Perfect Health LLC v. Danbury Pharma, LLC
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Denis R Hurley |
Referred: | Arlene R Lindsay |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03640 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 4:16 AM EST |
Defendant
Danbury Pharma, LLC
220 Smith Street
Farmingdale, NY 11735 |
|
Plaintiff
Perfect Health LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment - Default
Mon 03/26 4:47 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT: ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that plaintiff Perfect Health LLCs motion for a default judgment against defendant Danbury Pharma, LLC, is granted; that plaintiff is awarded $178,313.63; and that this case is closed. Ordered by Clerk of Court on 3/26/2018. (Toritto, Jim) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 03/20 10:26 AM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS : The Court adopts the February 27, 2018 Report and Recommendation of Judge Lindsay as if set forth herein. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffss motion for default judgment is granted and plaintiff is awarded damages for unpaid invoices in the amount of $162,915.50, together with prejudgment interest in the amount of $14,998.13 and costs in the amount of $400.00 for a total award of $178,313.63. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to close this case. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 3/20/2018. (Gapinski, Michele) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 03/08 4:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Report and Recommendation served on Registered Agent on March 1, 2018, filed by Perfect Health LLC. (Skruck, Lisa) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 03/02 1:28 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Report and Recommendation served on Amy Lesch on March 1, 2018, filed by Perfect Health LLC. (Skruck, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/28 1:48 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Report and Recommendation (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/27/2018) served on Danbury Pharma, LLC on February 28, 2018, filed by Perfect Health LLC. (Skruck, Lisa) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Wed 02/28 12:57 PM
ORDER re17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re16 MOTION for Default : Judge Lindsay directed that the report and recommendation be served upon receipt and proof of service filed with the Court. Proof and service has not been filed. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the Report and Recommendation on defendant and to file proof of service no later than March 1, 2018. Failure to so file proof of service may result in denial of the motion. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 2/28/2018. (Gapinski, Michele) |
||
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 02/27 4:58 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re16 : See the attached Report and Recommendation for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/27/2018. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
order
Order Referring Motion
Wed 08/16 10:15 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION16 : Pursuant to Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1), plaintiff's motion for default judgment is respectfully REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Linsday to issue a Report & Recommendation as to whether plaintiff has demonstrated that the allegations in the Complaint establish the defendant's liability such that the motion for default judgment should be granted, and, if so, to determine the appropriate amount of damages, costs, and/or fees, if any, to be awarded. It is further ORDERED that the scope of the foregoing reference shall be deemed to encompass such additional authority as reasonable or necessary to perform the foregoing duties and as is not inconsistent with the Constitution and laws of the United States. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 8/16/2017. Motions referred to Arlene R. Lindsay. (Bochner, Francesca) |
||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 08/15 11:43 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Perfect Health LLC. (Skruck, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Summons and Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Certificate of Default, | ||
Att: 7 Affidavit of Service | ||
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 08/10 9:52 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Danbury Pharma, LLC has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Danbury Pharma, LLC is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Wed 08/09 5:05 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Perfect Health LLC (Ansell, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
misc
Request for Certificate of Default - Denied
Tue 08/08 9:27 AM
REQUEST for Certificate of Default is denied at this time. The affidavit in support of the13 Request for Certificate of Default does not indicate, as required by Local Civil Rule 55.1, that the defendant is not an infant, incompetent, or in the military service. (Toritto, Jim) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Fri 07/28 3:40 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Perfect Health LLC (Ansell, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Sihan Cheng | ||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/26 3:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Perfect Health LLC. Danbury Pharma, LLC served on 6/23/2017, answer due 7/14/2017. (Skruck, Lisa) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/26 3:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Perfect Health LLC. (Skruck, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/05 10:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Perfect Health LLC. Danbury Pharma, LLC served on 6/30/2017, answer due 7/21/2017. (Skruck, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/29 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Skruck on behalf of Perfect Health LLC (aty to be noticed) (Skruck, Lisa) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Thu 06/29 9:55 AM
ORDER re [7, 8] : Plaintiff having filed an amended complaint that appears to address the issues raised in the Court's Order to Show Cause, plaintiff should proceed with service of process. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 6/29/2017. (Gapinski, Michele) |
||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Wed 06/28 5:09 PM
Letter /to The Honorable Denis R. Hurley. Plaintiff's response to the Order dated June 27, 2017 by Perfect Health LLC (Ansell, Robert) |
|
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 06/28 4:57 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Danbury Pharma, LLC, filed by Perfect Health LLC. (Ansell, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Orders, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Outstanding Invoices | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 06/27 11:21 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff show cause in writing filed on or before July 17, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See attached Order for details. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 6/27/2017. (Gapinski, Michele) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/20 11:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Danbury Pharma, LLC., on 06/20/2017. (Fagan, Linda) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 06/19 10:40 AM
Proposed Summons. Re Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. by Perfect Health LLC (Ansell, Robert) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 06/16 3:43 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 06/16 3:38 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/16 1:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Danbury Pharma, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9611266 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO filed by Perfect Health LLC. (Ansell, Robert) Modified on 6/16/2017 (Landow, Concetta) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Orders, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - Invoices | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/16 3:40 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) |
||
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Fri 06/16 3:44 PM
Proposed summons is rejected; the date must be left blank; Counsel is advised to submit another proposed summonses using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Landow, Concetta) |