, Douglas Colford, Kenra Coston, Albert Cruz, Senior Officer Fitzpatrick, Keia Grace, Raymond Torpey (Guardiola, Angel) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Fri 06/30 3:32 PM
ORDER re Defendants' 26 Application for Pre-Motion Conference: The Application is GRANTED. The parties are directed to confer and contact the court's Deputy at 718-613-2545 to schedule the pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/30/2017. (Weigel, Jessica) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Pre Motion Conference Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 06/22 12:38 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Vincent Cannucci, Ronald J. Clark, Douglas Colford, Kenra Coston, Albert Cruz, Senior Officer Fitzpatrick, Keia Grace, Raymond Torpey. (Guardiola, Angel) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 06/22 1:34 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/22/2017. (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 06/19 3:11 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 06/19 3:11 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 06/16 6:46 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald J. Clark, Douglas Colford, Kenra Coston, Albert Cruz, Senior Officer Fitzpatrick, Keia Grace, Raymond Torpey re1 Notice of Removal, and Exhibit (Guardiola, Angel) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 06/16 5:57 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, case number 509102/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9613217) (Guardiola, Angel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Summons & Complaint) | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/19 3:10 PM
Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |