HY-Alloy Steels Company
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11330
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11330
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11332 |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 5,001-10,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
HY-Alloy Steels Company
1420 Kensington Rd Ste 220
Oak Brook, IL 60523-2165 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago |
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 02/07 9:45 AM
Bankruptcy Case 17-11332 Closed (LMD) |
||
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Final Decree
Tue 02/06 12:46 PM
Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases and Terminating Certain Claims and Noticing Services. Signed on 2/5/2018 (SJS) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order-Joint Admin
Tue 06/20 5:41 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases for Procedural Purposes Only. An Order (the "Joint Administration Order) has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases listed below for procedural purposes only. The docket in Case No. 17-11330 (LSS) Should be consulted for all matters affecting the case. The following chapter 11 cases are jointly administered pursuant to the Joint Administration Order: A.M. Castle & Co., Case No. 17-11331 LSS); HY- Alloy Steels Company, Case No. 17-11332 (LSS); Keystone Service, Inc., Case No. 17-11333 (LSS); and Total Plastics, Inc., Case No. 17-11334 (LSS) Order Signed on 6/20/2017. (NAB) (NAB) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
court
Case Assigned
Mon 06/19 7:30 AM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case. (Drechsler, Stacey) |
||
Sunday, June 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Sun 06/18 9:10 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11332 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8487323, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 06/18 4:41 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by HY-Alloy Steels Company. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix |