Oriental Financial Services Corp. v. Boj Umpierre
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | William G Young |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01817 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Loan |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Nov 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 5:13 AM AST |
Defendant
Pedro Enrique Boj Umpierre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oriental Financial Services Corp.
San Juan C 1 KM 15.1 Marg. San Roberto 4to Proffesional Office Park Ro Piedras
San Juan, PR 00926 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 27 2018
MEMORANDUM CONCERNING ARBITRATION ISSUES Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/27/2018.(EES) |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 21, 2021 | ||
76 | 76
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/21 11:08 AM
ORDER granting72 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Signed by Judge William G. Young on 4/21/2021. (EES) |