Finance of America Reverse, LLC v. Rodriguez-Nazario et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01818 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 4:40 AM AST |
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Miranda
|
|
Defendant
Teresa Miranda-Cruz
|
|
Defendant
Benjamin Rodriguez-Nazario
|
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Finance of America Reverse, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Fri 10/27 11:51 AM
JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/27/2017.(LMR) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 10/27 11:49 AM
ORDER: Granting7 "Request for Voluntary Dismissal." Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/27/2017. (LMR) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Fri 10/27 11:43 AM
MOTION to dismiss as to All Defendants filed by Valerie N. Hernandez-Hernandez on behalf of Finance of America Reverse, LLC Responses due by 11/13/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 07/17 4:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Finance of America Reverse, LLC upon United States of America served on 7/6/2017, answer due 9/5/2017. (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/17 4:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Finance of America Reverse, LLC upon Teresa Miranda-Cruz served on 7/10/2017, answer due 7/31/2017. (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/17 4:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Finance of America Reverse, LLC upon Benjamin Rodriguez-Nazario served on 7/10/2017, answer due 7/31/2017. (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/19 10:02 AM
Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Miranda, Teresa Miranda-Cruz, Benjamin Rodriguez-Nazario, United States of America (arg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 06/19 9:20 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/16 5:30 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5489501.), filed by Finance of America Reverse, LLC. Service due by 9/14/2017,(Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Mortgage, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Note, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Title, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit HUD Approval, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit SCRA Gladys, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit SCRA Benjamin, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Benjamin, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Teresa, | ||
Att: 9 Summons SLG, | ||
Att: 10 Summons USA, | ||
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 12 Category Sheet |