Harrison v. City of New York et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nicholas G Garaufis |
Referred: | James Orenstein |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03674 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 3:58 AM EST |
Defendant
City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John and Jane Doe 1-10
|
|
Plaintiff
Dawn Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 01/23 9:55 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, The above referenced action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/18/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Stipulation
Thu 01/17 3:54 PM
STIPULATION re38 Stipulation of Dismissal by City of New York, Zenobia Copeland, Patrick Coriell, William Jones, Diana Lopez, David Mancuso, Elizabeth Medina, Joseph Mule, Kamala Roper (Akina, William) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Thu 01/17 1:16 PM
ORDER re: the38 Stipulation of Dismissal: The parties stipulate to the dismissal of this action with prejudice but ask the court to retain jurisdiction to enforce their settlement agreement. In accordance with the undersigned's Individual Rule III(F), the court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement it has not reviewed. By no later than January 31, 2019, the parties are DIRECTED either (1) to file a revised stipulation of dismissal that does not require the court to retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement; or (2) to file the settlement agreement with the court. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/17/2019. (Haddad, Andrew) |
||
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Transcript
Mon 11/26 12:28 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 13, 2018, before Judge Orenstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber TypeWrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 518-581-8973. Email address: transcripts@typewp.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 12/17/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2019. (Hong, Loan) |
|
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 10/25 11:40 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by City of New York, Zenobia Copeland, Patrick Coriell, William Jones, Diana Lopez, David Mancuso, Elizabeth Medina, Joseph Mule, Kamala Roper (Akina, William) |
|
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference
Wed 10/03 9:55 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis: Pre-Motion Conference held on 10/2/2018. Counsel for all parties present. The parties reported that they have reached a settlement in principle, which would obviate the need for Defendants' proposed summary-judgment motion. The court directed the parties to file a stipulation of settlement by no later than October 26, 2018. All other deadlines in this case are suspended pending the filing of a stipulation of settlement. (Court Reporter Georgette Betts) (Haddad, Andrew) |
||
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Interim Settlement Conference
Thu 09/13 12:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Interim Pretrial Conference held on 9/13/2018, Settlement Conference held on 9/13/2018. Discovery is closed. The parties will attempt to resolve on consent any outstanding disagreements. The defendants have already requested leave to file a motion for summary judgment. The parties discussed settlement but did not reach agreement; they will continue to negotiation and will contact chambers to schedule a further settlement conference if and when they agree it would be useful to do so. Upon the parties' submission of a joint pretrial order that fully complies with[LINK:Judge Garaufis's individual practice requirements] , due no later than October 31, 2018, I will certify that the case is ready for trial. (Orenstein, James) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Mon 09/17 1:13 PM
ORDER terminating36 Motion to Compel. See docket entry37 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/13/2018. (Guy, Alicia) |
||
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Compel
Wed 09/12 5:56 PM
Letter MOTION to Compel the completion of Plaintiff's deposition by City of New York, Zenobia Copeland, Patrick Coriell, William Jones, Diana Lopez, David Mancuso, Elizabeth Medina, Joseph Mule, Kamala Roper. (Akina, William) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Tue 09/11 5:08 PM
ORDER re: Defendants'35 Application for Pre-Motion Conference: The Application is GRANTED. The parties are directed to confer and contact the court's Deputy at 718-613-2545 to schedule the pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/11/2018. (Haddad, Andrew) |
||
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Mon 09/10 10:19 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re: Motion for Summary Judgment by City of New York, Zenobia Copeland, Patrick Coriell, William Jones, Diana Lopez, David Mancuso, Elizabeth Medina, Joseph Mule, Kamala Roper. (Akina, William) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Take Deposition
Thu 08/23 10:27 AM
MOTION to Take Deposition from Dawn Harrison on September 12, 2018 by City of New York, Zenobia Copeland, Patrick Coriell, William Jones, Diana Lopez, David Mancuso, Elizabeth Medina, Joseph Mule, Kamala Roper. (Akina, William) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Take Deposition
Thu 08/23 11:18 AM
ORDER denying34 Motion to Take Deposition -- The movant has not sought opposing counsel's consent, as required, and offers no explanation for failing to do so. Moreover, the motion seeks an advance ruling based on speculation that a dispute may arise in the future. For those reasons, I deny the motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/23/2018. (Drake, Shaw) |
||
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 08/22 10:52 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by City of New York, Zenobia Copeland, Patrick Coriell, William Jones, Diana Lopez, David Mancuso, Elizabeth Medina, Joseph Mule, Kamala Roper. (Akina, William) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 08/22 1:36 PM
ORDER denying33 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery -- The parties third motion to extend discovery is neither timely nor supported by a showing of good cause, let alone extraordinary circumstances. I therefore deny the motion. The parties remain free to continue exchanging information on a wholly voluntary basis notwithstanding the close of the formal discovery period. All deadlines in the most recent case management and scheduling order remain in effect. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/22/2018. (Drake, Shaw) |
||
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 08/09 4:06 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by City of New York, Zenobia Copeland, Patrick Coriell, William Jones, Diana Lopez, David Mancuso, Elizabeth Medina, Joseph Mule, Kamala Roper. (Akina, William) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 08/09 5:01 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery -- The motion is granted. All discovery to be completed by: August 24, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/9/2018. (Drake, Shaw) |
||
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 07/26 6:41 PM
Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by City of New York, Zenobia Copeland, Patrick Coriell, William Jones, Diana Lopez, David Mancuso, Elizabeth Medina, Joseph Mule, Kamala Roper. (Akina, William) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Thu 07/26 7:35 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The pretrial conference previously scheduled for August 27, 2018 is rescheduled for September 13, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. ( ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance). Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/26/2018. (Drake, Shaw) |
||
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 07/12 11:55 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery to be completed by: August 13, 2018. Pretrial Conference ( ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): August 27, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: September 10, 2018. Joint pretrial order due by: October 12, 2018. The deadlines in this order will be enforced and, in light of the history of this case, will be modified only upon a timely showing of the most compelling and unforeseeable of extraordinary circumstances. SEE ATTACHED ORDER Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/12/2018. (Drake, Shaw) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Thu 07/12 11:52 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part29 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting29 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The application is granted in part. I will enter a separate amended scheduling order extending the remaining deadlines by 30 days. The pretrial conference previously scheduled for July 27, 2018 is rescheduled for August 27, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. I do not anticipate approving any further delay and will summarily deny further untimely requests for scheduling relief. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/12/2018. (Drake, Shaw) |
||
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Adjourn Conference
Wed 07/11 6:16 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Dawn Harrison. (Klein, Brett) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Thu 05/17 10:18 AM
ORDER granting28 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The application is granted and the conference previously scheduled for May 18, 2018 is cancelled. Pursuant to the Case Management and Scheduling Order dated December 15, 2017, docket entry13 , I assume that the parties' application is predicated on their agreement that discovery will be completed by the current deadline of July 13, 2018. Counsel for each party shall promptly advise me if that assumption is incorrect, and is also under a continuing obligation promptly to advise me of any subsequent developments that will keep the parties from complying with the deadlines currently in effect. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 5/17/2018. (Drake, Shaw) |
||
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 05/16 7:00 PM
Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Dawn Harrison. (Klein, Brett) |
|
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 05/14 10:05 AM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint, by Zenobia Copeland. (Akina, William) |
|
Sunday, April 29, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
service
Summons Returned Executed
Sun 04/29 3:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Harrison. Zenobia Copeland served on 4/23/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. (Klein, Brett) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/12 5:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Harrison. Kamala Roper served on 3/19/2018, answer due 4/9/2018. (Klein, Brett) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 03/29 9:42 AM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint, by Patrick Coriell, William Jones, Diana Lopez, David Mancuso, Elizabeth Medina, Joseph Mule, Kamala Roper. (Akina, William) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 03/13 8:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Harrison. Joseph Mule served on 3/9/2018, answer due 3/30/2018. (Klein, Brett) |
|
22 | 22
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 03/13 8:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Harrison. Patrick Coriell served on 3/8/2018, answer due 3/29/2018. (Klein, Brett) |
|
21 | 21
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 03/13 8:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Harrison. Diana Lopez served on 3/8/2018, answer due 3/29/2018. (Klein, Brett) |
|
20 | 20
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 03/13 8:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Harrison. Elizabeth Medina served on 3/8/2018, answer due 3/29/2018. (Klein, Brett) |
|
19 | 19
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 03/13 8:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Harrison. William Jones served on 3/8/2018, answer due 3/29/2018. (Klein, Brett) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 03/13 8:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Harrison. David Mancuso served on 3/8/2018, answer due 3/29/2018. (Klein, Brett) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 03/01 5:16 PM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint, by City of New York. (Akina, William) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/21 2:07 PM
Summons Issued re15 Amended Complaint as to Zenobia Copeland, Patrick Coriell, William Jones, Diana Lopez, David Mancuso, Elizabeth Medina, Joseph Mule, Kamala Roper. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
Att: 1 Joseph Mule, | ||
Att: 2 William Jones, | ||
Att: 3 Zenobia Copeland, | ||
Att: 4 Elizabeth Medina, | ||
Att: 5 Diana Lopez, | ||
Att: 6 Kamalo Roper, | ||
Att: 7 Patrick Coriell | ||
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 02/16 11:39 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of New York, John and Jane Doe 1-10, Patrick Coriell, Kamala Roper, Diana Lopez, Elizabeth Medina, Zenobia Copeland, William Jones, Joseph Mule, David Mancuso, filed by Dawn Harrison. (Klein, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons | ||
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Fri 12/29 10:33 AM
Letter status report regarding dkt. no. 12 by City of New York (Akina, William) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 12/15 12:54 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: December 15, 2017. Defendant to disclose identities of all officers involved in each alleged incident by: December 22, 2017. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: January 12, 2018. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: February 16, 2018. Status Conference (with joint status report due two business days in advance): May 18, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. All discovery to be completed by: July 13, 2018. Pretrial Conference ( ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): July 27, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: August 10, 2018. Joint pretrial order due by: September 13, 2018. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/15/2017. (Orenstein, James) |
|
12 | 12
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 12/15 12:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Initial Conference Hearing held on 12/15/2017. SCHEDULING: (1) The next status conference will be held on May 18, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. (2) A pretrial conference will be held on July 27, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. SUMMARY: I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that reflects, with minor modifications, the deadlines set forth in the parties' joint discovery plan. The defendant's counsel will complete the disclosure of the identities of all officers involved in each incident alleged in the Complaint by December 22, 2017. I respectfully request that the defendant's counsel provide a status report on the matter by December 29, 2017, so that I can schedule further proceedings as appropriate should the information not be timely disclosed. (Orenstein, James) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Thu 12/14 9:32 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The initial conference previously scheduled for December 15, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. is rescheduled for December 15, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/14/2017. (Drake, Shaw) |
||
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 12/13 5:30 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference on consent by City of New York. (Akina, William) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 12/13 9:51 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to an unanticipated change in the Court's calendar, the initial conference scheduled for today December 13, 2017, is rescheduled for December 15, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/13/2017. (Drake, Shaw) |
||
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 12/11 4:33 PM
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Dawn Harrison. (Klein, Brett) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Case Management Statement
Mon 12/11 4:33 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Klein, Brett) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 12/11 5:38 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The initial conference previously scheduled for December 13, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. is rescheduled for December 13, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/11/2017. (Drake, Shaw) |
||
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/04 4:22 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by City of New York. (Akina, William) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 10/05 3:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, December 13, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than December 11, 2017, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/5/2017. (Guy, Alicia) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 10/03 3:19 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by City of New York. (Akina, William) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 10/03 4:17 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer City of New York answer due 12/4/2017.The application is granted on consent as to the City only. The City must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by December 4, 2017. In light of the delay occasioned by the latter ruling, I impose certain additional obligations on both parties that will avoid delaying the proceedings even further: (a) no later than October 10, 2017, the City's counsel must provide to the plaintiff for execution a release pursuant to N.Y.C.P.L. Sec. 160.50 with respect to the arrest at issue in the litigation, as well as a release authorizing the disclosure of relevant medical records if the plaintiff is seeking damages for any physical or mental injury; (b) no later than October 17. 2017, the plaintiff must execute any such release; and (c) no later than December 6, 2017, the City's counsel must provide to the plaintiff the names, shield numbers, and proper service addresses of all individual officers involved in, or present at the scene of, the arrest at issue in this litigation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/3/2017. (Drake, Shaw) |
||
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 09/15 4:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Harrison. City of New York served on 9/13/2017, answer due 10/4/2017. (Klein, Brett) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/19 2:51 PM
Summons Issued as to City of New York. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 06/19 2:50 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 06/19 2:50 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/19 2:49 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/16 11:30 PM
COMPLAINT against City of New York, John and Jane Doe 1-10 filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9613518 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Dawn Harrison. (Klein, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |