Bautista Cayman Asset Company v. Hogar Vivencias Daz Inc et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Aida M Delgado-Colon |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01814 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 12:191 Bank Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 4:36 AM AST |
Defendant
Hogar Vivencias Daz Inc
|
|
Defendant
Delia Zalduondo Gonzalez
|
|
Plaintiff
Bautista Cayman Asset Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, August 11, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/11 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luis G. Parrilla-Hernandez on behalf of Bautista Cayman Asset Company (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 07/26 3:45 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT. Pursuant to the sworn Joint Motion Requesting Judgment by Consent, ECF No. 1, filed by the parties on June 6, 2019, the Court hereby enters Judgment in the instant case adopting by reference all the terms and stipulations of the Joint Motion Requesting Judgment by Consent. ECF No. 1. The filing at ECF No. 11 is Noted. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/26/2019.(wm) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
motion
In Compliance
Mon 07/22 12:10 PM
Motion In Compliance as to 10 Order, filed by Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa on behalf of Bautista Cayman Asset Company Responses due by 8/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bellver-Espinosa, Alejandro) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Thu 07/11 3:28 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff has 15 days from the date of issuance of this Order to file a proposed consent judgment in compliance with the Court's previous order at ECF No. 8 . Non compliance may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/10/19. (gmm) |
|
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Thu 01/24 4:04 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, this case has been randomly reassigned to the docket of Aida M. Delgado-Colon, who has consented to said transfer. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2019. (nat) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment
Thu 03/15 8:39 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. "Motion allowed. The plaintiff shall prepare the approved form of judgment." Signed by Judge William G Young on 3/13/2018. (EES) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment
Fri 03/02 11:47 AM
ORDER finding as moot5 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Amended MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed 2/8/2018. See docket entry 6 . Signed by Judge William G Young on 3/2/2018. (jg) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Approve Consent Judgment
Thu 02/08 11:44 AM
Amended MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa on behalf of Bautista Cayman Asset Company Responses due by 2/22/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bellver-Espinosa, Alejandro) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Approve Consent Judgment
Thu 02/08 11:41 AM
MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa on behalf of Bautista Cayman Asset Company Responses due by 2/22/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bellver-Espinosa, Alejandro) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Disclosure
Fri 07/28 3:28 PM
ORDER noted3 Motion for Disclosure Signed by Judge William G Young on 7/28/2017. (EES) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Disclosure
Wed 07/12 5:18 PM
MOTION for Disclosure filed by Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa on behalf of Bautista Cayman Asset Company Responses due by 7/26/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bellver-Espinosa, Alejandro) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 06/19 9:12 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G Young (arg) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/16 11:14 AM
COMPLAINT against Bautista Cayman Asset Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5488188.), filed by Bautista Cayman Asset Company. Service due by 9/14/2017,(Bellver-Espinosa, Alejandro) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Sheet |