Zahner v. Crawford
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie L White |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01704 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 04, 2017 |
Petitioner
Devin M. Zahner
|
|
Respondent
Larry Crawford
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Fri 08/04 3:52 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 08/04/2017. (KCB) |
|
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Fri 08/04 3:50 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No.2 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus (Docket No.1 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 08/04/2017. (KCB) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 08/04 3:52 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4,5. Fri Aug 4 15:52:28 CDT 2017 (Battle, Kinica) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter
Mon 06/26 8:48 AM
Letter from Devin Zahner re:St. Charles County Jail. (KCB) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/16 3:31 PM
MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT HABEAS CASES by Petitioner Devin M. Zahner. (DLB) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 06/16 3:30 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Devin M. Zahner.(DLB) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope, | ||
Att: 2 Judge Assignment Label | ||
misc
Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Fri 06/16 3:39 PM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB) |
||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Fri 06/16 3:40 PM
Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (DLB) |
||
misc
Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Fri 06/16 4:01 PM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Jun 16 16:01:09 CDT 2017 (admin,) |