Llive v. The CBE Group, Inc.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lashann Dearcy Hall |
Referred: | Vera M Scanlon |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03673 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 4:25 AM EST |
Defendant
The CBE Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mario Llive
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 11/28 4:30 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Parties, by and through their attorneys, hereby consent to the dismissal of the above-entitled action pursuant to Rule 41(a)(l)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure with prejudice and without costs or fees. The class claims are dismissed without prejudice. So Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 11/27/2017. (Almonte, Giselle) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other) 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 11/22 8:19 AM
ORDER: In light of the16 stipulation of dismissal, the 1/31/2018 conference is adjourned sine die. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/22/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 11/21 6:43 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mario Llive (Kidd, Novlette) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Scheduling Order
Wed 10/25 10:23 AM
ORDER denying10 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 10/24/2017 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), all discovery must be completed by 3/30/2018. On or before 4/3/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. An in person Status Conference is set for 1/31/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 1/24/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/24/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Wed 10/25 10:19 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/24/2017 in Courtroom 13A South. Novlette Kidd appearing with Plaintiff. David Peltan appearing for Defendant. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #12:53-1:18; 1:32-1:39.) (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Mon 10/23 4:40 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Mario Llive (Kidd, Novlette) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Fri 10/20 3:00 PM
ORDER: The Parties failed to file the joint proposed scheduling order per this Court's 9/26/2017 Order. The Parties are to file the proposed order by 10/23/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/20/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 09/26 10:09 AM
ORDER granting consent13 Motion to Adjourn Conference. RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel are advised that the Initial Conference currently scheduled for 10/12/2017 has been rescheduled to 10/24/2017 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Plaintiff must appear in person for the conference. The Parties are to refer to7 and must file the joint proposed scheduling order by 10/19/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/26/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 09/25 7:20 PM
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Mario Llive. (Kidd, Novlette) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 09/22 12:37 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement7 Scheduling Order,, filed by The CBE Group, Inc.. (Peltan, David) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 09/22 12:02 AM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint by The CBE Group, Inc.. (Peltan, David) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 09/22 8:37 AM
ORDER granting consent9 Motion to Adjourn Conference. RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel are advised that the Initial Conference currently scheduled for 9/26/2017 has been rescheduled to 10/12/2017 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Plaintiff must appear in person for the conference. The Parties are to refer to7 and must file the joint proposed scheduling order by 10/5/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/22/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Amend/Correct/Supplement
Thu 09/21 1:49 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement7 Scheduling Order,, by Mario Llive. (Kidd, Novlette) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 09/21 1:19 PM
Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference with consent by The CBE Group, Inc.. (Peltan, David) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 09/07 11:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against The CBE Group, Inc., filed by Mario Llive. (Kidd, Novlette) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/22 9:58 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 9/26/2017 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Plaintiff must appear in person for the conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 9/21/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/22/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/17 5:44 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by The CBE Group, Inc. (Peltan, David) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/17 5:43 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by The CBE Group, Inc.. (Peltan, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter Dated 9/30/2016, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Letter dated 11/9/2016 | ||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 06/19 3:46 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 06/19 3:46 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/19 3:46 PM
Summons Issued as to The CBE Group, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/16 11:34 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action against The CBE Group, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9613521 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Mario Llive. (Kidd, Novlette) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/19 3:44 PM
Case assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |