Petrossian v. Fontaine et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Frederic Block |
Referred: | Steven Tiscione |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03655 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 12:191 Bank Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 13, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 4:16 AM EST |
Defendant
Changpae Yu DMD PC
|
|
Defendant
Edwin Fontaine
|
|
Defendant
James Fontaine
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Petro Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Tony Petrossian
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 18, 2022 | ||
46 | 46
misc
Declaration
Tue 10/18 1:01 PM
DECLARATION Referee's Report of Sale by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Wednesday, July 13, 2022 | ||
45 | 45
order
Judgment
Wed 07/13 12:37 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Tony Petrossian against Changpae Yu DMD PC, Petro Inc., Edwin Fontaine and James Fontaine. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 7/13/2022. (Innelli, Michael) |
|
44 | 44
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 07/13 12:33 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of final judgment of foreclosure and sale. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 7/13/2022. (Innelli, Michael) |
|
43 | 43
respoth
Affidavit in Support
Wed 07/13 11:44 AM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re42 Stipulation Affidavit of Amounts Due to Plaintiff by Tony Petrossian. (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 proposed Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale Order | ||
42 | 42
misc
Stipulation
Wed 07/13 11:42 AM
STIPULATION Consenting to a Final Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Tuesday, June 14, 2022 | ||
41 | 41
minutes
Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Tue 06/14 10:52 AM
Minute Order for Motion Hearing held on 6/9/2022 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Kapner for Plaintiff; Cohen, Vitali for Defendants.Plaintiff's Letter MOTION to Substitute Party39 is granted. In light of the transfer of the Note and Mortgage to Summerlin Asset Management, substituting Summerlin as the real party in interest would best "facilitate the conduct of the litigation" and "in no way affects the substantive rights of the transferor or transferee." Fed. Deposit Ins. Corp. v. Tisch, 89 F.R.D. 446, 448 (E.D.N.Y. 1981); see also Luxliner P.L. Export, Co. v. RDI/Luxliner, Inc., 13 F.3d 69, 71 (3d Cir. 1993) (Because joinder or substitution under Rule 25(c) does not ordinarily alter the substantive rights of parties [the decision as to whether to grant a Rule 25(c) motion] is generally within the district courts discretion.). Defendants do not object to the substitution and the parties have tentatively reached a disposition in the case that would be easier to finalize if the party now holding the mortgage is substituted. Accordingly, the Court orders that the docket be amended to reflect the substitution of original Plaintiff Tony Petrossian with Summerlin Asset Management, LLC pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(c). Parties will file the stipulation of dismissal by July 11, 2022. (FTR Log #11:01 - 11:03 AT&T.) (Vasquez, Lea) |
|
Thursday, June 02, 2022 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 06/02 1:39 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re40 Status Report filed by Tony Petrossian. A telephone conference will be held at 11:00 a.m. on June 9, 2022 before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 888-557-8511 with access code 3152145. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/2/2022. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Wednesday, May 25, 2022 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Status Report
Wed 05/25 11:56 AM
STATUS REPORT by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Wednesday, April 06, 2022 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Substitute Party
Wed 04/06 4:26 PM
Letter MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff by Tony Petrossian. (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Wed 04/06 5:19 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff's letter application39 is referred to MJ Tiscione to decide. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 4/6/2022. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Friday, March 25, 2022 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Status Report
Fri 03/25 1:37 PM
STATUS REPORT by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 03/25 2:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's letter application38 is GRANTED. By May 25, 2022 the plaintiff shall either file a further status report letter or a stipulation of dismissal. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/25/2022. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Status Report
Fri 01/21 9:54 AM
STATUS REPORT by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 01/21 10:06 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's letter application37 is GRANTED. By March 25, 2022 the plaintiff shall either file a further status report letter or a stipulation of dismissal. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/21/2022. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Friday, November 19, 2021 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 11/19 4:27 PM
Case Randomly Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura) |
||
Thursday, September 02, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Status Report
Thu 09/02 11:23 AM
STATUS REPORT by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 09/02 12:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's letter application36 is GRANTED. By January 21, 2022 the plaintiff shall file a further status report letter as to this litigation. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 9/2/2021. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Tuesday, July 06, 2021 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 07/06 1:49 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Frederic Block. Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna) |
||
Thursday, June 24, 2021 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 06/24 9:29 AM
ORDER re35 Status Report filed by Tony Petrossian. The parties shall submit a report regarding the status of this case on or before 9/1/2021. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 6/24/2021. (Caspari, Alexander) |
||
Wednesday, June 23, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Status Report
Wed 06/23 3:08 PM
STATUS REPORT by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Thursday, June 17, 2021 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 06/17 3:53 PM
ORDER: The parties shall submit a report regarding the status of this case on or before 6/23/2021. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 6/17/2021. (Caspari, Alexander) |
||
Friday, January 15, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Status Report
Fri 01/15 10:45 AM
STATUS REPORT by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2021 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Mon 01/11 2:52 PM
ORDER: The parties shall submit a report regarding the status of this case on or before 1/15/2021. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 1/11/2021. (Caspari, Alexander) |
||
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Status Report
Wed 11/27 12:33 PM
STATUS REPORT by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2019 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Tue 08/27 9:38 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER re32 Status Report filed by Tony Petrossian. The case shall continue to be held in abeyance and the parties shall submit another letter to the Court regarding the status of this case by 11/30/2019. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 8/27/2019. (Caspari, Alexander) |
||
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Status Report
Mon 08/26 11:13 AM
STATUS REPORT joint status report by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Mon 08/19 1:38 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: The case shall continue to be held in abeyance and the parties shall submit another letter to the Court regarding the status of this case by 9/3/2019. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 8/19/2019. (Taronji, Robert) |
||
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Status Report
Mon 07/01 12:10 PM
STATUS REPORT jointly filed by the parties by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 05/21 1:37 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf. Judge Joseph F. Bianco no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Russo, Eric) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Fri 04/05 12:02 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. The Court has received the parties' joint status report dated April 4, 2019. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case shall continue to be held in abeyance and the parties shall submit another letter to the Court regarding the status of this case by July 3, 2019. SO ORDERED.Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 4/5/2019. (Chill, Alana) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Status Report
Thu 04/04 2:13 PM
STATUS REPORT joint status letter by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Status Report
Fri 01/04 11:03 AM
STATUS REPORT by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
order
Status Report Order
Fri 01/04 3:56 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. The Court has received the parties' joint status report dated January 4, 2019. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit another letter to the Court regarding the status of this case by April 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 1/4/2019. (Chill, Alana) |
||
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Status Report
Thu 10/04 9:51 AM
STATUS REPORT jointly prepared by the parties by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
order
Status Report Order
Thu 10/04 10:13 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. The Court has received the parties' joint status report dated October 3, 2018. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit another letter to the Court regarding the status of this case by January 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 10/4/2018. (Kuhn, Alyssa) |
||
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Wed 10/03 3:07 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. By Order dated August 22, 2018, the Court granted the parties' request to hold this case in abeyance during the pendency of the forbearance agreement and directed the parties to submit a status report to the Court by September 21, 2018. To date, the Court has not received a status report. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a letter to the Court by Wednesday, October 10, 2018, advising the Court of the status of the forbearance agreement. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 10/3/2018. (Kuhn, Alyssa) |
||
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Wed 08/22 9:35 AM
ORDER. The Court has received the parties' joint letter (i) informing the Court that the parties have entered into a short-term forbearance agreement, and (ii) requesting that the Court hold the action in abeyance during the pendency of the forbearance agreement. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request is granted. The action is held in abeyance during the pendency of the forbearance agreement, and all conferences and deadlines are adjourned sine die. The parties shall submit a status report to the Court by the earlier of September 21, 2018, or the conclusion of the forbearance agreement. SO ORDERED.Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 8/22/2018. (Kuhn, Alyssa) |
||
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Letter
Mon 08/20 12:03 PM
Letter on consent of the parties requesting that the action be held in abeyance during pendency of forbearance agreement by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 05/21 10:27 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment to allow for time to resolve action by Tony Petrossian. (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 05/21 10:59 AM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Extension of Time to File. By letter dated May 21, 2018, counsel for plaintiff requests a ninety (90) day adjournment of the briefing schedule for plaintiff's motion for summary judgment so that the parties can attempt to resolve the action. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on consent, the request is granted. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by August 22, 2018; defendant's opposition shall be filed by September 21, 2018; and plaintiff's reply shall be filed by October 5, 2018. Oral argument is rescheduled for Tuesday, October 16, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 5/21/2018. (Kuhn, Alyssa) |
||
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 03/21 9:55 AM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time to File. By letter dated March 20, 2018, counsel for plaintiff requests an adjournment of the briefing schedule for plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on consent, the request is granted. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by May 22, 2018; defendant's opposition shall be filed by June 22, 2018; and plaintiff's reply shall be filed by July 6, 2018. Oral argument is rescheduled for July 11, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/21/2018. (Kuhn, Alyssa) |
||
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 03/20 2:38 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File request to adjourn briefing schedule to allow for parties to resolve action by Tony Petrossian. (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 02/02 12:40 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:Telephone Conference held on 2/1/2018, MOTION TO BE FILED BY 3/22/2018;RESPONSE BY 4/27/2018; REPLY BY 5/11/2018 (oral argument set for 6/11/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1020 before Judge Joseph F. Bianco.) (FTR Log #1:36-1:39.) (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Tue 01/23 2:31 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Tony Petrossian. (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Tue 01/23 3:01 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letter dated January 23, 2018, plaintiff requests a pre-motion conference in anticipation of filing a motion for summary judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall participate in a telephone pre-motion conference with the Court on Thursday, February 1, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. At that time, counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712-5670. Prior to the date of the conference, defendant may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motion is likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 1/23/2018. (Kuhn, Alyssa) |
||
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 01/11 10:50 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson: Discovery Status Conference held on 1/8/2018. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. (Cento, Patrick) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Status Report
Fri 01/05 3:16 PM
STATUS REPORT by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Fri 01/05 9:27 AM
Pursuant to Section III of the Courts Case Management and Scheduling Order, the parties were required to file a status report at least three business days prior to the scheduled Discovery Status Conference. The report has not been filed. The parties are hereby directed to file the status report by 5 p.m. today. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/5/2018. (Cento, Patrick) |
||
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 09/05 10:58 AM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: DEADLINES AND COURT APPEARANCES. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/21/2017. (Roman, Joshua) |
|
19 | 19
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Tue 09/05 10:55 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson: Initial Conference Hearing held on 8/21/2017 (Roman, Joshua) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/21 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa L. Kapner on behalf of Tony Petrossian (aty to be noticed) (Kapner, Alyssa) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Wed 08/16 2:20 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order proposed Initial Case Management and Scheduling Order by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/16 8:45 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by James Fontaine. (Cohen, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 08/10 9:44 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendants Changpae Yu DMD PC, Edwin Fontaine, and Petro Inc. have failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the defaults of defendants Changpae Yu DMD PC, Edwin Fontaine, and Petro Inc. are hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Wed 08/09 5:03 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Stipulation and Order
Fri 08/04 1:18 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re12 Stipulation re1 Complaint, Extending Time To Answer filed by James Fontaine. Time extended through and including August 16, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/4/2017. (Ryan, Mary) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/03 2:22 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, Extending Time To Answer by James Fontaine (Cohen, Mark) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/03 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Cohen on behalf of James Fontaine (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/02 1:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Petrossian. Petro Inc. served on 7/10/2017, answer due 7/31/2017. (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/25 8:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Petrossian. Changpae Yu DMD PC served on 7/17/2017, answer due 8/7/2017. (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/17 9:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Petrossian. James Fontaine served on 7/12/2017, answer due 8/2/2017. (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/17 9:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Petrossian. Edwin Fontaine served on 7/12/2017, answer due 8/2/2017. (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 06/30 10:55 AM
INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for August 21, 2017 at 11 a.m. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson in Courtroom 910 at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/30/2017. (Roman, Joshua) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/19 12:00 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 06/19 11:54 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 06/19 11:51 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/19 11:53 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit/Affirmation
Fri 06/16 3:44 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re1 Complaint, Certificate of Merit Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 3012-b by Tony Petrossian (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/16 3:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Changpae Yu DMD PC, Edwin Fontaine, James Fontaine, Petro Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9612353 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Tony Petrossian. (Weinreb, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A through E, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |