Trejos et al v. Chiflez Corp. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sanket J Bulsara |
Referred: | Sanket J Bulsara |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03672 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 3:53 AM EST |
Defendant
Luis Caguana
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carlos Segarra
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Juan Carlos Segarra
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Luzmila Segarra
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chiflez Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elsa Mayor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luz Trejos
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Wed 06/13 2:57 PM
Letter pursuant to EDNY Local Rule 50.3. ] (d) in order to make an application to the Court to deem the Present Action related to two prior actions filed in the Eastern District, namely, (Garcia et al v Cositas Riccas Equaiorianas Corp et al No. 17-03671 (RJD)(SJB) and Trejos et al vs Chiflez Corp et al. No. 17-03672 RJD)(SJB) (Marziliano, August) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
order
Stipulation and Order
Mon 03/12 12:52 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: The Stipulation of Dismissal30 is so ordered. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the above caption. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/12/2018. (Manson, Eddie) Modified on 3/12/2018 (Manson, Eddie) |
||
order
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 03/12 1:06 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (Manson, Eddie) |
||
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 03/09 6:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Luis Caguana, Chiflez Corp., Carlos Segarra, Juan Carlos Segarra, Luzmila Segarra (Nasis, Elbert) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Fri 03/09 5:32 PM
ORDER: The parties are reminded of the Court's order dated 2/15/2018, which directed the parties to file a Stipulation of Dismissal by 3/8/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/9/2018. (Zhang, Fan) |
||
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
minutes
Fairness/Cheeks Conference
Thu 02/15 6:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: An in-person fairness hearing was held on 2/15/2018. All counsel were present. (See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding.) (FTR Log #11:34-11:44 AM.) (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Thu 02/15 6:44 PM
ORDER: I have reviewed the joint motion filed by Plaintiffs dated January 19, 201827 , seeking approval of the settlement agreement between the Parties. A fairness hearing was held on 2/15/2018, and the parties have consented to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. I find that "the agreement reflects a reasonable compromise of disputed issues [rather] than a mere waiver of statutory rights brought about by an employer's overreaching." Le v. SITA Information Networking Computing, USA, Inc., 2008 WL 724155 (E.D.N.Y. Mar. 13, 2008) (internal quotations and citation omitted). See also Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015). In reaching this conclusion, I have considered, among other things, (1) that the settlement amount provides Plaintiffs with a recovery, net of attorney's fees and costs, approximating the amount of overtime wages they claim are due them; (2) that the attorney's fees and costs portion of the settlement is for an amount less than one-third of the total amount of the settlement; (3) that the release provided for in the agreement is limited in scope; and (4) that the settlement agreement does not impose a duty of confidentiality. The settlement is therefore approved. The Parties to the settlement agreement should file a Stipulation of Dismissal by 3/8/2018 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 2/15/2018. (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 01/23 11:02 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person Cheeks Motion Hearing will take place on 2/15/2018 at 11:00 A.M. before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/23/2018. (Manson, Eddie) |
||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 01/22 4:06 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for all further proceedings. Judge Raymond J. Dearie no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
utility
Case No Longer Referred
Mon 01/22 4:05 PM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
||
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 01/19 8:11 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Elsa Mayor, Luz Trejos. (Gangat, Mohammed) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Settlement
Fri 01/19 8:10 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by Elsa Mayor, Luz Trejos. (Gangat, Mohammed) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Settlement in Chiflez Action, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Settlement in Cositas Ricas Action | ||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 01/18 9:21 AM
ORDER: The motion for extension of time to file25 is granted. The parties shall file their motion for approval by January 19, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/18/2018. (Zhang, Fan) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 01/17 7:02 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File joint approval motion and settlement agreement on consent of all parties by Luis Caguana, Chiflez Corp., Carlos Segarra, Juan Carlos Segarra, Luzmila Segarra. (Casa, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Email
Tue 01/09 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Elbert Nasis (Nasis, Elbert) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 12/19 11:33 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: An in-person settlement conference hearing was held on 12/18/2017. Counsel for parties were present. The case was settled. (See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding.) (FTR Log #3:14-3:15 PM; 5:24-5:30 PM.). (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Tue 12/19 11:37 AM
ORDER: In light of the settlement, the Motion for Pre Motion Conference21 is denied as moot without prejudice to renewal. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/19/2017. (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 12/19 11:40 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel shall file a motion for approval as required by Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), by 1/17/2018 . An in-person hearing is scheduled for 4:00 PM on 1/24/2018 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. Counsel are encouraged to consider whether they will file a form consenting to reassignment of this case to the undersigned Magistrate Judge for all purposes, including for review of the settlement agreement and to conduct the Cheeks hearing. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/19/2017. (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 11/29 4:04 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Luis Caguana, Chiflez Corp., Carlos Segarra, Juan Carlos Segarra, Luzmila Segarra. (Nasis, Elbert) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Wed 11/22 5:27 PM
Letter to Judge Dearie Enclosing Courtesy Copy of Letter Request for Pre Motion Conference by Elsa Mayor, Luz Trejos (Gangat, Mohammed) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Wed 11/22 1:24 AM
MOTION for pre motion conference by Elsa Mayor, Luz Trejos. (Gangat, Mohammed) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 10/04 1:07 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for all further proceedings( As related to 17-3671 . Judge Frederic Block, Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 10/4/2017. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Fri 09/08 1:29 PM
Letter Advising of Request that this action be "Deemed Related" to another action filed in this District by Elsa Mayor, Luz Trejos (Gangat, Mohammed) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Thu 09/07 5:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann: Initial Conference Hearing held on 9/7/2017. Fact discovery shall be completed by March 1, 2018. Automatic disclosures shall be exchanged by September 21, 2017 (including copies of time and payroll records). The parties shall file a joint status report (and request for a settlement conference) by October 20, 2017 . Pleadings may be amended and new parties added until December 1, 2017 . Plaintiffs will be seeking to have this case deemed related to 17-CV-3671. (Godoy-Dalmau, Gabriel) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 08/14 3:10 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, on consent18 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The August 23rd initial conference is adjourned to September 7, 2017 at noon. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/14/2017. (Kelson, Lise) |
||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 08/07 12:12 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Elsa Mayor, Luz Trejos. (Gangat, Mohammed) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/13 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M Casa on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Casa, Lisa) |
|
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 07/13 10:22 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference is set for 8/23/2017 @ 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 13C South before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/13/2017. (Kelson, Lise) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/12 4:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Nasis, Elbert) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/12 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elbert Nasis on behalf of Luis Caguana, Chiflez Corp., Carlos Segarra, Juan Carlos Segarra, Luzmila Segarra (aty to be noticed) (Nasis, Elbert) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/12 4:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Luis Caguana, Chiflez Corp., Carlos Segarra, Juan Carlos Segarra, Luzmila Segarra (Casa, Lisa) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/12 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M Casa on behalf of Luis Caguana, Chiflez Corp., Carlos Segarra, Juan Carlos Segarra, Luzmila Segarra (aty to be noticed) (Casa, Lisa) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice(Other)
Fri 07/07 7:50 PM
NOTICE by Elsa Mayor re1 Complaint, Consent to Sue As Plaintiff in a Collective Action Under the Fair Labor Standards Act (Gangat, Mohammed) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice(Other)
Fri 07/07 7:49 PM
NOTICE by Luz Trejos re1 Complaint, Consent to Sue As Plaintiff in a Collective Action Under the Fair Labor Standards Act (Gangat, Mohammed) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/30 5:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luz Trejos, Elsa Mayor. Luis Caguana served on 6/21/2017, answer due 7/12/2017. (Gangat, Mohammed) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/30 5:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luz Trejos, Elsa Mayor. Luzmila Segarra served on 6/21/2017, answer due 7/12/2017. (Gangat, Mohammed) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/30 5:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luz Trejos, Elsa Mayor. Juan Carlos Segarra served on 6/21/2017, answer due 7/12/2017. (Gangat, Mohammed) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/30 5:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luz Trejos, Elsa Mayor. Chiflez Corp. served on 6/21/2017, answer due 7/12/2017. (Gangat, Mohammed) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/30 5:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luz Trejos, Elsa Mayor. Carlos Segarra served on 6/21/2017, answer due 7/12/2017. (Gangat, Mohammed) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/19 2:48 PM
Summons Issued as to Luis Caguana, Chiflez Corp., Carlos Segarra, Juan Carlos Segarra, Luzmila Segarra. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Summon, | ||
Att: 2 Summon, | ||
Att: 3 Summon, | ||
Att: 4 Summon | ||
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 06/19 2:43 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 06/19 2:42 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/19 2:42 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/16 8:33 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9613468 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Luz Trejos, Elsa Mayor. (Gangat, Mohammed) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons |