McHugh et al v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joan M Azrack |
Referred: | Steven I Locke |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03666 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 4:06 AM EST |
Defendant
Lumber Liquidators, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas McHugh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cortney Eley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cindy Bennet
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rita Attansio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Attansio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Wineman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darlene White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Sizemore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Schaefer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Pinter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cindy Barry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Korona
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Jenkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eva Herbstova
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yvette Gilmore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darius Gandhi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Fajkus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Espenschied
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin DeVries
|
|
Plaintiff
Jayme Davidson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Floyd Beech
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arlene Beech
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pat Barry
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order
Thu 06/29 12:48 PM
Certified copy of JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-32) received from US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. MDL No.: 2627 In Re: IN RE: LUMBER LIQUIDATORS CHINESE-MANUFACTURED FLOORING PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Eastern District of Virginia for the reasons stated in the order of June 12, 2015, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Anthony J. Trenga. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 6/29/2017. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
7 | 7
misc
JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order
Thu 06/29 12:39 PM
JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-32: Pursuant to Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and theorder is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the E.D.Virginia for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requiresthat the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order totransfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is beingtransferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 6/29/2017. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia . (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
Att: 1 Minute Order | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Thu 06/29 12:50 PM
Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Virginia. MDL No.: 2627 In Re: IN RE: LUMBER LIQUIDATORS CHINESE-MANUFACTURED FLOORING PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
||
utility
Transfer Case Opened
Fri 06/30 9:31 AM
Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Eastern District of Virginia - as case 1:17-cv-02807, filed 06/29/2017. (Florio, Lisa) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 06/23 1:01 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Stay - The time for defendants to move or answer with respect to the complaint is extended to 8/7/2017. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/23/2017. (Posillico, Lauren) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
State Court Record
Fri 06/23 12:30 PM
STATE COURT RECORD Received from the Suffolk County Clerk's Office: Certified Copy of Clerk's Minutes for the E-filed Supreme Court case, Index #608114/17, along with a copy of the Notice of Removal. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Stay
Wed 06/21 5:13 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Lumber Liquidators, Inc.. (Kelly, Noreen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 06/20 10:07 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 06/20 10:05 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/20 10:07 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 06/19 3:34 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Lumber Liquidators (Kelly, Noreen) |
|
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Mon 06/19 9:47 AM
A Civil Cover Sheet was not filed; the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to submit the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 06/16 5:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lumber Liquidators from Supreme Court of New York Suffolk County, case number 608114/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9613098) (Kelly, Noreen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |