Gaspard v. NRA Group, LLC
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joan M Azrack |
Referred: | Anne Y Shields |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03656 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 4:08 AM EST |
Defendant
NRA Group, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Danielle Gaspard
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 12/04 11:17 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Case closed. SO Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 12/1/2017. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 11/30 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Danielle Gaspard (Kohn, Daniel) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Fri 11/17 9:13 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: A voluntary dismissal was due by 10/31/2017. By 11/30/2017, counsel for the plaintiff shall file the notice of voluntary dismissal. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/17/2017. (Posillico, Lauren) |
||
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 08/25 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Danielle Gaspard (Kohn, Daniel) |
|
order
Status Report Order
Fri 08/25 11:20 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER - Based on the representation that this case has settled, Counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by 10/31/2017. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 8/25/2017. (Flanagan, Doreen) |
||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/04 1:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danielle Gaspard. NRA Group, LLC served on 7/19/2017, answer due 8/9/2017. (Kohn, Daniel) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/19 12:33 PM
Summons Issued as to NRA Group, LLC. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 06/19 12:31 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 06/19 12:28 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/19 12:31 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/16 3:42 PM
COMPLAINT against NRA Group, LLC d/b/a National Recovery Agency filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9612372, filed by Danielle Gaspard. (Kohn, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |